Cosey v. USA

Respondent: USA
Petitioner: Eugene T. Cosey
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv00104
Filed: January 24, 2011
 
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Ted Stewart
 
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 11, 2011 10 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 6 Petitioner's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 7 Petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to 2255 Petition (Replies due by 9/30/2011). Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 08/11/2011. (tls)
September 7, 2011 12 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 11 Petitioner's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 09/07/2011. (tls)
September 27, 2011 14 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order Denying Petitioner's Motion Under 28 USC 2255 to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 09/27/2011. (tls)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Cosey v. USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: J. Drew Yeates
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eugene T. Cosey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]