McMichael v. Pallito et al

Plaintiff: Thurmond McMichael
Defendant: Andrew Pallito, Robert Kupec, Jay Simons, Phil Fernandez, Stan Morse, David Buley, Steven MacCarthy and Barbara Lester
 
Case Number: 1:2009cv00130
Filed: May 20, 2009
 
Court: Vermont District Court
Office: Brattleboro Office
County: Chittenden
Referring Judge: John M. Conroy
Presiding Judge: J. Garvan Murtha
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 28, 2010 46 Featured Case ORDER AFFIRMING, APPROVING and ADOPTING 43 Report and Recommendation: Plaintiff's 30 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED as moot. This matter is returned to Magistrate Judge John M. Conroy for further proceedings. Signed by Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 4/28/2010. (wjf)
March 24, 2011 78 Featured Case ORDER Affirming, Approving, and Adopting 65 Report and Recommendation: 59 Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; 58 Pltf's Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED as to all claims to which dfts are en titled to summary judgment and DENIED without prejudice as to pltf's claim re: access to a religiously appropriate diet. Summary judgment motions as to this claim shall be filed on or before 4/22/2011. This matter is returned to Magistrate Judge John M. Conroy for further proceedings. Signed by Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 3/24/2011. (kak)
December 1, 2011 94 Featured Case ORDER AFFIRMING, APPROVING and ADOPTING the Magistrate Judge's 93 Report and Recommendation. Defendants' 83 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Plaintiff's 87 Opposing Motion is DENIED. This case is DISMISSED. Any appeal taken from this Order would not be good faith as such an appeal would be frivolous. Signed by District Judge J. Garvan Murtha on 12/01/2011. (kak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: McMichael v. Pallito et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thurmond McMichael
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Pallito
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Kupec
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Simons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Fernandez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stan Morse
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Buley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven MacCarthy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Lester
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]