Blake-Brock v. Sandy City Police Department et al

Plaintiff: Margie A. Blake-Brock
Defendant: Sandy City Police Department and Sandy City Corporation
 
Case Number: 2:2010cv00570
Filed: June 21, 2010
 
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Bruce S. Jenkins
 
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and Orderdenying as moot 10 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 12 Motion for Service of Process. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 04/04/2012. (tls)
May 10, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION that Plaintiff file a new Amended Complaint, as set forth in this Order, within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Failure to file an Amended Complaint that meets the above requirements will result in dismissal of this case. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 05/10/2012. (asp)
August 20, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDERdenying 11 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 08/20/2012. (tls)
November 2, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order granting 23 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 11/1/12. (jlw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Blake-Brock v. Sandy City Police Department et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margie A. Blake-Brock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy City Police Department
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy City Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]