Rembrandt Social Media, LP v. Facebook, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Rembrandt Social Media, LP
Defendant: Facebook, Inc. and AddThis, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00158
Filed: February 4, 2013
 
Court: Virginia Eastern District Court
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Out of State
0 Judge: T. S. Ellis
1 Judge: Thomas Rawles Jones
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 17, 2013 367 USCA Case Number (re: Petition for permission to appeal filed in USCA) 14-111 USCA for the Federal Circuit. (rban, )
December 9, 2013 366 Featured Case ORDER granting 363 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 12/9/13. (gwalk, )
December 6, 2013 365 Featured Case ORDER, for reasons stated, and for good cause, ORDERED: that the question on the admissibility of plaintiffs expert report on damages, excluded by the Court, is CERTIFIED to the Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit; that this case is STAYED pending resolution of the expert reports admissibility by the Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit. (rmas)
December 6, 2013 364 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge T. S. Ellis, III:Final Pretrial Conference held on 4/18/2013: Appearances of counsel for plaintiff and defendants. The court certified, to the Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit, the question on the admissibility of plaintiff's expert report on damages, the court stays this case pending resolution of the expert report's admissibility by the Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit; the Jury Trial set for 12/11/2013 is vacated. (Court Reporter M. Rodriquez) (rmas)
December 5, 2013 363 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Clarissa Renee Skinner and Certification of Local Counsel Ahmed Davis Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3770652. by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Davis, Ahmed)
December 5, 2013 Set Deadlines/Hearings Pretrial Conference set for 12/6/2013 at 09:30 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (clar, )
December 4, 2013 361 NOTICE by Facebook, Inc. of Proposed Verdict Forms (Morton, Phillip)
December 4, 2013 360 Proposed Voir Dire by Facebook, Inc.. (Morton, Phillip)
December 4, 2013 359 Proposed Jury Instructions by Facebook, Inc.. (Morton, Phillip)
December 4, 2013 358 NOTICE by Rembrandt Social Media, LP of Plaintiff's Proposed Verdict Form (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Gopenko, Daniel)
December 4, 2013 357 Proposed Voir Dire by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Gopenko, Daniel)
December 4, 2013 356 Proposed Jury Instructions by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gopenko, Daniel)
December 3, 2013 362 Featured Case ORDER that defendant's re 291 MOTION in Limine 3 is GRANTED, and plaintiff's 301 MOTION in Limine 7 is DENIED. Plaintiff may not offer at trial any expert opinion disclosed in the two stricken rebuttal reports. ORDERED that defendant's 291 motion in limine 2 is DENIED AS MOOT in view of the partieS' agreement that no evidence relating to the interaction or lack of interaction between AOL and Aduna will be offered at trial. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 12/3/13. (klau, )
December 3, 2013 355 Featured Case ORDER that the parties' 348 Joint Motion is GRANTED ; counsel of record for each party may bring electronic equipment listed on Exhibit A to the Joint Motion to Allow Electronic Equipment into Court beginning on 12/09/13 (and each day of trial thereafter) for use with the Court's electronic presentation system during the trial in this matter (except no cell phones or internet access devices will be permitted); the parties advise the Court's Technology Administrator of their intent to use their electronic equipment with the Court's electronic presentation system during trial and make arrangements to set up and test their equipment on 12/09/13. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 12/03/13. (pmil, )
December 3, 2013 354 Featured Case ORDER that the parties are DIRECTED to appear for a pretrial conference at 9:30 a.m. on Friday, December 6, 2013 to discuss issues regarding the upcoming trial, including the effect of the Court's recent order excluding plaintiff's damages report and related testimony. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 12/3/13. (klau, )
December 3, 2013 353 Featured Case ORDER denying 201 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 12/3/13. (klau, )
December 3, 2013 352 Featured Case ORDER that defendant's 236 Motion to Exclude is GRANTED with respect to testimony of Dr. Golbeck regarding "privacy level information" that is inconsistent with the Court's construction. ORDERED that defendant's motion is GRANTED with respect to testimony of Dr. Golbeck regarding whether prior art references are properly combinable. ORDERED that defendant's motion is GRANTED with respect to the Golbeck Declaration, which is excluded as untimely. ORDERED that defendant's motion is GRANTED with respect to testimony of Dr. Golbeck regarding Facebook's commercial success (see order for details) Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 12/3/13. (klau, ) Modified text on 12/4/2013 (klau, ).
December 3, 2013 351 Featured Case ORDER that defendant's 239 Motion to Exclude is GRANTED. Mr. Malackowski's expert damages report and testimony is excluded under Rule 702, Fed. R. Evid., and Daubert v. MerrellDow Pharmaceuticals, Inc., 509 U.S. 579 (1993).. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 12/3/13. (klau, )
December 3, 2013 350 (REDACTED) MEMORANDUM OPINION re Defendant's Motion to Exclude. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 12/3/13. (klau, )
December 3, 2013 349 Sealed MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 12/3/13. (klau, )
December 3, 2013 348 Consent MOTION for an order to allow electronic equipment into the courtroom of the Honorable T. S. Ellis, III by Facebook, Inc., Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Gopenko, Daniel)
December 2, 2013 347 NOTICE by Rembrandt Social Media, LP re Request for Daily Transcript of Trial Proceedings (Gopenko, Daniel)
December 2, 2013 346 NOTICE by Facebook, Inc. re Request for Daily Transcript of Trial Proceedings (Morton, Phillip)
November 27, 2013 345 Featured Case ORDER granting 340 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 11/27/2013. (rban, )
November 27, 2013 344 Brief in Support to 298 MOTION in Limine , 301 MOTION in Limine Rembrandt's Supplemental Brief re Facebook's Motions in Limine Nos. 2 and 3 and Rembrandt's Motion in Limine No. 7 (Pursuant to November 15, 2013 Order) filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Gopenko, Daniel)
November 27, 2013 343 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 291 MOTION in Limine Facebook's Supplemental Brief Re Facebook's Motions in Limine Nos. 2 and 3 and Rembrandt's Motion in Limine No. 7 (Pursuant to November 15, 2013 Order) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Morton, Phillip)
November 27, 2013 342 Brief in Support to 291 MOTION in Limine Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Supplemental Brief re Facebook's Motions in Limine Nos. 2 and 3 and Rembrandt's Motion in Limine No. 7 (Pursuant to November 15, 2013 Order) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Morton, Phillip)
November 26, 2013 341 Featured Case ORDER granting 339 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 11/26/13. (klau, )
November 26, 2013 340 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Rebecca Charnas Grant and Certification of Local Counsel Ahmed J. Davis Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3761180. by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Davis, Ahmed)
November 25, 2013 339 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Juanita Rose Brooks and Certification of Local Counsel Ahmed J. Davis Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3757861. by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Davis, Ahmed)
November 22, 2013 338 Defendant's First Amended Trial Exhibit List by Facebook, Inc... (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Morton, Phillip)
November 20, 2013 335 Sealed Documents - Exhibit F re 293 Affidavit in Support of Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G, # 2 Exhibit H, # 3 Exhibit I, # 4 Exhibit K)(cmar, )
November 15, 2013 337 Featured Case ORDER, for the reasons stated from the bench, Defendant's motion in limine 1 is DENIED AS MOOT in view of the parties' agreement as reflected in the transcript of the hearing. Defendant's motion in limine 2 is DENIED IN PART and TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT IN PART. Specifically, it is DENIED AS MOOT with regard to statements made by AOL, in view of the parties' agreement as reflected in the transcript of the hearing, and it is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT with regard to offers made to AOL. Parties are directed to submit further simultaneous briefing on the issue by 11/28/2013 by 5:00 p.m. Defendant's motion in limine 3 is DENIED IN PART and TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT IN PART. Specifically, it is DENIED AS MOOT with regard to Quickling, Auto Update, and Infinite Scroll, in view of the parties' agreement as reflected in the transcript of the hearing, and it is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT with regard to rebuttal testimony of Mr. Malackowski and Dr. Van Liere. Parties are directed to submit further simultaneous briefing on this issue by 11/28/2013 by 5:00 p.m. Defendant's motion in limine 4 is DENIED AS MOOT in view of the parties' agreement as reflected in the transcript of the hearing. Defendant's motion in limine 5 is DENIED. Specifically, it is DENIED AS MOOT with regard to inquiries into whether witnesses are employees and whether they hold stock, in view of the parties' agreement as reflected in the transcript of the hearing. It is DENIED with regard to how much stock each witness owns. Parties are allowed to ask a public shareholder specifically how much stock that shareholder owns, and parties are allowed to ask a non-public shareholder if that shareholder owns a substantial volume of stock. The defendant's motion in limine 6 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Specifically, it is GRANTED with regard to documents Facebook produced during discovery and public third-party documents. It is DENIED with regard to Facebook documents that should have been produced, but were not produced, during discovery. Defendant's motion in limine 7 is GRANTED. Plaintiff may not present evidence regarding defendant's settlements with the FTC. Plaintiff's motion in limine 1 is DENIED AS MOOT in view of the parties' agreement as reflected in the transcript of the hearing. Plaintiff's motion in limine 2 is DENIED AS MOOT in view of the parties' agreement as reflected in the transcript of the hearing. Plaintiff's motion in limine 3 is DENIED AS MOOT in view of the parties' agreement as reflected in the transcript of the hearing. Plaintiff's motion in limine 4 is DENIED AS MOOT in view of the parties' agreement as reflected in the transcript of the hearing. Plaintiff's motion in limine 5 is DENIED. Defendant is precluded from referring to plaintiff as a "patent troll" but may use terms such as "patent aggregator" and "non-practicing entity". Plaintiff's motion in limine 6 is DENIED AS MOOT in view of the parties' agreement as reflected in the transcript of the hearing. Plaintiff's motion in limine 7 is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Parties are directed to submit further simultaneous briefing on this issue by 11/28/2013 by 5:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 11/15/2013. (rmas)
November 15, 2013 336 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge T. S. Ellis, III: Motion Hearing held on 11/15/2013 re: 298 MOTION in Limine filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP, 291 MOTION in Limine filed by Facebook, Inc., and 301 MOTION in Limine filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. Counsel for plaintiff and defendant's present. Defendant's motion in limine 1 is DENIED AS MOOT. Defendant's motion in limine 2 is DENIED IN PART and TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT IN PART. Parties are directed to submit further simultaneous briefing on the issue by 11/28/2013 by 5:00 p.m. Defendant's motion in limine 3 is DENIED IN PART and TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT IN PART. Parties are directed to submit further simultaneous briefing on this issue by 11/28/2013 by 5:00 p.m. Defendant's motion in limine 4 is DENIED AS MOOT. Defendant's motion in limine 5 is DENIED. Defendant's motion in limine 6 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Defendant's motion in limine 7 is GRANTED. Plaintiff's motion in limine 1 is DENIED AS MOOT. Plaintiff's motion in limine 2 is DENIED AS MOOT. Plaintiff's motion in limine 3 is DENIED AS MOOT. Plaintiff's motion in limine 4 is DENIED AS MOOT. Plaintiff's motion in limine 5 is DENIED. Plaintiff's motion in limine 6 is DENIED AS MOOT. Plaintiff's motion in limine 7 is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Parties are directed to submit further simultaneous briefing on this issue by 11/28/2013 by 5:00 p.m. (Court Reporter M. Rodriquez)(rmas)
