Forauer v. The Vermont Country Store, Inc.

Plaintiff: Doreen Forauer
Defendant: The Vermont Country Store, Inc.
 
Case Number: 5:2012cv00276
Filed: December 11, 2012
 
Court: Vermont District Court
Office: Rutland Office
County: Rutland
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 31, 2013 19 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER granting 7 Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Certification of Collective Action, granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's Motion to Notify Class; and granting in part and denying in part 10 Defendant's Cross-Motion for Right to Object to Plaintiff's Proposed Notification of Class. Signed by Chief Judge Christina Reiss on 7/31/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Addendum) (pac)
November 19, 2013 49 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 29 MOTION for Protective Order Re: Plaintiffs' Notifications Through Website Posting and Postcard . Signed by Chief Judge Christina Reiss on 11/19/2013. (pac)
June 11, 2014 73 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 57 Defendant's Motion to Compel Certain Plaintiffs to Attend Depositon. Signed by Chief Judge Christina Reiss on 6/11/2014. (pac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Forauer v. The Vermont Country Store, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doreen Forauer
Represented By: Erin H. Gallivan
Represented By: Christopher J. Larson, Esq.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Vermont Country Store, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew H. Maass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]