Arnett v. Howard et al

Defendant: Nationwide Affordable Housing, Lifeline Media LLC, Benjamin Snow Howard and Ben Howard Trust
Plaintiff: James Arnett
Case Number: 2:2013cv00591
Filed: June 25, 2013
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Central Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Ted Stewart
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 24, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that defendants' 37 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim/ Motion to Dismiss is denied in part and granted in part. The Clerk's Office is directed to transfer this action to Utah in accordance with the Court's orde r. Further ordered denying 39 Motion to Consolidate Cases. It is ordered that Magistrate Judge Ferraro's 47 Report and Recommendation is accepted and adopted by this Court as the findings of fact and conclusions of law. Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 6/24/2013.(BAR) [Transferred from Arizona on 6/25/2013.]
October 10, 2013 79 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 69 Motion for Sanctions ; that the portion of the record referencing Plaintiffs mental health is stricken (doc. 64, p.4) and shall not be considered by the Court. Defendants Counsel is further ORDERED to re-file Defendants Response In Opposition To Plaintiffs Untitled Motion Filed On August 14, 2013 (doc. 64) with the offending portions of the submissionremoved. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/09/2013. (asp)
October 29, 2013 81 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDERdenying 60 Motion to Expedite Inquiry Regarding a Violation of 18 U.S.C. § 1512(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/29/13. (ss)
March 21, 2014 82 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDERdenying 57 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint; granting in part and denying in part 59 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ; denying 65 Motion for TRO; granting in part and denying in part 71 Motion to Withdraw and Motion to Amend Complaint. The Plaintiff is ordered to file an amended complaint consistent with this Order, within thirty (30) days. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 3/21/14. (ss)
July 16, 2014 90 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER denying 83 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 85 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 7/16/2014. (blh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Utah District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnett v. Howard et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Affordable Housing
Represented By: Bryan J. Stoddard
Represented By: Steven C. Tycksen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lifeline Media LLC
Represented By: Bryan J. Stoddard
Represented By: Steven C. Tycksen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Snow Howard
Represented By: Bryan J. Stoddard
Represented By: Steven C. Tycksen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Howard Trust
Represented By: Bryan J. Stoddard
Represented By: Steven C. Tycksen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Arnett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]