November 15, 2013 333 Featured Case For the reasons stated from the bench, and in accord with specific rulings made at that time, it is ORDERED that the motions to seal docketed as nos. 295 , 310 , 318 and 323 are GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 11/15/13. (cmar, )
November 15, 2013 332 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr:Motion Hearing held on 11/15/2013 re 310 MOTION to Seal Rembrandt's Motion to File Under Seal an Unredacted Version of Its Opposition to Facebook's Motions In Limine and Exhibits 6, 7, and 11 to the Gopenko Declaration filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP, 295 MOTION to Seal Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to File Under Seal an Unredacted Version of Its Memorandum in Support of Its Motion in Limine and Exhibits F, G, H, I and K to the Declaration of Paul Batcher in Support Thereof filed by Facebook, Inc., 318 MOTION to Seal Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to File Under Seal an Unredacted Version of Its Rebuttal Brief in Support of Its Motions in Limine filed by Facebook, Inc., 323 MOTION to Seal Rembrandt's Motion to File Under Seal an Unredacted Version of Its Rebuttal in Support of Its Motions in Limine and Exhibits 1, 2, and 3 to the Gopenko Declaration filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. Appearances of counsel. Motions to seal (nos. 295 , 310 , 318 and 323 ) GRANTED. Order to follow. (Tape #FTR.)(cmar, )
November 14, 2013 334 Featured Case ORDER granting 327 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 11/14/13. (klau, )
November 14, 2013 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Jones. 310 MOTION to Seal Rembrandt's Motion to File Under Seal an Unredacted Version of Its Opposition to Facebook's Motions In Limine and Exhibits 6, 7, and 11 to the Gopenko Declaration, 295 MOTION to Seal Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to File Under Seal an Unredacted Version of Its Memorandum in Support of Its Motion in Limine and Exhibits F, G, H, I and K to the Declaration of Paul Batcher in Support Thereof, 318 MOTION to Seal Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to File Under Seal an Unredacted Version of Its Rebuttal Brief in Support of Its Motions in Limine, 323 MOTION to Seal Rembrandt's Motion to File Under Seal an Unredacted Version of Its Rebuttal in Support of Its Motions in Limine and Exhibits 1, 2, and 3 to the Gopenko Declaration (clar, )
November 14, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 295 MOTION to Seal Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to File Under Seal an Unredacted Version of Its Memorandum in Support of Its Motion in Limine and Exhibits F, G, H, I and K to the Declaration of Paul Batcher in Support Thereof, 318 MOTION to Seal Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to File Under Seal an Unredacted Version of Its Rebuttal Brief in Support of Its Motions in Limine, 323 MOTION to Seal Rembrandt's Motion to File Under Seal an Unredacted Version of Its Rebuttal in Support of Its Motions in Limine and Exhibits 1, 2, and 3 to the Gopenko Declaration, 310 MOTION to Seal Rembrandt's Motion to File Under Seal an Unredacted Version of Its Opposition to Facebook's Motions In Limine and Exhibits 6, 7, and 11 to the Gopenko Declaration. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2013 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. (Per TSE chambers) (clar, )
November 14, 2013 331 CERTIFICATE of Service re 322 Affidavit by Daniel Robert Gopenko on behalf of Rembrandt Social Media, LP (Gopenko, Daniel)
November 14, 2013 Notice of Correction re 329 Certificate of Service, An incomplete, document was filed. The filing user has been notified to refile the document. (klau, )
November 14, 2013 330 Sealed Document re 321 Rebuttal Brief, 326 Memorandum in Support,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Cover Letter)(clar, )
November 13, 2013 329 CERTIFICATE of Service re 322 Affidavit by Daniel Robert Gopenko on behalf of Rembrandt Social Media, LP (Gopenko, Daniel)
November 13, 2013 328 Sealed Document - Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Rebuttal Brief in Support Its Motions in Limine re 316 Rebuttal Brief. (Attachments: # 1 Letter)(klau, )
November 13, 2013 327 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul Batcher and Certification of Local Counsel Phillip E. Morton by Facebook, Inc.. (Morton, Phillip)
November 13, 2013 Electronic Fee Payment - Pro Hac Vice by Facebook, Inc.. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3743428.. (Morton, Phillip)
November 12, 2013 326 Memorandum in Support re 323 MOTION to Seal Rembrandt's Motion to File Under Seal an Unredacted Version of Its Rebuttal in Support of Its Motions in Limine and Exhibits 1, 2, and 3 to the Gopenko Declaration filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Gopenko, Daniel)
November 12, 2013 325 Notice of Hearing Date set for 11/15/2013 re 323 MOTION to Seal Rembrandt's Motion to File Under Seal an Unredacted Version of Its Rebuttal in Support of Its Motions in Limine and Exhibits 1, 2, and 3 to the Gopenko Declaration (Gopenko, Daniel)
November 12, 2013 324 Memorandum in Support re 323 MOTION to Seal Rembrandt's Motion to File Under Seal an Unredacted Version of Its Rebuttal in Support of Its Motions in Limine and Exhibits 1, 2, and 3 to the Gopenko Declaration filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Gopenko, Daniel)
November 12, 2013 323 MOTION to Seal Rembrandt's Motion to File Under Seal an Unredacted Version of Its Rebuttal in Support of Its Motions in Limine and Exhibits 1, 2, and 3 to the Gopenko Declaration by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gopenko, Daniel)
November 12, 2013 322 AFFIDAVIT/Declaration of Daniel Gopenko re 321 Rebuttal Brief by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Gopenko, Daniel) Modified text on 11/13/2013 (klau, ).
November 12, 2013 321 Rebuttal Brief re 298 MOTION in Limine , 301 MOTION in Limine filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Gopenko, Daniel)
November 12, 2013 320 Notice of Hearing Date set for 11/15/2013 re 318 MOTION to Seal Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to File Under Seal an Unredacted Version of Its Rebuttal Brief in Support of Its Motions in Limine (Morton, Phillip)
November 12, 2013 319 Memorandum in Support re 318 MOTION to Seal Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to File Under Seal an Unredacted Version of Its Rebuttal Brief in Support of Its Motions in Limine filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Morton, Phillip)
November 12, 2013 318 MOTION to Seal Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to File Under Seal an Unredacted Version of Its Rebuttal Brief in Support of Its Motions in Limine by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Morton, Phillip)
November 12, 2013 317 AFFIDAVIT/Declaration of Paul Batcher in Support re 291 MOTION in Limine Rebuttal Brief filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Morton, Phillip) Modified text on 11/13/2013 (klau, ).
November 12, 2013 316 Rebuttal Brief re 291 MOTION in Limine filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Morton, Phillip)
November 8, 2013 315 NOTICE by Facebook, Inc. Notice Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 282 (Morton, Phillip)
November 6, 2013 314 Under Seal Exhibits in re 309 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 7, # 2 Exhibit 11, # 3 Cover Letter)(clar, )
November 6, 2013 313 Sealed Document re 308 Memorandum in Opposition. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter)(clar, )
November 5, 2013 Set Deadlines as to 310 MOTION to Seal Rembrandt's Motion to File Under Seal an Unredacted Version of Its Opposition to Facebook's Motions In Limine and Exhibits 6, 7, and 11 to the Gopenko Declaration. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2013 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (clar, )
November 4, 2013 312 Notice of Hearing Date set for 11/15/2013 re 310 MOTION to Seal Rembrandt's Motion to File Under Seal an Unredacted Version of Its Opposition to Facebook's Motions In Limine and Exhibits 6, 7, and 11 to the Gopenko Declaration (Gopenko, Daniel)
November 4, 2013 311 Memorandum in Support re 310 MOTION to Seal Rembrandt's Motion to File Under Seal an Unredacted Version of Its Opposition to Facebook's Motions In Limine and Exhibits 6, 7, and 11 to the Gopenko Declaration filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Gopenko, Daniel)
November 4, 2013 310 MOTION to Seal Rembrandt's Motion to File Under Seal an Unredacted Version of Its Opposition to Facebook's Motions In Limine and Exhibits 6, 7, and 11 to the Gopenko Declaration by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gopenko, Daniel)
November 4, 2013 309 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 291 MOTION in Limine filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20)(Gopenko, Daniel)
November 4, 2013 308 Memorandum in Opposition re 291 MOTION in Limine filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Gopenko, Daniel)
November 4, 2013 307 AFFIDAVIT of Paul Batcher in Support of Defendant's Opposition re 298 MOTION in Limine , 301 MOTION in Limine filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Morton, Phillip) Modified text on 11/5/2013 (klau, ).
November 4, 2013 306 Memorandum in Opposition re 298 MOTION in Limine , 301 MOTION in Limine filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Morton, Phillip)
October 25, 2013 305 Sealed Document - Exhibit A re 296 Memorandum in Support,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit D, # 4 Exhibit E, # 5 Exhibit F, # 6 Letter)(klau, )
October 25, 2013 Set Deadlines as to 295 MOTION to Seal Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to File Under Seal an Unredacted Version of Its Memorandum in Support of Its Motion in Limine and Exhibits F, G, H, I and K to the Declaration of Paul Batcher in Support Thereof, 298 MOTION in Limine , 301 MOTION in Limine . Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2013 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (clar, )
October 25, 2013 Set Deadlines as to 301 MOTION in Limine . Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2013 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (clar, )
October 24, 2013 304 AFFIDAVIT re 301 MOTION in Limine by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Gopenko, Daniel)
October 24, 2013 303 Notice of Hearing Date set for 11/15/2013 re 301 MOTION in Limine (Gopenko, Daniel)
October 24, 2013 302 Memorandum in Support re 301 MOTION in Limine No. 7 to Allow Rebuttal Testimony of Mr. Malackowski and Dr. Van Liere filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Gopenko, Daniel)
October 24, 2013 301 MOTION in Limine by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gopenko, Daniel)
October 24, 2013 300 Notice of Hearing Date set for 11/15/2013 re 298 MOTION in Limine (Gopenko, Daniel)
October 24, 2013 299 Memorandum in Support re 298 MOTION in Limine filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Gopenko, Daniel)
October 24, 2013 298 MOTION in Limine by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gopenko, Daniel)
October 24, 2013 297 Notice of Hearing Date set for 11/15/2013 re 295 MOTION to Seal Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to File Under Seal an Unredacted Version of Its Memorandum in Support of Its Motion in Limine and Exhibits F, G, H, I and K to the Declaration of Paul Batcher in Support Thereof (Morton, Phillip)
October 24, 2013 296 Memorandum in Support re 295 MOTION to Seal Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to File Under Seal an Unredacted Version of Its Memorandum in Support of Its Motion in Limine and Exhibits F, G, H, I and K to the Declaration of Paul Batcher in Support Thereof filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Morton, Phillip)
October 24, 2013 295 MOTION to Seal Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to File Under Seal an Unredacted Version of Its Memorandum in Support of Its Motion in Limine and Exhibits F, G, H, I and K to the Declaration of Paul Batcher in Support Thereof by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Morton, Phillip)
October 24, 2013 294 Notice of Hearing Date set for 11/15/2013 re 291 MOTION in Limine (Morton, Phillip)
October 24, 2013 293 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 291 MOTION in Limine filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Morton, Phillip)
October 24, 2013 292 Memorandum in Support re 291 MOTION in Limine filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Morton, Phillip)
October 24, 2013 291 MOTION in Limine by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Morton, Phillip)
October 20, 2013 290 First Amended Exhibit List by Rembrandt Social Media, LP.. (Gopenko, Daniel)
October 15, 2013 289 Sealed Document. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C Part 1, # 3 Exhibit C Part 2, # 4 Exhibit C Part 3, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E Part 1, # 7 Exhibit E Part 2, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Cover Letter)(clar, )
October 15, 2013 287 Sealed Document (clar, )
