Jackson v. Soper et al

Plaintiff: Lawrence Marshall Jackson
Defendant: Lisa Soper, Joni J. Jones, Wayne A. Freestone and David J. Angerhofer
Case Number: 2:2011cv00068
Filed: January 14, 2011
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Central Office
County: Utah
Presiding Judge: Clark Waddoups
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 8, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to AMEND DEFICIENT COMPLAINT and MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 7 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 8 Motion for Service of Process (Prisoner). 1) Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of this order to cure the deficiencies noted above. 2) The Clerks Office shall mail Plaintiff a copy of the Pro Se Litigant Guide. 3) If Plaintiff fails to timely cure the above deficiencies according to the instructions here this action will be dismissed without further notice. See order for details. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 2/8/2012. (kpf)
June 8, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER Directing Service of Process, answer and/or Dispositive Motion. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 6/7/2012. (kpf)
March 19, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER DENYING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. It is hereby ordered that: Plaintiff shall be added to the Court's list of prisoner litigants having three-strikes under 28 USC 1915(g); Plaintiff is DENIE D leave to proceed without prepayment of fees in this case; and 3) this case will be automatically DISMISSED under 28 USC 1915(g) with no further warning to Plaintiff, unless he pays the entire $350.00 filing fee within ten days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Clark Waddoups on 3/18/2013. (kpf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Soper et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Marshall Jackson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Soper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joni J. Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne A. Freestone
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Angerhofer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]