Theisen et al v. Fausett et al

Defendant: Savanah Lenard, Mandy Penovich and Ashton Fausett
Plaintiff: Richard Theisen and Tiffany Theisen
Case Number: 2:2012cv00173
Filed: February 13, 2012
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Kimball
Referring Judge: Paul M. Warner
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 4 Motion for Service of Process. ; denying 5 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 9 Motion for Service of Process. ; denying 10 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 9/27/12. (jlw)
March 27, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 7 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 8 Motion to Amend/Correct. No later than April 29, 2013, Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint against Mr. Fausett, Ms. Penovich, and Ms. Lenard in the ir individual capacities under 42 U.S.C. § 1983 that complies with rule 8 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Failure to timely do so will result in the court dismissing this action without further notice. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 3/27/13. (jlw)
February 5, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is dismissed. Signed by Judge Dale A. Kimball on 2/5/14. (jlw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Theisen et al v. Fausett et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Savanah Lenard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mandy Penovich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashton Fausett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Theisen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Theisen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]