October 11, 2013 288 Featured Case ORDER:The matter came before the Court on defendant's motion to exclude the testimony of Dr. Jennifer Golbeck [Doc. 236] and motion to exclude the testimony of James E. Malackowski [Doc. 239]. The matter was fully briefed and argued.For the reasons stated from the bench,It is hereby ORDERED that the matter is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 10/11/2013. (jall)
October 11, 2013 286 Featured Case ORDER granting 280 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 10/11/2013. (rban, )
October 11, 2013 285 Featured Case For the reasons stated from the bench, and in accord with specific rulings made at that time, it is ORDERED that the motions to seal docketed as nos. 243 , 258 , and 271 are GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 10/11/13. (cmar, )
October 11, 2013 284 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr:Motion Hearing held on 10/11/2013 re 243 MOTION to Seal an Unredacted Version of Its Memorandum and Exhibits 1, 3, 4, 5, 7 and 10 to the Declaration of Paul Batcher in Support of Its Motion to Exclude Testimony filed by Facebook, Inc., 271 MOTION to Seal an Unredacted Version of Facebook's Rebuttal Brief in Support of Its Motion to Exclude Testimony of James E. Malackowski filed by Facebook, Inc., 258 MOTION to Seal Unredacted version of Rembrandt's Opposition to Facebook's Motion to Exclude the Testimony of James E. Malackowski and Exhibits 1, 2, and 12 to the Gopenko Declaration filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. Appearance of counsel for deft. Matter is uncontested. Motions to seal (nos. 243 , 258 , and 271 ) - GRANTED. Order to follow. (Tape #FTR.)(cmar, )
October 11, 2013 283 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge T. S. Ellis, III:Motion Hearing held on 10/11/2013 re 239 MOTION to Exclude The Testimony of James E. Malackowski filed by Facebook, Inc., 236 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Jennifer A.Golbeck filed by Facebook, Inc.Appearances of Counsel for Pltf. and Deft.Matters argued and TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT.Order to follow. (Court Reporter M. Rodriguez.)(jall)
October 9, 2013 282 Featured Case ORDER re 279 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall strike his appearance and remove him from the CM/ECF service list in this matter. ORDERED that parties need not serve any further pleadings, motions, or other papers on John Shepherd Kyle in this matter. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 10/9/13. (klau, )
October 9, 2013 280 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth L. Stameshkin and Certification of Local Counsel Phillip E. Morton Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3700787. by Facebook, Inc.. (Morton, Phillip)
October 9, 2013 279 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney John Shepherd Kyle by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Morton, Phillip)
October 8, 2013 278 Objection to 252 Exhibit List filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Gopenko, Daniel)
October 8, 2013 277 Objection to 248 Exhibit List filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Morton, Phillip)
October 7, 2013 281 Featured Case ORDER granting 276 Consent Motion for Permission to Use the Court's Evidence Presentation System During the Hearing on Daubert Motions ORDERED that the parties have permission to use the Court's evidence presentation system during the October 11, 2013 hearing on Daubert motions and that the parties may each bring a notebook computer or laptop and related accessories into the courtroom of the Honorable T. S. Ellis, III on October 11, 2013 for use in conjunction with the Court's evidence presentation system during the hearing on Doubert motions. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 10/7/13. (klau, )
October 7, 2013 276 Consent MOTION Permission to Use the Court's Evidence Presentation System During the Hearing on Daubert Motions re 239 MOTION to Exclude The Testimony of James E. Malackowski, 236 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Jennifer A.Golbeck by Facebook, Inc., Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gopenko, Daniel)
October 7, 2013 274 CERTIFICATE of Service re 270 Affidavit in Support of Motion, by Phillip Edward Morton on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Morton, Phillip)
October 7, 2013 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Jones. 271 MOTION to Seal an Unredacted Version of Facebook's Rebuttal Brief in Support of Its Motion to Exclude Testimony of James E. Malackowski (clar, )
October 7, 2013 Set Deadlines as to 271 MOTION to Seal an Unredacted Version of Facebook's Rebuttal Brief in Support of Its Motion to Exclude Testimony of James E. Malackowski. Motion Hearing set for 10/11/2013 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. (clar, )
October 4, 2013 275 Featured Case ORDER granting 267 Consent Motion Regarding Motions In Limine Briefing Schedule,ORDERED that the following deadlines are hereby set: Opening Motions in Limine (Proposed Deadline 10/24/2013) ----- Hearing (Proposed Deadline 11/15/13) (see order for details). Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 10/4/13. (klau, )
October 4, 2013 273 Notice of Hearing Date set for 10/11/2013 re 271 MOTION to Seal an Unredacted Version of Facebook's Rebuttal Brief in Support of Its Motion to Exclude Testimony of James E. Malackowski (Morton, Phillip)
October 4, 2013 272 Memorandum in Support re 271 MOTION to Seal an Unredacted Version of Facebook's Rebuttal Brief in Support of Its Motion to Exclude Testimony of James E. Malackowski filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Morton, Phillip)
October 4, 2013 271 MOTION to Seal an Unredacted Version of Facebook's Rebuttal Brief in Support of Its Motion to Exclude Testimony of James E. Malackowski by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Morton, Phillip)
October 4, 2013 270 Supplemental Declaration of Paul Batcher in Support re 239 MOTION to Exclude The Testimony of James E. Malackowski filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Morton, Phillip) Modified text on 10/7/2013 (klau, ).
October 4, 2013 269 Rebuttal Brief re 239 MOTION to Exclude The Testimony of James E. Malackowski filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Morton, Phillip)
October 4, 2013 268 Rebuttal Brief re 236 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Jennifer A.Golbeck filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Morton, Phillip)
October 3, 2013 267 Consent MOTION Regarding Motions In Limine Briefing Schedule by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Morton, Phillip)
October 2, 2013 266 Featured Case ORDER granting 265 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. ORDERED that the Facebook's Daubert motion reply briefs are due on Friday, October 4, 2013. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 10/2/13. (klau, )
October 2, 2013 265 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re Daubert Motion Reply Brief Deadline by Facebook, Inc., Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Morton, Phillip) Modified on 10/3/2013 to add party filer (klau, ).
October 2, 2013 Notice of Correction re 262 NOTICE, 261 NOTICE. Incorrect Docket Events. (clar, )
October 2, 2013 Reset Deadlines as to 258 MOTION to Seal Unredacted version of Rembrandt's Opposition to Facebook's Motion to Exclude the Testimony of James E. Malackowski and Exhibits 1, 2, and 12 to the Gopenko Declaration, 243 MOTION to Seal an Unredacted Version of Its Memorandum and Exhibits 1, 3, 4, 5, 7 and 10 to the Declaration of Paul Batcher in Support of Its Motion to Exclude Testimony. Motion Hearing set for 10/11/2013 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. (Per TRJ chambers) (clar, )
October 2, 2013 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Jones. 243 MOTION to Seal an Unredacted Version of Its Memorandum and Exhibits 1, 3, 4, 5, 7 and 10 to the Declaration of Paul Batcher in Support of Its Motion to Exclude Testimony, 258 MOTION to Seal Unredacted version of Rembrandt's Opposition to Facebook's Motion to Exclude the Testimony of James E. Malackowski and Exhibits 1, 2, and 12 to the Gopenko Declaration (clar, )
October 2, 2013 Reset Deadlines as to 258 MOTION to Seal Unredacted version of Rembrandt's Opposition to Facebook's Motion to Exclude the Testimony of James E. Malackowski and Exhibits 1, 2, and 12 to the Gopenko Declaration, 243 MOTION to Seal an Unredacted Version of Its Memorandum and Exhibits 1, 3, 4, 5, 7 and 10 to the Declaration of Paul Batcher in Support of Its Motion to Exclude Testimony. Motion Hearing set for 10/4/2013 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. (Per TSE chambers) (clar, )
October 1, 2013 Reset Deadlines as to 239 MOTION to Exclude The Testimony of James E. Malackowski, 236 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Jennifer A.Golbeck. Motion Hearing set for 10/11/2013 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (klau, )
October 1, 2013 263 Featured Case ORDER re Defendant's 239 MOTION to Exclude The Testimony of James E. Malackowski 236 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Jennifer A.Golbeck, ORDERED that the hearing on these motions is CONTINUED until Friday, October 11,2013 at 11 a.m. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 10/1/13. (klau, )
October 1, 2013 262 Objections and Counter-Designations to Plaintiff Rembrandt Social Media, LP's Deposition Designations and Objections to Plaintiff's Witness List by Facebook, Inc. re 249 NOTICE, 247 Witness List (Morton, Phillip) Modified text on 10/2/2013 (clar, ).
October 1, 2013 261 Objections to Facebook, Inc's Pretrial Disclosures by Rembrandt Social Media, LP re 251 NOTICE, 250 Witness List, 252 Exhibit List (Gopenko, Daniel) Modified text on 10/2/2013 (clar, ).
September 30, 2013 264 Sealed Document re 257 Opposition, 256 Opposition,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 12, # 4 Cover Letter)(clar, )
September 30, 2013 Set Deadlines as to 258 MOTION to Seal Unredacted version of Rembrandt's Opposition to Facebook's Motion to Exclude the Testimony of James E. Malackowski and Exhibits 1, 2, and 12 to the Gopenko Declaration. Motion Hearing set for 10/4/2013 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (clar, )
September 27, 2013 260 Notice of Hearing Date re 258 MOTION to Seal Unredacted version of Rembrandt's Opposition to Facebook's Motion to Exclude the Testimony of James E. Malackowski and Exhibits 1, 2, and 12 to the Gopenko Declaration (Gopenko, Daniel)
September 27, 2013 259 Memorandum in Support re 258 MOTION to Seal Unredacted version of Rembrandt's Opposition to Facebook's Motion to Exclude the Testimony of James E. Malackowski and Exhibits 1, 2, and 12 to the Gopenko Declaration filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Gopenko, Daniel)
September 27, 2013 258 MOTION to Seal Unredacted version of Rembrandt's Opposition to Facebook's Motion to Exclude the Testimony of James E. Malackowski and Exhibits 1, 2, and 12 to the Gopenko Declaration by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gopenko, Daniel)
September 27, 2013 257 Opposition to 236 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Jennifer A.Golbeck filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Gopenko Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14)(Gopenko, Daniel)
September 27, 2013 256 Opposition to 239 MOTION to Exclude The Testimony of James E. Malackowski filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Gopenko, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14)(Gopenko, Daniel)
September 23, 2013 Set Deadlines as to 243 MOTION to Seal an Unredacted Version of Its Memorandum and Exhibits 1, 3, 4, 5, 7 and 10 to the Declaration of Paul Batcher in Support of Its Motion to Exclude Testimony, 239 MOTION to Exclude The Testimony of James E. Malackowski, 236 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Jennifer A.Golbeck. Motion Hearing set for 10/4/2013 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (clar, )
September 20, 2013 255 Featured Case ORDER: The matter came before the Courton defendant's motion for summaryjudgment (Dot 201 . The matter was fully briefed and argued For the reasons stated from the bench, It is hereby ORDERED that the matter is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 9/20/13. (tfitz, )
September 20, 2013 254 Featured Case ORDER following a final pre-trial conference, for good cause, SCHEDULING a jury trial for Tuesday, 12/10/13 at 10:00 a.m. Parties are directed to submit jury instructions and a verdict form by Wednesday, 12/4/13 at 5:00 p.m. /s/ by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 9/20/13. (tbul, )
September 20, 2013 253 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge T. S. Ellis, III: Motion Hearing held along with Final Pretrial Conference on 9/20/2013. Appearances: Kolodney, Davis, Melsheimen, Gopenko and Hillman for Pltff; Graves, Keith, Weinstein and Rhodes for Defts. 201 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Facebook, Inc. - heard and T.U.A. Jury Trial set for 12/10/2013 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. 5 days - Tues., Wed., Thurs., and Tues. and Wed. of the following wk. 8 or 7 jurors, all to deliberate. 4 strikes ea. side. Parties to submit verdict form and jury instructions by 12/4/13 5:00 p.m. for the Court's review. Order to follow. (Court Reporter M. Rodriquez.)(tbul, ) Corrected on 9/23/2013 (tbul, ).
