Dahl v. Dahl et al

Plaintiff: Kim Dahl
Defendant: Charles F. Dahl, Charles F Dahl MD PC Defined Benefit Pension Trust, Rosemond V. Blakelock and Kelly Peterson
Case Number: 2:2011cv00949
Filed: October 13, 2011
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Tena Campbell
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 19, 2013 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 83 Motion for Summary Judgment: Defendants are entitled to summary judgment on the Plaintiff's federal wiretapping claims; the court lacks subject matter jurisdiction over ERISA claims and declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Plaintiff's state law claims. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 2/19/13 (alt)
September 19, 2014 219 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER for Sanctions against Defendants - an award of reasonable expenses to be determined. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 9/19/14 (alt)
February 17, 2015 237 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 231 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 2/17/2015. (las)
February 24, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND MEMORANDUM DECISION denying without prejudice in part and granting in part 7 Motion to Dismiss; denying 28 Motion to Reconsider. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 2/23/12 (alt)
August 3, 2012 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND MEMORANDUM DECISION granting Kelly Peterson's 45 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 64 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 8/3/12 (alt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dahl v. Dahl et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Dahl
Represented By: Steve S. Christensen
Represented By: Samuel J. Sorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles F. Dahl
Represented By: Ryan Dan Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles F Dahl MD PC Defined Benefit Pension Trust
Represented By: Ryan Dan Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosemond V. Blakelock
Represented By: Ryan Dan Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.