Meyer v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Greg Steven Meyer
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 2:2012cv01059
Filed: November 13, 2012
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Central Office
County: Salt Lake
Presiding Judge: Dustin B. Pead
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:0405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 20, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION finding that the ALJ's rejection of the Plaintiff's treating and examining physician Dr. Speed, was without substantial evidence and hereby REMANDS this case for further proceedings as set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 09/20/2013. (asp)
January 22, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 22 Motion for Attorney Fees. Within 30 days of the date of this Order, the Commissioner shall pay Plaintiff, directly, an EAJA attorney fee award of $7095.71. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 1/22/14 (alt)
January 28, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 01/28/2014. (tls)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meyer v. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Steven Meyer
Represented By: John J. Borsos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]