September 20, 2013 252 Proposed Trial Exhibit List by Facebook, Inc... (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Morton, Phillip)
September 20, 2013 251 NOTICE by Facebook, Inc. of Deposition Designations (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Morton, Phillip)
September 20, 2013 250 Trial Witness List by Facebook, Inc.. (Morton, Phillip)
September 20, 2013 249 NOTICE by Rembrandt Social Media, LP of Deposition Designations (Gopenko, Daniel)
September 20, 2013 248 Exhibit List by Rembrandt Social Media, LP.. (Gopenko, Daniel)
September 20, 2013 247 Trial Witness List by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Gopenko, Daniel)
September 20, 2013 246 Statement of Undisputed Facts by Facebook, Inc., Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Gopenko, Daniel)
September 20, 2013 245 Notice of Hearing Date set for 10/04/2013 re 243 MOTION to Seal an Unredacted Version of Its Memorandum and Exhibits 1, 3, 4, 5, 7 and 10 to the Declaration of Paul Batcher in Support of Its Motion to Exclude Testimony (Morton, Phillip)
September 20, 2013 244 Memorandum in Support re 243 MOTION to Seal an Unredacted Version of Its Memorandum and Exhibits 1, 3, 4, 5, 7 and 10 to the Declaration of Paul Batcher in Support of Its Motion to Exclude Testimony filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Morton, Phillip)
September 20, 2013 243 MOTION to Seal an Unredacted Version of Its Memorandum and Exhibits 1, 3, 4, 5, 7 and 10 to the Declaration of Paul Batcher in Support of Its Motion to Exclude Testimony by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Morton, Phillip)
September 20, 2013 242 Notice of Hearing Date set for 10/04/2013 re 239 MOTION to Exclude The Testimony of James E. Malackowski (Morton, Phillip)
September 20, 2013 241 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 239 MOTION to Exclude The Testimony of James E. Malackowski, 236 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Jennifer A.Golbeck filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18)(Morton, Phillip)
September 20, 2013 240 Memorandum in Support re 239 MOTION to Exclude The Testimony of James E. Malackowski filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Morton, Phillip)
September 20, 2013 239 MOTION to Exclude The Testimony of James E. Malackowski by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Morton, Phillip)
September 20, 2013 238 Notice of Hearing Date set for 10/04/2013 re 236 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Jennifer A.Golbeck (Morton, Phillip)
September 20, 2013 237 Memorandum in Support re 236 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Jennifer A.Golbeck filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Morton, Phillip)
September 20, 2013 236 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Jennifer A.Golbeck by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Morton, Phillip)
September 18, 2013 235 Featured Case ORDER granting 227 Consent Motion Regarding Daubert Motion Briefing Schedule. ORDERED that the following deadlines are hereby set: Opening Daubert Motion deadline 9/20/13 ---- Hearing deadline 10/4/2013 (see order for details). Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 9/18/13. (klau, )
September 18, 2013 234 Featured Case ORDER granting 226 Consent Motion to Extend Deadlines to Exchange Copies of Exhibits and Objections to Exhibits. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 9/18/13. (klau, )
September 18, 2013 233 Sealed Document re 229 (Exhibit 1 part 5).(gwalk, )
September 18, 2013 232 Sealed Document re 229 (Exhibit 1 Part 4). (gwalk, )
September 18, 2013 231 Sealed Document re 229 Exhibit 1 Part 2 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 part 3).(gwalk, )
September 18, 2013 230 Sealed Document re 229 . Exhibit 1 Part 1 (gwalk, )
September 18, 2013 229 SEALED DOCUMENT re 219 Opposition filed by plaintiff. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3, # 2 Exhibit 4, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Letter)(gwalk, ) Modified on 9/18/2013 to edit the docket text (rban, ).
September 18, 2013 228 Consent MOTION Preferred Trial Date and Length of Trial by Facebook, Inc., Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Davis, Ahmed)
September 18, 2013 Set Deadlines as to 220 MOTION to Seal UNREDACTED VERSION OF ITS OPPOSITION TO FACEBOOK'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, EXHIBIT 1 TO MALACKOWSKI DECLARATION, GOLBECK DECLARATION, AND EXHIBITS 3 AND 4 TO GOPENKO DECLARATION. Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2013 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (clar, )
September 18, 2013 227 Consent MOTION Regarding Daubert Motion Briefing Schedule by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Graves, Jonathan)
September 17, 2013 226 Consent MOTION for Extension of Deadlines to Exchange Copies of Exhibits and for Objections to Exhibits by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Morton, Phillip)
September 17, 2013 225 Featured Case ORDER granting 223 Consent Motion for Permission to Use the Court's Evidence Presentation System During Summary Judgment Hearing. ORDERED that the parties have permission to use the Court's evidence presentation system during the September 20, 2013 Summary Judgment Hearing and that the parties may each bring a notebook computer or laptop and related accessories into the courtroom of the Honorable T. S. Ellis, III on September 20, 2013 for use in conjunction with the Court's evidence presentation system during the Summary Judgment hearing. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 9/17/13. (klau, )
September 16, 2013 224 Rebuttal Brief re 201 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Phillip E. Morton, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Morton, Phillip)
September 16, 2013 223 Consent MOTION Permission to Use the Court's Evidence Presentation System During Summary Judgment Hearing by Facebook, Inc., Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gopenko, Daniel)
September 16, 2013 Reset Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/20/2013 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. Pursuant to Order DE # 186 filed on 7/29/13. (gwalk, )
September 9, 2013 222 NOTICE by Rembrandt Social Media, LP re 220 MOTION to Seal UNREDACTED VERSION OF ITS OPPOSITION TO FACEBOOK'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, EXHIBIT 1 TO MALACKOWSKI DECLARATION, GOLBECK DECLARATION, AND EXHIBITS 3 AND 4 TO GOPENKO DECLARATION (Gopenko, Daniel)
September 9, 2013 221 Memorandum in Support re 220 MOTION to Seal UNREDACTED VERSION OF ITS OPPOSITION TO FACEBOOK'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, EXHIBIT 1 TO MALACKOWSKI DECLARATION, GOLBECK DECLARATION, AND EXHIBITS 3 AND 4 TO GOPENKO DECLARATION filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Gopenko, Daniel)
September 9, 2013 220 MOTION to Seal UNREDACTED VERSION OF ITS OPPOSITION TO FACEBOOK'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, EXHIBIT 1 TO MALACKOWSKI DECLARATION, GOLBECK DECLARATION, AND EXHIBITS 3 AND 4 TO GOPENKO DECLARATION by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gopenko, Daniel)
September 9, 2013 219 Opposition to 201 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Gopenko, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Affidavit Declaration of Golbeck, # 7 Affidavit Declaration of Malackowski, # 8 Exhibit 1)(Gopenko, Daniel) Modified on 9/10/2013 to link opposition to the correct document (stas).
September 3, 2013 218 Featured Case For the reasons stated from the bench, and in accord with specific rulings made at that time, it is ORDERED that defendant's motion (no. 193 ) to strike two expert reports is GRANTED, the court finding that they were tendered in violation of the Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order and that defendant is prejudiced thereby. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 09/03/13. (cmar, )
September 3, 2013 217 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr:Motion Hearing held on 9/3/2013 re 193 MOTION to Strike Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. James E. Malackowski and Reply Expert Report of Kent D. Van Liere Ph.D. filed by Facebook, Inc. Appearances of counsel. Motion argued and GRANTED. Order to follow. (Tape #FTR.)(cmar, )
August 30, 2013 216 Rebuttal in Support of Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s re 193 MOTION to Strike Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. James E. Malackowski and Reply Expert Report of Kent D. Van Liere Ph.D. filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Dane Voris, # 2 Exhibit A)(Morton, Phillip) Modified text on 9/3/2013 (klau, ).
August 30, 2013 214 Featured Case For the reasons stated from the bench, and in accord with specific rulings made at that time, it is ORDERED that the motions to seal (nos. 196 and 209 ) are GRANTED, and the unredacted versions of the materials referred to in them shall remain under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 08/30/13. (cmar, )
August 30, 2013 213 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr:Motion Hearing held on 8/30/2013 re 196 MOTION to Seal Exhibit A to Defendant's Motion to Strike Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. James Malackowski and Reply Expert Report of Kent D. Van Liere Ph.D. filed by Facebook, Inc., 209 MOTION to Seal Rembrandt's Memorandum in Opposition and Exhibits A, B, and C in support thereof filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. No appearances. Matter is uncontested. Motions GRANTED. Order to follow. (Tape #FTR.)(cmar, )
August 29, 2013 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Jones. 209 MOTION to Seal Rembrandt's Memorandum in Opposition and Exhibits A, B, and C in support thereof (clar, )
August 29, 2013 Set Deadlines as to 209 MOTION to Seal Rembrandt's Memorandum in Opposition and Exhibits A, B, and C in support thereof. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2013 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. (clar, )
August 29, 2013 Per Order of 8/29/2013 Reset Deadline as to 193 MOTION to Strike Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. James E. Malackowski and Reply Expert Report of Kent D. Van Liere Ph.D.. Motion Hearing reset for 9/3/2013 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. (stas)
August 29, 2013 211 Featured Case ORDER the 210 Consent Motion Regarding Facebook's Motion to Strike be and is GRANTED and it is hereby ORDERED tha tthe hearing on Deft Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Supplemental Expert Report of Malackowski and Reply Expert of Van Liere [D.I. 193] is CONTINUED until Tuesday, September 3, 2013. Facebook shall file its reply brief in support of the motion no later than Friday, August 30, 2013 at 5 pm. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr. on 8/29/2013. (stas)
August 29, 2013 210 Consent MOTION to Continue Regarding Motion to Strike by Facebook, Inc., Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Davis, Ahmed)
August 28, 2013 209 MOTION to Seal Rembrandt's Memorandum in Opposition and Exhibits A, B, and C in support thereof by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Proposed Order)(Gopenko, Daniel)
August 28, 2013 208 Opposition re 193 MOTION to Strike Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. James E. Malackowski and Reply Expert Report of Kent D. Van Liere Ph.D. filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Gopenko, Daniel) Modified on 8/29/2013 to correct docket text (stas).
