Gulbranson v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Kathleen Gulbranson
Defendant: Michael Astrue
Case Number: 2:2012cv00107
Filed: January 23, 2012
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Ted Stewart
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:0405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 9, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION that the ALJs decision is REVERSED AND REMANDED pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) for the purposes of conducting additional proceedings as set forth herein. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 10/04/2012. (asp)
January 22, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 19 Motion for Attorney Fees. Defendant is ordered to pay Plaintiff $6,529.72 in attorneys fees. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 01/22/2013. (asp)
April 27, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER granting 24 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 4/24/2015. (blh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gulbranson v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Gulbranson
Represented By: Natalie L. Bolli-Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.