Jim Billado Roofing, LLC v. Custom Copper and Slate, Ltd.

Plaintiff: Jim Billado Roofing, LLC
Defendant: Custom Copper and Slate, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2008cv00097
Filed: April 25, 2008
Court: Vermont District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Chittenden
Presiding Judge: J. Garvan Murtha
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Contract Dispute

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 10, 2010 101 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S 92 MOTION FOR THE AWARD OF COSTS, EXPENSES, ATTORNEY'S FEES AND PREJUDGMENT INTEREST, AND DEFENDANT'S 97 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF TIME TO FILE APPEAL. Defendant's 97 Motion to Reconsider is DENIED. Plaintiff's 92 Motion for Costs, Fees, and Interest is: (1) GRANTED to the extent it asks for costs, with the precise amounts to be determined by the Clerk; (2) GRANTED as modified with respect to attorney's fees and expenses, entitling Plaintiff to $25,960.50 in attorney's fees, $1,516.94 in expenses; and (3) DENIED with respect to prejudgment interest. Defendant's 99 Notice of Appeal filed February 9, 2010 will become effective upon the filing of this Ruling. Signed by Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 5/10/2010. (kak)
October 26, 2009 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendant's 76 Motion for a new trial on the issue of liability is DENIED. Defendant's 77 Alternative motion to amend or alter the judgment by remittitur is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall inform the Court in writing, on or before November 16, 2009, whether it will accept the remittitur to a new amount of $61,520.82, or proceed to a new trial on the issue of damages. Signed by Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 10/26/2009. (kak)
January 14, 2010 95 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: 93 Motion to Enlarge time for filing an appeal is DENIED. 93 Motion for extension of time to file opposition to 92 MOTION for Attorney Fees, Costs, Expenses and Prejudgment Interest is GRANTED. Signed by Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 1/14/2010. (kak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jim Billado Roofing, LLC v. Custom Copper and Slate, Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Billado Roofing, LLC
Represented By: Pietro J. Lynn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Custom Copper and Slate, Ltd.
Represented By: Chad V. Bonanni
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]