Ovard v. Summit County

Plaintiff: Delores Ovard
Defendant: Summit County
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv00592
Filed: June 27, 2011
 
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Central Office
County: Summit
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Kimball
 
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 29:0623
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 2, 2013 145 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER granting 74 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 109 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying as moot 120 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying as moot 126 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 12/2/2013. (tls)
November 26, 2012 57 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part 37 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 11/26/2012. (tls)
November 26, 2012 58 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 54 Motion for Protective Order ; granting 54 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 11/26/2012. (asp)
December 7, 2012 60 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 54 Motion for Protective Order; denying 54 Motion for Attorney Fees (affirming in part and vacating in part 58 Memorandum Decision). Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 12/7/12 (alt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ovard v. Summit County
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delores Ovard
Represented By: Gabrielle L. Caruso
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit County
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]