Pia v. Supernova Media et al

Plaintiff: Joseph G. Pia
Defendant: Supernova Media, Joycelyn Engle, Joseph Dipalma, Julianne Michelle, Kelly Kent and Dean Malzer
Case Number: 2:2009cv00840
Filed: September 17, 2009
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Brooke C. Wells
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2011 100 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 38 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice on the fiduciary duty claims. Counterclaimants may amend their counterclaim. Mr. Pia's motion is denied without prejudice as to all other counterclaims ; denying 44 Motion f or Preliminary Injunction. Nonetheless, Mr. Pia has stipulated, and the court has Ordered, that Mr. Pia will not to take any action or direct any action as to the film at issue here until he is allowed to do so in this action. The court further ORDER S that if any party Mr. Pia then represents is to take any action with respect to the film, Mr. Pia shall give the Counterclaimants 10 days notice prior to such action taking effect. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 2/28/2011. (jtj)
February 28, 2011 101 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 78 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kurt O. Hawes and Brennan H. Moss withdrawn from case for Stucki Steel & Rencher. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Nuffer on 2/28/2011. (jtj)
April 18, 2011 141 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER re 129 Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion to Expedite, Order on Motion for Hearing, 132 Objections, 136 Opposition Brief. The objection is OVERRULED and the deposition of Mr. Pia should go forward as scheduled. The parties shall bear their own costs and fees in connection with this motion. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 4/18/2011. (jtj)
October 6, 2011 184 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 121 Motion to Dismiss. See order for additional details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 10/6/11. (jmr)
December 6, 2011 217 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order Granting in Part Motion to Compel Full and Complete Deposition Testimony-granting in part 160 Motion to Compel. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Nuffer on 12/6/11. (jmr)
March 19, 2012 326 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order Denying Motion for Leave to Serve Subpoena and Notice of Deposition by Alternative Service-denying 267 Motion for Leave to File/Serve Subpoena and Notice of Deposition by Alternative Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Nuffer on 3/17/12. (jmr)
April 5, 2012 367 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION finding as moot 273 Motion for Protective Order ; finding as moot 283 Motion for Protective Order ; denying 290 Motion for Protective Order ; granting 343 Motion to Take Deposition from Charles Morrison and Stewart Rahr aft the fact discovery deadline ; denying 357 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 04/05/2012. (asp)
February 13, 2013 650 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 304 Motion for Protective Order Regarding Ongoing Settlement Negotiations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 2/13/13 (alt)
November 9, 2010 84 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE- Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332 and is directed to respond in writing within 10 days from the date of thi s order. Alternatively, Mr. Pia may move to amend his complaint of voluntarily withdraw this action from the federal docket. Either of these options must also be exercised within 10 days of this order. The Motion Hearing set for November 15, 2010 is STRICKEN. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 11/8/2010. (jtj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pia v. Supernova Media et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph G. Pia
Represented By: Brennan H. Moss
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supernova Media
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joycelyn Engle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Dipalma
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julianne Michelle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Kent
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Malzer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]