Russell v. Wright et al

Plaintiff: Anita Russell
Defendant: Taser International, Inc., Denney Wright, Appomattox County and Commonwealth Of Virginia
Interested Party: Albemarle County Circuit Court
Case Number: 3:2011cv00075
Filed: November 30, 2011
Court: Virginia Western District Court
Office: Charlottesville Office
Presiding Judge: Glen E. Conrad
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 15, 2013 100 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 2/14/2013. (mab)
February 15, 2013 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Motion to Exclude denying 75 ; on Motion to Exclude Denied as moot 76 ; granting 77 Motion for Joinder; on Motion to Exclude granting in part and denying in part 78 . Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 2/14/2013. (mab)
April 11, 2013 150 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 04/11/2013. (ssm)
March 13, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 3/12/12. (jcj)
January 4, 2013 95 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 1/4/2013. (ssm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russell v. Wright et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Russell
Represented By: Peter Andrew Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taser International, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy Ethridge Carroll
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denney Wright
Represented By: Elizabeth Kay Dillon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Appomattox County
Represented By: Elizabeth Kay Dillon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Of Virginia
Represented By: George Walerian Chabalewski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Albemarle County Circuit Court
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]