Elderberry of Weber City, LLC v. Living Centers - Southeast, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Elderberry of Weber City, LLC
Defendant: FMSC Weber City Operating Company, LLC, Living Centers - Southeast, Inc., Mariner Health Care, Inc. and Continiumcare of Weber City, LLC
 
Case Number: 6:2012cv00052
Filed: September 27, 2012
 
Court: Virginia Western District Court
Office: Lynchburg Office
Presiding Judge: Norman K. Moon
 
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 24, 2013 138 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on 07/24/2013. (kab)
July 24, 2013 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 76 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 78 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 80 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 83 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on 07/24/2013. (kab)
September 6, 2013 189 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on September 6, 2013. (sfc)
August 11, 2014 261 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on August 11, 2014. (sfc)
August 11, 2014 262 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: adopting Report and Recommendations re 256 Report and Recommendations; granting in part 197 Motion for Attorney Fees and Plaintiff is awarded $278,864.12 in attorney's fees and expenses; and denying as moot 260 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on August 11, 2014. (sfc)
March 20, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on March 20, 2013. (sfc)
April 5, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on 4/5/13. (hnw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Elderberry of Weber City, LLC v. Living Centers - Southeast, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elderberry of Weber City, LLC
Represented By: Travis Alan Knobbe
Represented By: Milton Mallory Mantiply
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMSC Weber City Operating Company, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Living Centers - Southeast, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mariner Health Care, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continiumcare of Weber City, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]