Widener v. City of Bristol, Virginia et al

 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00053
Filed: June 21, 2013
 
Court: Virginia Western District Court
Office: Abingdon Office
Presiding Judge: James P. Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 12, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by City of Bristol, Virginia, granting 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bristol Virginia Sheriff's Office with leave granted to the plaintiff to amend to add a new party defendant, provided that a second amended complaint must be filed no later than fourteen days after the date of entry of this Opinion and Order, granting 10 Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by City of Bristol, Virginia; dismissing Bristol Virginia Sheriffs Office and City of Bristol, Virginia as parties to this case. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 11/12/2013. (lml)
January 13, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 25 Motion for Leave of Court to Amend Complaint; denying 23 Motion to Dismiss; the Motion to Dismiss is treated as a Motion for Summary Judgment under Rule 56 and the plaintiff must file a response thereto within 14 days of the date of this Order. The Sheriff may file a reply within 7 days of service of the response. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 1/13/2014. (lml)
July 2, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 7/2/2014. (lml)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Widener v. City of Bristol, Virginia et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]