Pearse-Hocker v. Firelight Media, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Anne Pearse-Hocker
Defendant: Firelight Media, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv00458
Filed: May 5, 2010
 
Court: Virginia Eastern District Court
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Loudoun
Presiding Judge: Claude M. Hilton
 
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
October 14, 2010 24 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Anne Pearse-Hocker. (Heyer, Eric)
October 4, 2010 23 Featured Case ORDER Upon consideration of the 21 Second Unopposed Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order and Extend the Time to Serve Rule 26(a) Expert Disclosures, and all papers submitted in relation thereto, the Court hereby FINDS that good cause exists for the requested extension. It is, therefore, hereby ORDERED that Pltf shall serve her Rule 26 expert disclosure on or before Friday, October 8, 2010, and that Deft shall serve its Rule 26 expert disclosure on or before Friday, November 5, 2010. It is so ORDERED this 4th day of October 2010, nunc pro tunc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr. on 10/4/2010. (stas)
October 1, 2010 22 Brief in Support to 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Rule 26(a) Expert Disclosures filed by Anne Pearse-Hocker. (Heyer, Eric)
October 1, 2010 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Rule 26(a) Expert Disclosures by Anne Pearse-Hocker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Propose Order)(Heyer, Eric)
September 28, 2010 20 CERTIFICATE of Service re 18 Memorandum in Support by Eric Nathan Heyer on behalf of Anne Pearse-Hocker (Heyer, Eric)
September 27, 2010 19 Featured Case ORDER Upon consideration of the 17 Unopposed Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order and Extend the Time to Serve Rule 26(a) Expert Disclosures, and all papers submitted in relation thereto, the Court hereby FINDS that good cause exists for the requested extension. It is therefore, hereby ORDERED that Pltf shall serve her Rule 26 expert disclosure on or before Friday, October 1, 2010, and that Deft shall serve its Rule 26 expert disclosure on or before Friday, October 29, 2010. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 9/27/2010. (stas, )
September 27, 2010 Notice of Correction re: 18 Memorandum in Support re 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Rule 26(a) Expert Disclosures (Unopposed) filed by Anne Pearse-Hocker. The filing user has been notified to file a separate Certificate of Service. (stas)
September 24, 2010 18 Memorandum in Support re 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Rule 26(a) Expert Disclosures (Unopposed) filed by Anne Pearse-Hocker. (Heyer, Eric)
September 24, 2010 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Rule 26(a) Expert Disclosures (Unopposed) by Anne Pearse-Hocker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Heyer, Eric)
September 14, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr: Settlement Conference held on 9/14/2010. There were five attendees. Conference lasted approx. one and a half (1 1/2) hours. (cmar, )
September 14, 2010 Set Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 9/14/2010 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. (cmar, )
September 13, 2010 16 Featured Case ORDER granting application of Christopher "Kip" Schwartz to appear pro hac vice; Filing fee $ 50.00, receipt number 14683016065. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 9/13/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt, # 2 Cover Letter, # 3 Consent Motion)(stas)
August 13, 2010 15 Featured Case Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that a) Parties shall deliver to my chambers (not to the Clerks office) a copy of every non-dispositive motion and every document relating to such a motion within one business day of filing it. b) Rule 26(a) disclosures, depositions, interrogatories, requests for documents and admissions, and answers thereto shall not be filed except on order of the court, or for use in a motion or at trial. c) The Rule 26(f) report filed by the parties is approved, and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless modified by the court herein or hereafter. d) Any motion to amend the pleadings or to join a party shall be made as soon as possible after counsel becomes aware of the grounds for the motion. e) No material designated confidential by any party shall be disclosed to anyone except counsel and their staffs until further order of the court. (No such material shall be filed with the court except in compliance with paragraph 2) (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 08/13/10. (cmar, )
August 13, 2010 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/13/2010. Appearance of counsel. Discovery plan approved. Discovery documents needed for settlement discussions addressed. Order to issue. (cmar, )
August 3, 2010 13 Discovery Plan by Firelight Media, Inc., Anne Pearse-Hocker.(O'Keefe, John)
July 29, 2010 Reset Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/13/2010 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. (pmil)
July 29, 2010 12 Featured Case ORDER that the initial pre-trial conference in this case, currently noticed for 08/04/10, shall be CONTINUED to 08/13/10 at 10:00 a.m. In advance of the initial pre-trial conference, the parties shall submit a revised joint discovery plan that complies with FRCP 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr. on 07/29/10. (pmil)
July 27, 2010 11 Discovery Plan by Firelight Media, Inc., Anne Pearse-Hocker.(O'Keefe, John)
July 16, 2010 10 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/4/2010 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. Discovery due by 11/12/2010. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/18/2010 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 7/16/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Pretrial Notice, # 2 Alexandria Magistrate Judge Cosent Form)(stas)
July 8, 2010 9 Featured Case ORDER granting application of Elizabeth C. Koch to appear pro hac vice; Filing fee $ 50.00, receipt number 14683014569. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 7/8/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt, # 2 Cover Letter)(stas)
June 22, 2010 8 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Firelight Media, Inc..(O'Keefe, John)
June 2, 2010 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Firelight Media, Inc. served on 5/18/2010, answer due 6/22/2010 (tche)
May 26, 2010 6 Featured Case CONSENT ORDER that defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by no later than June 22, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr. on 5/26/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter)(stas)
May 24, 2010 5 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Firelight Media, Inc.. (O'Keefe, John)
May 24, 2010 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John B. O'Keefe on behalf of Firelight Media, Inc. (O'Keefe, John)
May 11, 2010 3 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright: Copyright No. Ju 13546. (Sent to U.S. Copyright Office) (stas)
May 5, 2010 2 Summons Issued and given to attorney for service by SPS as to deft., Firelight Media, Inc. (stas)
May 5, 2010 1 COMPLAINT filed by Anne Pearse-Hocker against Firelight Media, Inc. (Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 14683013336). (Attachments: # 1 Receipt, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(stas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2010: # 3 Exhibit A to Complaint, # 4 Exhibit B to Complaint, # 5 Exhibit C to Complaint, # 6 Exhibit D to Complaint, # 7 Cover Letter) (stas, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Pearse-Hocker v. Firelight Media, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Pearse-Hocker
Represented By: Eric Nathan Heyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Firelight Media, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]