August 27, 2013 215 UNDER SEAL 207 Memorandum in Support re 201 MOTION for Summary Judgment CORRECTED Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter)(stas)
August 27, 2013 212 UNDER SEAL Exhibits A-E (main document is Under Seal Exhibit A) re: 205 Memorandum in Support re 204 MOTION to Seal an Unredacted Version of Its Memorandum in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment, Exhibit 1 to Ivan Zatkovich Declaration, Exhibit 1 to David Klausner and Exhibits 3 and 4 to Heidi Keefe Declaration in Support of Its Motion for filed by Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Under Seal Exhibit B, # 2 Under Seal Exhibit C, # 3 Under Seal Exhibit D, # 4 Under Seal Exhibit E)(stas)
August 27, 2013 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Jones. 193 MOTION to Strike Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. James E. Malackowski and Reply Expert Report of Kent D. Van Liere Ph.D., 196 MOTION to Seal Exhibit A to Defendant's Motion to Strike Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. James Malackowski and Reply Expert Report of Kent D. Van Liere Ph.D. (clar, )
August 27, 2013 Reset Deadlines as to 196 MOTION to Seal Exhibit A to Defendant's Motion to Strike Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. James Malackowski and Reply Expert Report of Kent D. Van Liere Ph.D., 193 MOTION to Strike Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. James E. Malackowski and Reply Expert Report of Kent D. Van Liere Ph.D.. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2013 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. (Per TSE chambers) (clar, )
August 27, 2013 207 Memorandum in Support re 201 MOTION for Summary Judgment CORRECTED Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Morton, Phillip)
August 27, 2013 Set Deadlines as to 204 MOTION to Seal an Unredacted Version of Its Memorandum in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment, Exhibit 1 to Ivan Zatkovich Declaration, Exhibit 1 to David Klausner and Exhibits 3 and 4 to Heidi Keefe Declaration in Support of Its Motion for. Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2013 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (clar, )
August 27, 2013 Set Deadlines as to 201 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2013 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (clar, )
August 27, 2013 206 Notice of Hearing Date of 09/20/2013 re 204 MOTION to Seal an Unredacted Version of Its Memorandum in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment, Exhibit 1 to Ivan Zatkovich Declaration, Exhibit 1 to David Klausner and Exhibits 3 and 4 to Heidi Keefe Declaration in Support of Its Motion for (Morton, Phillip)
August 27, 2013 205 Memorandum in Support re 204 MOTION to Seal an Unredacted Version of Its Memorandum in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment, Exhibit 1 to Ivan Zatkovich Declaration, Exhibit 1 to David Klausner and Exhibits 3 and 4 to Heidi Keefe Declaration in Support of Its Motion for filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Morton, Phillip)
August 27, 2013 204 MOTION to Seal an Unredacted Version of Its Memorandum in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment, Exhibit 1 to Ivan Zatkovich Declaration, Exhibit 1 to David Klausner and Exhibits 3 and 4 to Heidi Keefe Declaration in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Morton, Phillip)
August 27, 2013 203 Memorandum in Support re 201 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Heidi Keefe, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Affidavit Stefan Parker, # 11 Affidavit Ivan Zatkovich, # 12 Exhibit 1, # 13 Affidavit David Klausner, # 14 Exhibit 1, # 15 Exhibit A4, # 16 Exhibit B1)(Morton, Phillip)
August 27, 2013 202 Notice of Hearing Date of 09/20/2013 re 201 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Morton, Phillip)
August 27, 2013 201 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Morton, Phillip)
August 26, 2013 200 Under Seal Exhibit in re 194 Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter)(clar, )
August 26, 2013 199 Featured Case ORDER Before the Court is Deft's 190 MOTION to Exceed the Page Limits for Summary Judgment Briefs. The Court is of the opinion that this motion should be and hereby is GRANTED. The page limit for the opening and responsive briefs for Deft Facebook, Inc.'s motion for summary judgment is extended to 50 pages and the page limit for the rebuttal brief is extended to 30 pages. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 8/26/2013. (stas)
August 26, 2013 Set Deadlines as to 196 MOTION to Seal Exhibit A to Defendant's Motion to Strike Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. James Malackowski and Reply Expert Report of Kent D. Van Liere Ph.D., 190 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Summary Judgment Briefs, 193 MOTION to Strike Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. James E. Malackowski and Reply Expert Report of Kent D. Van Liere Ph.D.. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2013 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (clar, )
August 23, 2013 198 Notice of Hearing Date set for 08/30/2013 re 196 MOTION to Seal Exhibit A to Defendant's Motion to Strike Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. James Malackowski and Reply Expert Report of Kent D. Van Liere Ph.D. (Morton, Phillip)
August 23, 2013 197 Memorandum in Support re 193 MOTION to Strike Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. James E. Malackowski and Reply Expert Report of Kent D. Van Liere Ph.D., 196 MOTION to Seal Exhibit A to Defendant's Motion to Strike Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. James Malackowski and Reply Expert Report of Kent D. Van Liere Ph.D. filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Morton, Phillip)
August 23, 2013 196 MOTION to Seal Exhibit A to Defendant's Motion to Strike Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. James Malackowski and Reply Expert Report of Kent D. Van Liere Ph.D. by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Morton, Phillip)
August 23, 2013 195 Notice of Hearing Date set for 08/30/2013 re 193 MOTION to Strike Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. James E. Malackowski and Reply Expert Report of Kent D. Van Liere Ph.D. (Morton, Phillip)
August 23, 2013 194 Memorandum in Support re 193 MOTION to Strike Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. James E. Malackowski and Reply Expert Report of Kent D. Van Liere Ph.D. filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Paul Batcher, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Morton, Phillip)
August 23, 2013 193 MOTION to Strike Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. James E. Malackowski and Reply Expert Report of Kent D. Van Liere Ph.D. by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Morton, Phillip)
August 23, 2013 192 Notice of Hearing Date set for 08/30/2013 re 190 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Summary Judgment Briefs (Morton, Phillip)
August 23, 2013 191 Memorandum in Support re 190 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Summary Judgment Briefs filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Morton, Phillip)
August 23, 2013 190 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Summary Judgment Briefs by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Morton, Phillip)
August 12, 2013 189 So Ordered re 188 Stipulation of Dismissal of AddThis, Inc. with prejudice filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP, AddThis, Inc. Each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 8/12/13. (klau, )
August 9, 2013 188 STIPULATION of Dismissal by AddThis, Inc., Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Davis, Ahmed)
July 31, 2013 187 STIPULATION Regarding Reduction of Asserted Claims by Facebook, Inc., Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Gopenko, Daniel)
July 29, 2013 186 Featured Case ORDER for good cause having been shown and it otherwise appearing proper to do so, the 184 Consent Motion for Extensions for Rebuttal Expert Reports, Expert Discovery, Dispositive Motions, and Pretrial Disclosures be and is GRANTED and it is hereby ORDERED that the case deadlines are hereby extended as follows: Rebuttal expert reports due 8/12 Expert discovery cutoff due 8/23 Filing of dispositive motions due 8/26 Responses to dispositive motions due 9/9 Dispositive motion replies due 9/16 Hearing on dispositive motions and Pretrial Conference due 9/20 Rule 26(a)(3) pretrial disclosures due 9/20 Objections to pretrial disclosures due 10/1. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 7/29/2013. (stas)
July 26, 2013 185 Featured Case ORDER for good cause, It is hereby ORDERED that deft Facebook Inc.'s motion objecting to the Magistrate Judge's June 26, 2013 Discovery Order (Doc. 170 ), as well as deft Facebook Inc.'s motion to file under seal Exhibit A in support of its motion objecting to the Magistrate Judge's June 26, 2013 Discovery Order (Doc. 173 ) are DENIED AS MOOT (See order for details). Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 7/26/2013. (stas)
July 26, 2013 184 Consent MOTION for Extension For Rebuttal Expert Reports, Expert Discovery, Dispositive Motions, and Pretrial Disclosures by Facebook, Inc., Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gopenko, Daniel)
July 26, 2013 183 NOTICE by Facebook, Inc., Rembrandt Social Media, LP Regarding Resolution of Facebook's Motion Objecting to Magistrate's June 26, 2013 Discovery Order (Morton, Phillip)
July 19, 2013 182 Featured Case ORDEREd that the matter is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. It is further ORDERED that the parties are DIRECTED to file a pleading by 5:00 p.m., Friday, July 26, 2013 advising the Court whether they have been otherwise able to resolve this matter. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 7/19/2013. (nmcc)
July 19, 2013 181 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge T. S. Ellis, III:Motion Hearing held on 7/19/2013 re 173 MOTION to Seal Exhibit A in Support of Motion Objecting to Magistrate's June 26, 2013 Discovery Order filed by Facebook, Inc., 170 Motion Re: Objections to Magistrate Judge's Ruling or Recommendation of June 26, 2013 Discovery Order filed by Facebook, Inc. Matter heard and taken under advisement as instructed from the bench. (Court Reporter M. Rodriquez)(nmcc )
July 18, 2013 180 REPLY to Response to Motion re 170 Motion Re: Objections to Magistrate Judge's Ruling or Recommendation of June 26, 2013 Discovery Order filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Morton, Phillip)
July 17, 2013 179 RESPONSE in Opposition re 170 Motion Re: Objections to Magistrate Judge's Ruling or Recommendation of June 26, 2013 Discovery Order filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit D, # 4 Exhibit E)(Gopenko, Daniel)
July 15, 2013 Set Deadlines as to 173 MOTION to Seal Exhibit A in Support of Motion Objecting to Magistrate's June 26, 2013 Discovery Order. Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2013 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (klau, )
July 15, 2013 Set Deadlines as to 170 Motion Re: Objections to Magistrate Judge's Ruling or Recommendation of June 26, 2013 Discovery Order. Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2013 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (klau, )
July 12, 2013 178 Featured Case ORDERED that defendants' motion requiring Rembrandt to reduce the number of asserted patent claims 159 is GRANTED and plaintiff is DIRECTED to reduce the number of claims to nine before Friday, July 19, 2013. Prior to trial the number of claims will be reduced further to 3-4 claims per patent at most. It is further ORDERED that opening expert reports are due Monday, July 29, 2013. It is further ORDERED that the parties' consent motion to continue the final pretrial conference by one week is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that the final pretrial conference in this matter is SCHEDULED for Thursday, September 19, 2013 at 11:00 a.m. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 7/12/2013. (nmcc)
July 12, 2013 177 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge T. S. Ellis, III:Motion Hearing held on 7/12/2013 re 159 MOTION Defendants' Motion Requiring Rembrandt to Reduce the Number of Asserted Claims filed by Facebook, Inc., AddThis, Inc., and 169 Consent MOTION to Continue Final Pretrial Conference for One Week. Matter heard and motion is granted. Final Pretrial Conference is continued to 11:00 a.m. on 9/19/2013 (Courtroom 900) before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. Appearances: A. Davis, T. Melsheimer for pltf; J. Graves, C. Campbell for defts. (Court Reporter M. Rodriquez)(nmcc )
July 12, 2013 176 Sealed Document re 171 Memorandum in Support. (rban, )
July 12, 2013 175 Notice of Hearing Date of July 19, 2013 re 173 MOTION to Seal Exhibit A in Support of Motion Objecting to Magistrate's June 26, 2013 Discovery Order, 170 Motion Re: Objections to Magistrate Judge's Ruling or Recommendation of June 26, 2013 Discovery Order (Morton, Phillip)
