Dr. Archie Earl v. Norfolk State University et al

Defendant: The Board of Visitors of Norfolk State University, Norfolk State University and The Commonwealth Of Virginia
Plaintiff: Dr. Archie Earl
Case Number: 2:2013cv00148
Filed: March 21, 2013
Court: Virginia Eastern District Court
Office: Norfolk Office
County: Hampton City
Referring Judge: Tommy E. Miller
Presiding Judge: Raymond A. Jackson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 13, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER Granting 13 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction For the reasons stated above, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file within fourteen (14) days, if desired, a Second Amended Complaint curing the deficiencies identified in this Opinion and Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Mark S. Davis and filed on 2/13/14. Copies distributed to all parties 2/13/14. (ldab, )
June 26, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that Defendants' Third 24 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED, IN PART, and DENIED, IN PART; the Court DISMISSES Plaintiff's Title VII race discrimination and ADEA age discrimination claims for lack of subject matterjurisdictio n. The Court DISMISSES Plaintiff's Title VII sex discrimination claim because Plaintiff fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. The Court DISMISSES Plaintiff's retaliation claim for lack of subject matter jurisdiction with respect to the allegedly retaliatory acts occurring before December 8, 2011, and DISMISSES Plaintiff's retaliation claim for failing to state a claim upon which relief can be granted as to the acts occurring after December 8, 2011. The Court DENIES Defendants' Third Motion to Dismiss with respect to Plaintiff's EPA disparate treatment claim. Signed by District Judge Mark S. Davis and filed on 6/26/2014. (rsim, )
November 18, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 38 Motion to Certify Class. For the reasons set forth above, Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Class Certification and for an Order Authorizing Court Notice to Potential Class Members, ECF No. 38, is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. As to certification of a collective action pursuant to 29 U.S.C. § 216(b), Plaintiff's motion is GRANTED and the Court CONDITIONALLY CERTIFIES a collective action by the following class: All salaried male teaching faculty members wh o worked for Norfolk State University at any time since March 21, 2010. As to Plaintiff's request for court-ordered discovery of potential collective action members, the Court GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART Plaintiff's motion. The Cour t DENIES Plaintiff's motion to the extent it seeks an order requiring Defendants to provide Plaintiff with the email addresses and telephone numbers of putative collective action members and to post notice in conspicuous locations on the NSU cam pus, including NSU's website. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's motion to the extent he seeks an order requiring Defendants to provide his attorney with the names and addresses of putative collective action members. Defendants are DIRECTED to pr ovide to Plaintiff's counsel, in a list in electronic format, the names and last known addresses of all potential members of the conditionally certified collective action within fourteen (14) days of the entry of this Opinion and Order. Further , the Court DIRECTS that such information only be disseminated among Plaintiff's counsel and DIRECTS that Plaintiff's counsel may use such information only in connection with this litigation. The Court PROVIDES Defendants with leave to fil e objections to Plaintiff's proposed notice, ECF No. 38-7, or to propose their own form of notice, within fourteen (14) days after the entry of this Opinion and Order. The Court PROVIDES Plaintiff with leave to file a reply within seven (7) days after Defendants file any such objection or proposed notice. It is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Mark S. Davis and filed on 11/18/14. Copies distributed to all parties 11/19/14. (ldab, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dr. Archie Earl v. Norfolk State University et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of Visitors of Norfolk State University
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk State University
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Commonwealth Of Virginia
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Archie Earl
Represented By: Guy Theodore Hogan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]