Lai v. Dept. of Justice et al

 
Case Number: 5:2013cv00033
Filed: March 28, 2013
 
Court: Virginia Western District Court
Office: Harrisonburg Office
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 29, 2013 26 Featured Case ORDER granting 11 Motion to Dismiss; adopting re 22 Report and Recommendations. Signed by District Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 7/26/2013. (jat)
October 16, 2013 33 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 31 Report and Recommendations, 27 Motion to Dismiss filed by Dept. of Justice, ATF, Thomas Fisher, Eric, U.S. Marshal, Chris Baker ; granting 27 Motion to Dismiss; adopting Report and Recommendations re 31 Report and Recommendations.. Signed by District Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 10/16/2013. (mab)
March 28, 2013 4 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND OPINION TRANSFERRING CASE TO WESTERN DISTRICT OF VIRGINIA: Pursuant to the attached Memorandum and Order, in the interest of justice, the following cases are consolidated and the Clerk of Court is hereby directed to tr ansfer these cases to the United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia: 13-CV-715; 13-CV-716; 13-CV-717; and 13-CV-890. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order to plaintiff, and mark these cases closed. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 3/28/2013. (Mauskopf, Roslynn) Modified on 3/28/2013 (Marziliano, August). [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/28/2013.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lai v. Dept. of Justice et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]