July 12, 2013 174 Memorandum in Support re 173 MOTION to Seal Exhibit A in Support of Motion Objecting to Magistrate's June 26, 2013 Discovery Order, 170 Motion Re: Objections to Magistrate Judge's Ruling or Recommendation of June 26, 2013 Discovery Order filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Morton, Phillip)
July 12, 2013 173 MOTION to Seal Exhibit A in Support of Motion Objecting to Magistrate's June 26, 2013 Discovery Order by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Morton, Phillip)
July 12, 2013 172 Notice of Hearing Date of July 19, 2013 re 170 Motion Re: Objections to Magistrate Judge's Ruling or Recommendation of June 26, 2013 Discovery Order (Morton, Phillip)
July 12, 2013 171 Memorandum in Support re 170 Motion Re: Objections to Magistrate Judge's Ruling or Recommendation of June 26, 2013 Discovery Order filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Paul Batcher, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Morton, Phillip)
July 12, 2013 170 Motion Re: Objections to Magistrate Judge's Ruling or Recommendation of June 26, 2013 Discovery Order by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Morton, Phillip)
July 11, 2013 169 Consent MOTION to Continue Final Pretrial Conference for One Week by AddThis, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Davis, Ahmed)
July 9, 2013 168 CORRECTED ANSWER to Complaint (Second Amended) by AddThis, Inc..(Campbell, Christopher)
July 8, 2013 167 REPLY to Response to Motion re 159 MOTION Defendants' Motion Requiring Rembrandt to Reduce the Number of Asserted Claims filed by AddThis, Inc., Facebook, Inc.. (Morton, Phillip)
July 3, 2013 166 RESPONSE in Opposition re 159 MOTION Defendants' Motion Requiring Rembrandt to Reduce the Number of Asserted Claims filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Gopenko, Daniel)
July 3, 2013 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/22/2013 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (rban, )
July 3, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 159 MOTION Defendants' Motion Requiring Rembrandt to Reduce the Number of Asserted Claims . Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2013 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (rban, )
July 2, 2013 165 Featured Case ORDERED that the parties are DIRECTED to comply with the following schedule:A hearing on defendants' motion for claim construction is SCHEDULED for 10AM 7/12/2013.Opening expert reports are due 7/19/13.Rebuttal expert reports are due 8/2/13. The expert discovery cut-off date is 8/16/13.Opening Summary Judgment briefs are due 8/21/13.Rule 26(a)(3) pretrial disclosures are due 8/22/13.Objections to Rule 26(a)(3) pretrial disclosures are due 9/3/13.Responsive Summary Judgment breifs are due 9/5/13.Reply Summary Judgment Briefs are due 9/12/13.A final pretrial confernce in this matter is SCHEDULED for 11AM 8/22/13. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 7/2/2013. (rban, )
July 2, 2013 164 Notice of Hearing Date set for 07/12/2013 re 159 MOTION Defendants' Motion Requiring Rembrandt to Reduce the Number of Asserted Claims (Morton, Phillip)
July 1, 2013 163 Featured Case ORDER granting 162 Motion for Extension of Time to File. ORDERED that the deadlines for opening and rebuttal expert reports are hereby extended by 10 days to 7/8 and 7/22 respectively. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 7/1/2013. (rban, )
July 1, 2013 Set Deadlines as to 159 MOTION Defendants' Motion Requiring Rembrandt to Reduce the Number of Asserted Claims . Motion Hearing set for 7/5/2013 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (Attorney was notified that Judge Ellis is not hearing motions on July 5, 2013 due to the holiday and to please re-notice the motion that was set for 7/5/13 Deadlines Terminated (clar, )
July 1, 2013 Notice of Correction re 161 Request for Hearing. Attorney was notified the Judge Ellis is not hearing motions on July 5, 2013 due to the Holiday and to please re-notice the motions that was set for 7/5/13 Deadlines Terminated (clar, )
June 28, 2013 162 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Expert Reports by AddThis, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gopenko, Daniel)
June 27, 2013 161 Request for Hearing by AddThis, Inc., Facebook, Inc. re 159 MOTION Defendants' Motion Requiring Rembrandt to Reduce the Number of Asserted Claims (Morton, Phillip)
June 27, 2013 160 Memorandum in Support re 159 MOTION Defendants' Motion Requiring Rembrandt to Reduce the Number of Asserted Claims filed by AddThis, Inc., Facebook, Inc.. (Morton, Phillip)
June 27, 2013 159 MOTION Defendants' Motion Requiring Rembrandt to Reduce the Number of Asserted Claims by AddThis, Inc., Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Morton, Phillip)
June 27, 2013 158 ANSWER to Complaint - Second Amended, COUNTERCLAIM against Rembrandt Social Media, LP by AddThis, Inc..(Campbell, Christopher)
June 26, 2013 157 Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint to Second Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement by Facebook, Inc..(Morton, Phillip)
June 26, 2013 156 Featured Case ORDERED that the documents identified in Exhibit A (attached) are exempt from production. See order for more details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 6/26/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(rban, )
June 21, 2013 155 Featured Case ORDER Upon consideration of the parties 134 Consent Motion for Two Week Extension for Expert Reports, Discovery, and Summary Judgment Briefs, for good cause having been shown and it otherwise appearing proper to do so, the motion be and is GRANTED and it is hereby ORDERED that the case deadlines are hereby extended (see order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 6/21/2013. (stas)
June 20, 2013 Notice of Correction re: 154 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against All Defendants, filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. Per telephone call from the filing user this document was filed in error as it was previously filed in April (see doc. #71). (stas)
June 19, 2013 154 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against All Defendants, filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Davis, Ahmed)
June 19, 2013 153 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 05-31-2013, before Judge Ellis, Court Reporter/Transcriber Michael Rodriquez, Telephone number 301-213-4913. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 7/19/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/19/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/17/2013.(rodriquez, michael)
June 19, 2013 152 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 06-07-2013, before Judge Jones, Court Reporter/Transcriber Michael Rodriquez, Telephone number 301-213-4913. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 7/19/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/19/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/17/2013.(rodriquez, michael)
June 19, 2013 151 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 06-04-2013, before Judge Jones, Court Reporter/Transcriber Michael Rodriquez, Telephone number 301-213-4913. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 7/19/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/19/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/17/2013.(rodriquez, michael)
June 19, 2013 150 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 06-06-2013, before Judge Ellis, Court Reporter/Transcriber Michael Rodriquez, Telephone number 301-213-4913. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 7/19/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/19/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/17/2013.(rodriquez, michael)
June 19, 2013 149 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 05-23-2013, before Judge Jones, Court Reporter/Transcriber Michael Rodriquez, Telephone number 301-213-4913. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 7/19/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/19/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/17/2013.(rodriquez, michael)
June 19, 2013 148 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 06-04-2013, before Judge Jones, Court Reporter/Transcriber Michael Rodriquez, Telephone number 301-213-4913. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 7/19/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/19/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/17/2013.(rodriquez, michael) Modified on 6/21/2013 to correct hearing date(stas).
June 19, 2013 147 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 06-17-2013, before Judge Jones, Court Reporter/Transcriber Michael Rodriquez, Telephone number 301-213-4913. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 7/19/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/19/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/17/2013.(rodriquez, michael) Modified on 6/19/2013 to correct the judge(rban, ).
June 19, 2013 146 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 05-23-2013, before Judge Jones, Court Reporter/Transcriber Michael Rodriquez, Telephone number 301-213-4913. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 7/19/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/19/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/17/2013.(rodriquez, michael) Modified on 6/19/2013 to modify the judge (rban, ).
June 17, 2013 145 Featured Case For the reasons stated from the bench, and in accordance with the specific findings made at that time, defendant Facebook, Inc.'s motion to compel (no. 137 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. It is SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 06/17/13. (cmar, )
June 17, 2013 144 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr:Motion Hearing held on 6/17/2013 re 137 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Facebook, Inc. Appearances of counsel. Motion argued and GRANTED in part/DENIED in part. Order to follow. (Tape #FTR.)(cmar, )
June 13, 2013 143 REPLY to Response to Motion re 137 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Phillip Morton, # 2 Exhibit A)(Morton, Phillip)
June 12, 2013 142 Featured Case ORDER For the reasons stated in the memorandum opinion of even date, and for good cause, It is hereby ORDERED that defts' motion to dismiss (doc. 80 ) is GRANTED IN PART, as follows: (i) Defts' motion to dismiss the claim for willful infringement is GRANTED, and accordingly, that claim is DISMISSED; and, (ii) Defts' motion to dismiss the indirect claim is GRANTED IN PART, insofar as the claim seeks pre-filing damages for indirect infringement that claim is DISMISSED. Any claims for damages for indirect infringement must be limited to the period of time commencing with the service of the complaint. It is further ORDERED that defts' motion to dismiss is DENIED IN ALL OTHER RESPECTS. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 6/12/2013. (stas)
June 12, 2013 141 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION Re: 80 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by AddThis, Inc., Facebook, Inc. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 6/12/2013. (stas)
June 12, 2013 140 RESPONSE in Opposition re 137 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Mann Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Mann Declaration Exh1, # 3 Affidavit Wood Declaration)(Davis, Ahmed)
June 11, 2013 Reset Deadlines as to 137 MOTION to Compel Discovery. Motion Hearing set for 6/17/2013 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. (Per TRJ chambers) (clar, )
June 10, 2013 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Jones. 137 MOTION to Compel Discovery (clar, )
June 10, 2013 Set Deadlines as to 137 MOTION to Compel Discovery. Motion Hearing set for 6/14/2013 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. (clar, )
June 7, 2013 139 Memorandum in Support re 137 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Paul Batcher, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H)(Graves, Jonathan)
June 7, 2013 138 Notice of Hearing Date of June 14, 2013 re 137 MOTION to Compel Discovery (Graves, Jonathan)
June 7, 2013 137 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Graves, Jonathan)
June 7, 2013 136 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr:Motion Hearing held on 6/7/2013 re 115 MOTION to Compel against Defendant AddThis, Inc. filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. Appearances of counsel. Matter resolved and removed from the docket. (Tape #FTR.)(cmar, )
June 7, 2013 Notice of Correction re 134 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. The text has been modified to reflect the correct parties/filers of the document. (stas)
June 7, 2013 134 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Rembrandt Social Media, LP, AddThis, Inc., Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Davis, Ahmed) Modified on 6/7/2013 to correct party filers (stas).
