Barnes v. Harris et al

Defendant: Michael D. Pavich, Gary M. Wright, Douglas Stanger, Barnes Bancorporation, Curtis H. Harris, Ned H. Giles, David N. Barnes, Robert L. Thurgood and Jerry W. Stevenson
Intervenor: FDIC
Plaintiff: J. Canute Barnes
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv01010
Filed: October 30, 2012
 
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Ted Stewart
 
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 12:1819 Default of Promissory Note
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 12, 2012 19 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION granting 9 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. Plaintiff shall file his amended Complaint within fourteen (14) days of this Order. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 12/12/12. (ss)
January 15, 2013 23 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 7 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 01/15/2013. (asp)
April 18, 2013 49 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDERgranting 33 Intervener FDICs Motion to Stay Discovery ; granting 34 Individual Defendants Motion to Stay and Joinder in the IntervenerFDIC-Receivers Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 4/18/13. (ss)
May 13, 2013 52 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 24 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ; granting 30 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and the 32 Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall have twenty-one (21) days to file a Second Amended Complaint in accordance with the terms of this Order. Failure to file a Second Amended Complaint will result in dismissal of this case. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 5/13/13. (ss)
December 19, 2013 80 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 58 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 59 Motion to Dismiss; denying 60 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 78 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 12/19/13 (alt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Barnes v. Harris et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D. Pavich
Represented By: Jonathan A. Dibble
Represented By: Scott H. Clark
Represented By: Kelly J. Applegate
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary M. Wright
Represented By: Jonathan A. Dibble
Represented By: Scott H. Clark
Represented By: Kelly J. Applegate
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Stanger
Represented By: Jonathan A. Dibble
Represented By: Scott H. Clark
Represented By: Kelly J. Applegate
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnes Bancorporation
Represented By: Scott H. Clark
Represented By: Kelly J. Applegate
Represented By: Jonathan A. Dibble
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis H. Harris
Represented By: Jonathan A. Dibble
Represented By: Scott H. Clark
Represented By: Kelly J. Applegate
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ned H. Giles
Represented By: Jonathan A. Dibble
Represented By: Scott H. Clark
Represented By: Kelly J. Applegate
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David N. Barnes
Represented By: Jonathan A. Dibble
Represented By: Scott H. Clark
Represented By: Kelly J. Applegate
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Thurgood
Represented By: Jonathan A. Dibble
Represented By: Scott H. Clark
Represented By: Kelly J. Applegate
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry W. Stevenson
Represented By: Jonathan A. Dibble
Represented By: Scott H. Clark
Represented By: Kelly J. Applegate
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: FDIC
Represented By: John P. Harrington
Represented By: Cecilia M. Romero
Represented By: Rebecca A. Ryon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. Canute Barnes
Represented By: Justin W. Starr
Represented By: R. Willis Orton
Represented By: Thomas R Karrenberg
Represented By: Jon V. Harper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]