Silber v. Pallito et al

Plaintiff: David J. Silber
Defendant: Andrew Pallito, Robert Hofmann, Robert Kupec, Raymond Flum, David Bovat, Ellen McWard, Anita Carbonell, Dominic Damato, James Kamel and Mark Potanis
 
Case Number: 1:2009cv00073
Filed: March 24, 2009
 
Court: Vermont District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Windsor
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: John M. Conroy
Presiding Judge: J. Garvan Murtha
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 1, 2009 31 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: recommending that plaintiff's 3 and 8 MOTIONS for Preliminary Injunction be denied. To the extent that the defendants have moved in 30 to have this case dismissed, the motion should be denied. ORDERED: 28 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Matthew F. Valerio is GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 12/18/2009. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 12/1/09. (hbc)
December 23, 2009 33 Featured Case ORDER AFFIRMING, APPROVING and ADOPTING 31 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: 3 and 8 Motions for Preliminary Injunction are DENIED; 30 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. Any appeal taken in forma pauperis from this Order would not be taken in good faith because such an appeal would be frivolous. This matter is returned to Magistrate Judge Conroy for further proceedings. Signed by Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 12/23/2009. (wjf)
February 7, 2011 68 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending Defendants' 48 MOTION for Summary Judgment be granted and this case be dismissed. Objections to R&R due by 2/25/2011. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 2/7/2011. (hbc)
March 31, 2011 72 Featured Case ORDER: Defendants' are entitled to qualified immunity on Silber's due process claims. ADOPTING 68 Report and Recommendation as to Silber's other claims re: 48 Motion for Summary Judgment. Pltf's (1.) claims for damages agains t Defendants in their official capacities are barred by the Eleventh Amendment and are DISMISSED;(2.) to the extent Silber seeks relief beyond nominal damages, summary judgment in favor of Defendants is GRANTED;(3.) defendants' motion for summar y judgment on Silber's claim that his placement in a dry cell violated his rights under the Fourteenth and Eighth Amendments is GRANTED;(4.) defendants' motion for summary judgment on Silber's retaliation claim is GRANTED. Defendants' 48 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED and this case is DISMISSED. Signed by Senior Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 3/31/2011. (wjf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Silber v. Pallito et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David J. Silber
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Pallito
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Hofmann
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Kupec
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Flum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bovat
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen McWard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anita Carbonell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominic Damato
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Kamel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Potanis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]