June 6, 2013 135 Featured Case ORDER (Markman claim construction). Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 6/6/2013. (nmcc )
June 6, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge T. S. Ellis, III: Telephonic Conference held on 6/6/2013 regarding the Markman claim construction determination; Order to follow. (Court Reporter M. Rodriquez)(nmcc )
June 6, 2013 Clerk's Notice: Telephone Conference is set at 5:00 p.m. on Thursday, 6/6/2013. the parties are to place a conference call to the Chambers of District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (nmcc)
June 4, 2013 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 6/7/2013 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. (jwil, )
June 4, 2013 133 Featured Case ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Compel 115 is GRANTED, and the matter is continued for consideration on June, 7, 2013 at 10:00a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 6/4/2013. (jwil, )
June 4, 2013 132 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr:Motion Hearing held on 6/4/2013 re 115 MOTION to Compel against Defendant AddThis, Inc. filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. Appearances of counsel. Matter argued and GRANTED. Order to follow. (Tape #FTR.)(jwil, )
June 4, 2013 131 REPLY to Response to Motion re 115 MOTION to Compel against Defendant AddThis, Inc. filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Davis, Ahmed)
June 4, 2013 Notice of Correction re 130 REPLY to Response to Motion re 115 MOTION to Compel against Defendant AddThis, Inc. filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. The signature block on the document does not match the user's login. The filing user has been notified and has been asked to either refile the document or to have the attorney whose signature block appears on the document refile the docment. (stas)
June 3, 2013 130 REPLY to Response to Motion re 115 MOTION to Compel against Defendant AddThis, Inc. filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Gopenko, Daniel)
May 31, 2013 129 Featured Case ORDERED that the Markman claim construction determination is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. It is further ORDERED that the final pre-trial conference in this matter, currently scheduled for Thursday, July 18, 2013 is hereby RESCHEDULED for 2:00 p.m., Thursday, August 1,2013. It is further ORDERED that the parties are DIRECTED to file any motions in limine or Daubert motions by 2:00 p.m. Thursday, August 1. 2013. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 5/31/2013. (nmcc )
May 31, 2013 128 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge T. S. Ellis, III:Motion Hearing held on 5/31/2013 re 93 , 95 MOTIONs for Claim Construction Brief. Matter heard; motion taken under advisement. Appearance by counsel. (Court Reporter M. Rodriquez)(nmcc )
May 31, 2013 127 Featured Case ORDER Upon consideration of the parties' 126 Consent Motion for One Week Extension for Expert Reports, for good cause having been shown and it otherwise appearing proper to do so, the motion be and is GRANTED and it is hereby ORDERED that the parties' deadline for opening and rebuttal expert reports is hereby extended by one week. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 5/31/2013. (stas)
May 30, 2013 126 Consent MOTION for Extension for Expert Reports by AddThis, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Davis, Ahmed)
May 30, 2013 Reset Deadlines as to 115 MOTION to Compel against Defendant AddThis, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/4/2013 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. (Per TRJ chambers) (clar, )
May 29, 2013 125 Featured Case ORDER that parties have permission to use the Court's evidence presentation system during the May 31, 2013 Markman Hearing and that the parties may each bring a notebook computer or laptop and related accessories into the courtroom of the Honorable T.S.Ellis, III on May 31, 2013 for use in conjunction with the Court's evidence presentation system during the Markman hearing. It is further ORDERED that the parties may bring a notebook computer or laptop into the courthouse and related accessories during orientation for the evidence presentation system, should any party request orientation. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 5/29/2013. (stas)
May 29, 2013 124 Opposition to 115 MOTION to Compel against Defendant AddThis, Inc. filed by AddThis, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declalration of Brian Eutermoser, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G)(Campbell, Christopher)
May 29, 2013 123 NOTICE of Appearance by Ruffin B. Cordell on behalf of Rembrandt Social Media, LP (Cordell, Ruffin)
May 29, 2013 122 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Robert Gopenko on behalf of Rembrandt Social Media, LP (Gopenko, Daniel)
May 29, 2013 121 Consent MOTION Permission to Use the Court's Evidence Presentation System During the Markman Hearing by AddThis, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Davis, Ahmed)
May 28, 2013 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Jones. 115 MOTION to Compel against Defendant AddThis, Inc. (clar, )
May 28, 2013 Set Deadlines as to 115 MOTION to Compel against Defendant AddThis, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/31/2013 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. (clar, )
May 24, 2013 120 Reply to 110 Memorandum In Response to Claim Construction Brief of Defendants Facebook, Inc. and AddThis, Inc. filed by AddThis, Inc., Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Heidi Keefe, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Morton, Phillip)
May 24, 2013 119 Reply to 111 Response to Claim Construction Brief filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Davis, Ahmed)
May 24, 2013 118 Declaration re 117 Memorandum in Support by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Davis, Ahmed)
May 24, 2013 117 Memorandum in Support re 115 MOTION to Compel against Defendant AddThis, Inc. filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Davis, Ahmed)
May 24, 2013 116 Notice of Hearing Date set for May 31, 2013 re 115 MOTION to Compel against Defendant AddThis, Inc. (Davis, Ahmed)
May 24, 2013 115 MOTION to Compel against Defendant AddThis, Inc. by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Davis, Ahmed)
May 23, 2013 114 For the reasons stated from the bench, and in accordance with the specific findings made at that time, plaintiff's motion to compel (no. 101 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 05/23/13. (cmar, )
May 23, 2013 113 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr:Motion Hearing held on 5/23/2013 re 101 MOTION to Compel filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. Appearances of counsel. Motion argued and GRANTED. Order to follow. (Tape #FTR.)(cmar, )
May 22, 2013 112 Opposition to 101 MOTION to Compel filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Elizabeth L. Stameshkin, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7)(Morton, Phillip)
May 21, 2013 111 Response to 96 Claim Construction Brief filed by AddThis, Inc., Facebook, Inc.. (Morton, Phillip)
May 21, 2013 110 Memorandum in Response to 93 MOTION for Claim Construction Brief filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Davis, Ahmed)
May 21, 2013 109 NOTICE by Rembrandt Social Media, LP re 103 Memorandum in Support, 104 Declaration, Submission of Exhibit 7 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 7)(Davis, Ahmed)
May 21, 2013 107 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 5/17/2013, before Judge Ellis, Court Reporter/Transcriber Michael Rodriquez, Telephone number 301-213-4913. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 6/20/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/22/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/19/2013.(rodriquez, michael)
May 21, 2013 106 Memorandum in Support re 101 MOTION to Compel (Corrected Brief) filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Davis, Ahmed)
May 20, 2013 Reset Deadlines as to 101 MOTION to Compel . Motion Hearing set for 5/23/2013 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. (Per TRJ chambers) (clar, )
May 20, 2013 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Jones. 101 MOTION to Compel (clar, )
May 20, 2013 Set Deadlines as to 101 MOTION to Compel . Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2013 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. (clar, )
May 17, 2013 108 Featured Case ORDERED that the matter is taken under ADVISEMENT. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 5/17/2013. (nmcc )
May 17, 2013 105 Featured Case ORDER granting 99 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephen C. Neal. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 5/17/2013. (stas)
May 17, 2013 104 Declaration re 103 Memorandum in Support by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Davis, Ahmed)
May 17, 2013 103 Memorandum in Support re 101 MOTION to Compel filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Davis, Ahmed)
May 17, 2013 102 Notice of Hearing Date on Motion to Compel set for 5/24/2013 re 101 MOTION to Compel (Davis, Ahmed)
May 17, 2013 101 MOTION to Compel by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Davis, Ahmed)
May 17, 2013 100 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge T. S. Ellis, III:Motion Hearing held on 5/17/2013 re defts' 80 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). Matter taken under advisement. Appearances: R. Sterba, L. Kolodney for pltf; H. Keefe, J. Graves, C. Campbell for defts. (Court Reporter M. Rodriquez)(nmcc )
May 17, 2013 99 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephen C. Neal and Certification of Local Counsel Phillip E. Morton Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3520873. by Facebook, Inc.. (Morton, Phillip)
May 15, 2013 Set Deadlines as to 95 MOTION for Claim Construction, 93 MOTION for Claim Construction Brief. Motion Hearing set for 5/31/2013 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (clar, )
May 15, 2013 98 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on April 5, 2013, before Judge Ellis, Court Reporter/Transcriber Michael Rodriquez, Telephone number 301-213-4913. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 6/14/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/15/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/13/2013.(rodriquez, michael)
May 14, 2013 97 Notice of Hearing Date set for May 31, 2013 re 95 MOTION for Hearing (Claim Construction) (Davis, Ahmed)
May 14, 2013 96 Claim Construction Brief to 95 MOTION for Hearing (Claim Construction) filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Davis, Ahmed)
May 14, 2013 95 MOTION for (Claim Construction) by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Construing Claims)(Davis, Ahmed) Modified text on 5/15/2013 (clar, ).
May 14, 2013 94 Notice of Hearing Date of Claim Construction 93 set for 05/31/2013 (Morton, Phillip)
May 14, 2013 93 Claim Construction Brief Opening Claim Construction Brief filed by AddThis, Inc., Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Heidi L. Keefe, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8)(Morton, Phillip) Modified text on 5/15/2013 (clar, ).
May 10, 2013 92 NOTICE by AddThis, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Rembrandt Social Media, LP Supplemental Joint List of Disputed Claim Terms (Morton, Phillip)
May 9, 2013 91 REBUTTAL Brief re: 80 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) to Second Amended Complaint Corrected Reply Brief filed by AddThis, Inc., Facebook, Inc.. (Morton, Phillip) Modified on 5/10/2013 to correct docket text (stas).
May 9, 2013 90 Featured Case ORDER that the 88 Consent Motion to Amend the Claim Construction Briefing Schedule (doc. 88) is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the deadline for filing the joint list of disputed terms is EXTENDED until Thursday, May 9, 2013. It is further ORDERED that the deadline for filing opening Markman briefs is EXTENDED until Tuesday, May 14, 2013. All other Markman related deadlines will remain unchanged. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 5/9/2013. (stas)
May 9, 2013 89 REBUTTAL BRIEF re 80 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) of Second Amended Complaint filed by AddThis, Inc., Facebook, Inc. (Morton, Phillip) Modified on 5/10/2013 to correct docket text (stas).
May 9, 2013 88 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 51 Discovery Plan Claim Construction Briefing Schedule by AddThis, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Davis, Ahmed)
May 9, 2013 Notice of Correction re: 86 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 51 Discovery Plan Claim Construction Briefing Schedule by AddThis, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Rembrandt Social Media, LP. The filing user has been asked to refile the consent motion with the signature of local counsel on behalf of deft., Facebook, Inc. (stas)
May 8, 2013 87 NOTICE by AddThis, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Rembrandt Social Media, LP of Joint List of Disputed Claim Terms (Morton, Phillip)
May 8, 2013 86 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 51 Discovery Plan Claim Construction Briefing Schedule by AddThis, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Davis, Ahmed)
May 8, 2013 85 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Crawford Crenshaw on behalf of AddThis, Inc. (Crenshaw, Stephen)
May 6, 2013 84 RESPONSE in Opposition re 80 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Davis, Ahmed)
April 25, 2013 83 Featured Case ORDER granting 79 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Eutermoser. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 4/25/2013. (stas)
April 25, 2013 Set Deadlines as to 80 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2013 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (clar, )
April 24, 2013 82 Notice of Hearing Date of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) of Second Amended Complaint set for May 17, 2013 re 80 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) (Morton, Phillip)
April 24, 2013 81 Memorandum in Support re 80 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) of Second Amended Complaint filed by AddThis, Inc., Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Mark R.Weinstein, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Errata C)(Morton, Phillip)
April 24, 2013 80 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by AddThis, Inc., Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Morton, Phillip)
April 24, 2013 79 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Eutermoser and Certification of Local Counsel Stephen P. McBride Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3490866. by AddThis, Inc.. (McBride, Stephen)
April 22, 2013 78 Featured Case ORDER granting 74 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Rex Andrew Mann. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 4/22/2013. (stas)
April 16, 2013 77 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY (See order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 4/16/2013. (stas)
April 15, 2013 76 Memorandum in Support re 63 MOTION for Discovery Defendants' Motion to Enter Electronic Discovery Order Supplemental Memorandum filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Morton, Phillip)
April 15, 2013 75 Withdrawal of Motion by AddThis, Inc., Facebook, Inc. re 66 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed R Civ P 12(b)(6) (Morton, Phillip)
April 15, 2013 74 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Rex Andrew Mann and Certification of Local Counsel Ahmed J. Davis Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3476373. by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Davis, Ahmed)
April 12, 2013 Notice of Correction re: 4/12/2013 Notice of Correction re: 71 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. Please disregard the first notice of correction concerning the Second Amended Complaint. Permission to amend was listed in the Discovery Plan that was approved by the 16(b) Scheduling Order of 4/3/2013. (stas)
April 12, 2013 73 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr:Motion Hearing held on 4/12/2013 re 63 MOTION for Discovery Defendants' Motion to Enter Electronic Discovery Order filed by Facebook, Inc., AddThis, Inc. Appearances of counsel. Matter argued. Court recessed to allow counsel to meet and confer. Matter resolved. Order to be submitted. (Tape #FTR.)(cmar, ) Modified on 4/12/2013 to add text. (cmar, ).
