Teleguz v. Pearson

Respondent: Loretta Kelly
Petitioner: Ivan Teleguz
 
Case Number: 7:2010cv00254
Filed: June 14, 2010
 
Court: Virginia Western District Court
Office: Roanoke Office
Presiding Judge: James P. Jones
 
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 11, 2012 130 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER directing hearing. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 12/11/12. (sc)
June 17, 2013 222 Featured Case OPINION. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 6/17/2013. (lml)
September 24, 2013 268 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER denying 241 Second Motion for Leave to Conduct discovery; granting in part and denying part 242 Motion for Leave to Seek Deposition Testimony; denying 253 Motion for Funds for Admission of Witness. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 9/24/13. (ejs)
July 17, 2014 318 Featured Case OPINION SETTING FORTH FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 7/17/14. (ejs)
August 1, 2011 91 Featured Case OPINION. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on August 1, 2011. (aec)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Teleguz v. Pearson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Loretta Kelly
Represented By: Steven Andrew Witmer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ivan Teleguz
Represented By: Elizabeth Jane Peiffer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]