Brouha v. Vermont Wind, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Paul Brouha |
Defendant: |
Vermont Wind, LLC, Northeast Wind Partners II, LLC and First Wind Holdings, LLC |
Case Number: |
5:2014cv00063 |
Filed: |
April 1, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Vermont |
Office: |
Rutland Office |
County: |
Caledonia |
Presiding Judge: |
Geoffrey W. Crawford |
Nature of Suit: |
Torts to Land |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 29, 2016 |
Filing
83
OPINION AND ORDER denying 80 Motion for Reconsideration re 79 Order on Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 2/29/2016. (esb)
|
September 23, 2014 |
Filing
18
OPINION AND ORDER denying 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford on 9/23/2014. (pjl)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Vermont District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Brouha v. Vermont Wind, LLC et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Paul Brouha |
Represented By: |
Nathan H. Stearns, Esq. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Vermont Wind, LLC |
Represented By: |
Elizabeth H. Catlin, Esq. |
Represented By: |
Geoffrey H. Hand, Esq. |
Represented By: |
Kelly D.H. Lowry |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Northeast Wind Partners II, LLC |
Represented By: |
Elizabeth H. Catlin, Esq. |
Represented By: |
Geoffrey H. Hand, Esq. |
Represented By: |
Kelly D.H. Lowry |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: First Wind Holdings, LLC |
Represented By: |
Elizabeth H. Catlin, Esq. |
Represented By: |
Geoffrey H. Hand, Esq. |
Represented By: |
Kelly D.H. Lowry |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?