Home Design Services v. Alan V Gren Enterprises et al

Defendant: Alan V Gren Enterprises, Alan V. Gren, Andrews & Associates Custom Home Design and Larry F. Andrews
Plaintiff: Home Design Services
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00398
Filed: April 26, 2012
 
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Central Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Brooke C. Wells
 
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2013 122 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION - granting 103 Motion to Compel; granting 103 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/31/13. (ss)
April 9, 2013 66 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 47 Motion to Compel and denying the Motion to find the Gren Defendants in contempt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 4/9/13. (ss)
April 16, 2013 70 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 65 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 64 MOTION to Compel APPROPRIATE DISCOVERY RESPONSES FROM PLAINTIFF HOME DESIGN SERVICES, INC. Responses due by 4/23/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 4/16/13. (ss)
May 22, 2013 85 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 56 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 5/22/13. (ss)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Home Design Services v. Alan V Gren Enterprises et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan V Gren Enterprises
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan V. Gren
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrews & Associates Custom Home Design
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry F. Andrews
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Home Design Services
Represented By: Anthony M. Lawhon
Represented By: Timothy B. Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]