April 12, 2013 Notice of Correction re: 71 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. Attorney notified that leave of court is needed to file the Amended Complaint.(stas)
April 11, 2013 72 REPLY to Response to Motion re 63 MOTION for Discovery Defendants' Motion to Enter Electronic Discovery Order filed by AddThis, Inc., Facebook, Inc.. (Morton, Phillip)
April 10, 2013 71 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP.(Davis, Ahmed)
April 10, 2013 70 RESPONSE to Motion re 63 MOTION for Discovery Defendants' Motion to Enter Electronic Discovery Order filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of John Goetz)(Davis, Ahmed)
April 9, 2013 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Alex Sterba on behalf of Rembrandt Social Media, LP (Sterba, Richard)
April 8, 2013 Set Deadlines as to 66 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed R Civ P 12(b)(6). Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2013 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (clar, )
April 8, 2013 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Jones. 63 MOTION for Discovery Defendants' Motion to Enter Electronic Discovery Order (clar, )
April 8, 2013 Set Deadlines as to 63 MOTION for Discovery Defendants' Motion to Enter Electronic Discovery Order. Motion Hearing set for 4/12/2013 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. (clar, )
April 5, 2013 68 Notice of Hearing Date re 66 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed R Civ P 12(b)(6) (Morton, Phillip)
April 5, 2013 67 Memorandum in Support re 66 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed R Civ P 12(b)(6) filed by AddThis, Inc., Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark R. Weinstein, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Morton, Phillip)
April 5, 2013 66 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed R Civ P 12(b)(6) by AddThis, Inc., Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Morton, Phillip)
April 5, 2013 65 Memorandum in Support re 63 MOTION for Discovery Defendants' Motion to Enter Electronic Discovery Order filed by AddThis, Inc., Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Paul Batcher, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Morton, Phillip)
April 5, 2013 64 Notice of Hearing Date re 63 MOTION for Discovery Defendants' Motion to Enter Electronic Discovery Order (Morton, Phillip)
April 5, 2013 63 MOTION for Discovery Defendants' Motion to Enter Electronic Discovery Order by AddThis, Inc., Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Morton, Phillip)
April 5, 2013 62 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge T. S. Ellis, III:Motion Hearing held on 4/5/2013 re 43 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Facebook, Inc., 37 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 USC 1404(a) filed by AddThis, Inc. Matter heard and motion is denied. Appearances: A. Davis, R Hillman, J.Goetz for pltf; C Campbell, H. Keefe, S. McBride, J. Graves for defts. (Court Reporter M. Rodriquez)(nmcc )
April 3, 2013 61 Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties at the Rule 16(b) Conference, the court makes the following rulings: a. Parties shall deliver to my chambers (not to the Clerk's office) a copy of every non-dispositive motion and every document relating to such a motion within one business day of filing it. b. Rule 26(a) disclosures, depositions, interrogatories, requests for documents and admissions, and answers thereto shall not be filed except on order of the court, or for use in a motion or at trial. c. No "general objection" may be asserted in response to any discovery demand except to preserve the attorney-client privilege and work product protection. d. The agreed portions of the Rule 26(f) report filed by the parties are approved, and shall control discovery to the extent of their application unless modified by the court herein or hereafter.(See order for details) Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr. on 4/3/2013. (stas)
April 2, 2013 60 Featured Case AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER Without Sealing Provisions re: the handling and labeling of confidential materials re: discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 04/02/13. (pmil)
March 29, 2013 59 REPLY to Response to Motion re 43 MOTION to Transfer Case , 37 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 USC 1404(a) filed by AddThis, Inc., Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Caitlin Gallagher)(Morton, Phillip)
March 29, 2013 58 Withdrawal of Motion by Facebook, Inc. re 32 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Morton, Phillip)
March 29, 2013 57 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by AddThis, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Morton, Phillip)
March 29, 2013 56 Withdrawal of Motion by AddThis, Inc. re 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Campbell, Christopher)
March 27, 2013 55 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr:Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/27/2013. Appearances of counsel. Pltf's list of claims due 03/29/13. Claim chart due 04/05/13. Number of claims not limited to ten. Deft's invalidity contentions due 04/29/13. Privilege logs due w/in seven days. Markman hearing to be noticed for 05/24/13. No general objections (except privilege) may be asserted. Order to issue. (cmar, )
March 26, 2013 54 RESPONSE in Opposition re 32 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Davis, Ahmed)
March 26, 2013 53 Opposition to 37 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 USC 1404(a) 43 MOTION to Transfer Case Combined filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Affidavit)(Davis, Ahmed) Modified on 3/27/2013 to link Opposition to all of the motions it opposes (stas).
March 26, 2013 52 AMENDED COMPLAINT against AddThis, Inc., Facebook, Inc., filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Davis, Ahmed) Modified on 3/27/2013 to individually list the defts against whom the amended complaint is filed (stas).
March 21, 2013 Notice of Correction re: 51 Discovery Plan by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. The text has been modified to reflect the correct parties/filers of the document. (stas)
March 20, 2013 51 Discovery Plan by Rembrandt Social Media, LP, AddThis, Inc., Facebook, Inc.(Davis, Ahmed) Modified on 3/21/2013 to correct party filers (stas).
March 19, 2013 50 Featured Case ORDER For good cause and for purposes of judicial economy, It is hereby ORDERED that all of defts' pending motions to transfer and motions to dismiss (Docs. 32 , 34 , 37 and 43 ) will be heard together at 10:00 a.m., Friday, April 5, 2013 in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. Accordingly, it is further ORDERED that the hearing on defts' motions to transfer currently scheduled for 10:00 a.m., March 29, 2013 is CANCELLED. (See order for details). Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 3/19/2013. (stas)
March 15, 2013 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Garwood Graves on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Graves, Jonathan)
March 14, 2013 Set Deadline as to 32 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 4/5/2013 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (stas)
March 14, 2013 Set Deadline as to 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 4/5/2013 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (stas)
March 13, 2013 48 Notice of Hearing Date set for 04/05/2013 re 32 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Morton, Phillip)
March 13, 2013 47 Notice of Hearing Date set for 04/05/2013 re 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Campbell, Christopher)
March 13, 2013 Set Deadlines as to 37 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 USC 1404(a), 43 MOTION to Transfer Case . Motion Hearing set for 3/29/2013 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (stas)
March 13, 2013 Set Deadline as to 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 3/29/2013 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (Notice of hearing is untimely; deadline is terminated; atty to re-ntc the hearing). (stas)
March 13, 2013 Notice of Correction re: 36 Notice of Hearing Date re: 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by AddThis, Inc. The filing user has been notified to file an Amended Notice of Hearing Date, as the Notice of Hearing Date set an untimely hearing.(stas)
March 13, 2013 Set Deadline as to 32 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 3/29/2013 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (Notice of hearing is untimely; deadline is terminated; atty to re-ntc the hearing). (stas)
March 13, 2013 Notice of Correction re: 32 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Facebook, Inc. The filing user has been notified to file an Amended Notice of Hearing Date, as the Notice of Hearing Date set an untimely hearing. (stas)
March 12, 2013 46 DECLARATION in Support re 43 MOTION to Transfer Case Corrected Ime Archibong Affidavit in Support re 44 Memorandum in Support of 43 Motion to Transfer filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Morton, Phillip) Modified on 3/13/2013 to correct docket text (stas).
March 12, 2013 45 Notice of Hearing Date set for 03/29/2013 re 43 MOTION to Transfer Case (Morton, Phillip)
March 12, 2013 44 Memorandum in Support re 43 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Heidi Keefe, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Affidavit Ime Archibong, # 10 Exhibit 1 to Archibong Declaration, # 11 Affidavit Jeremy Jordan)(Morton, Phillip)
March 12, 2013 43 MOTION to Transfer Case by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Morton, Phillip)
March 12, 2013 42 Memorandum in Support re 32 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Heidi Keefe, # 2 Exhibit A)(Morton, Phillip)
March 12, 2013 41 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by AddThis, Inc.. (Campbell, Christopher)
March 12, 2013 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Patrick McBride on behalf of AddThis, Inc. (McBride, Stephen)
March 12, 2013 39 Notice of Hearing Date set for 03/29/2013 re 37 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 USC 1404(a) (Campbell, Christopher)
March 12, 2013 38 Memorandum in Support re 37 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 USC 1404(a) filed by AddThis, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Robert Van Niman)(Campbell, Christopher)
March 12, 2013 37 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 USC 1404(a) by AddThis, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Campbell, Christopher)
March 12, 2013 36 Notice of Hearing Date re 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Campbell, Christopher)
March 12, 2013 35 Memorandum in Support re 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by AddThis, Inc.. (Campbell, Christopher)
March 12, 2013 34 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by AddThis, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Campbell, Christopher)
March 12, 2013 33 Notice of Hearing Date set for 03/29/2013 re 32 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Morton, Phillip)
March 12, 2013 32 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Heidi Keefe, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Proposed Order)(Morton, Phillip)
March 5, 2013 31 Featured Case ORDER granting 23 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 3/5/13. (klau, )
March 5, 2013 30 Featured Case ORDER granting 20 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 3/5/13. (klau, )
March 5, 2013 29 Featured Case ORDER granting 21 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 3/5/13. (klau, )
March 5, 2013 28 Featured Case ORDER granting 22 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 3/5/13. (klau, )
March 4, 2013 27 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Facebook, Inc.. (Smith, Stephen)
March 4, 2013 Notice of Correction re 24 Financial Disclosure Statement, The signature block on the document does not match the user's login. The filing user has been notified and has been asked to either refile the document or to have the attorney whose signature block appears on the document refile the docment. (klau, )
March 1, 2013 26 Brief in Support to 25 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Smith, Stephen)
March 1, 2013 25 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Stephen)
March 1, 2013 24 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Facebook, Inc.. (Morton, Phillip)
March 1, 2013 23 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Graham Rhodes and Certification of Local Counsel Phillip E. Morton Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3418069. by Facebook, Inc.. (Morton, Phillip)
March 1, 2013 22 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Heidi Lyn Keefe and Certification of Local Counsel Phillip E. Morton Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3418052. by Facebook, Inc.. (Morton, Phillip)
March 1, 2013 21 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by John Sheperd Kyle and Certification of Local Counsel Phillip E. Morton Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3418025. by Facebook, Inc.. (Morton, Phillip)
March 1, 2013 20 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark R. Weinstein and Certification of Local Counsel Phillip E. Morton Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3417967. by Facebook, Inc.. (Morton, Phillip)
March 1, 2013 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip Edward Morton on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Morton, Phillip)
February 28, 2013 18 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/27/2013 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones Jr. Discovery due by 7/12/2013. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/18/2013 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 2/28/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Pretrial Notice, # 2 Alexandria Magistrate Judge Consent Form)(stas)
February 28, 2013 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Richard Smith on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Smith, Stephen)
February 27, 2013 16 Featured Case ORDER It is hereby agreed by Pltf Rembrandt Social Media, LP, subject to approval by the Court, that the deadline for AddThis, Inc. to move with respect to, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint be extended to March 12, 2013. This relief will not delay issuance of an intitial scheduling order. SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr on 2/27/2013. (stas)
February 27, 2013 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by AddThis, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Campbell, Christopher)
February 15, 2013 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to AddThis, Inc.; AddThis, Inc. served on 2/6/2013, answer due 2/27/2013. (stas)
February 15, 2013 13 Featured Case ORDER granting 9 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Lawrence Kolodney. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 2/15/2013. (stas)
February 15, 2013 12 Featured Case ORDER granting 8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by John Goetz. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 2/15/2013. (stas)
February 15, 2013 11 Featured Case ORDER granting 7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert Hillman. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 2/15/2013. (stas)
February 14, 2013 10 Featured Case ORDER granting 6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Melsheimer. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 2/14/2013. (stas)
February 13, 2013 9 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Lawrence Kolodney and Certification of Local Counsel Ahmed Davis Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3396950. by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Davis, Ahmed)
February 13, 2013 8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by John Goetz and Certification of Local Counsel Ahmed Davis Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3396922. by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Davis, Ahmed)
February 13, 2013 7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert Hillman and Certification of Local Counsel Ahmed Davis Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3396890. by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Davis, Ahmed)
February 11, 2013 6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Melsheimer and Certification of Local Counsel Ahmed Davis Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3393569. by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Davis, Ahmed)
February 7, 2013 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Facebook, Inc.; Facebook, Inc. served on 2/6/2013, answer due 2/27/2013. (stas)
February 5, 2013 4 Summons Issued and given to atty for pltf for service by SPS as to defts, AddThis, Inc., Facebook, Inc. (stas)
February 4, 2013 3 Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark(s) 6,415,316 and 6,289,362. (stas)
February 4, 2013 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (stas)
February 4, 2013 1 COMPLAINT against AddThis, Inc., Facebook, Inc. (Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 14683033847), filed by Rembrandt Social Media, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Receipt, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(stas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Rembrandt Social Media, LP v. Facebook, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rembrandt Social Media, LP
Represented By: Ahmed Jamal Davis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Phillip Edward Morton
Represented By: Stephen Richard Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AddThis, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Charles Campbell
Represented By: Stephen Patrick McBride
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]