Van Ornum v. US Department of Health and Human Service et al

Defendant: Kuakini Health, Hawaii Pacific Health, US Department of Health and Human Service and William Goodhue, Jr.
Plaintiff: Sandra C.K. Van Ornum
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00671
Filed: July 19, 2013
 
Court: Utah District Court
Office: Central Office
County: Utah
Referring Judge: Dustin B. Pead
Presiding Judge: Clark Waddoups
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order- granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall have until January 29, 2014-approximately six months from the date of filing her July 22, 2013 administrative claim,to serve Defendants. Failure to effect service by such date shall result in the Courts immediate dismissal of the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 11/21/13. (jmr)
January 8, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order-granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time; Motions terminated: 11 MOTION for Extension of Time for mandatory extended service of process filed by Sandra C.K. Van Ornum. This shall be the final extension based thereon. Failure to effect service by such date shall result in the Courts immediate dismissal of the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 1/8/14. (jmr)
February 19, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order- denying 14 Motion for Extension of Time. As setforth in the Courts previous Order, Plaintiff shall have until February 27, 2014, to serveDefendants. It is So Ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 2/19/14. (jmr)
August 12, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 2 Motion for Service of Process without Prejudice. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/12/13. (jmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Van Ornum v. US Department of Health and Human Service et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kuakini Health
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaii Pacific Health
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Health and Human Service
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Goodhue, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra C.K. Van Ornum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]