Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University v. Hokie Real Estate, Inc. Featured Case

Defendant: Hokie Real Estate, Inc.
Plaintiff: Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University
 
Case Number: 7:2010cv00466
Filed: October 18, 2010
 
Court: Virginia Western District Court
Office: Roanoke Office
Presiding Judge: Glen E. Conrad
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 11, 2011 82 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 08/11/2011.
August 11, 2011 81 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Hokie Real Estate, Inc..
August 4, 2011 80 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge B. Waugh Crigler: Settlement Conference held on 8/4/2011. (lab)
August 2, 2011 79 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge B. Waugh Crigler: Settlement Conference held on 8/2/2011.
August 1, 2011 78 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge B. Waugh Crigler: Settlement Conference held on 8/1/2011. (lab)
June 29, 2011 77 REPORT of Mediation signed by Magistrate Judge B. Waugh Crigler on 6/29/2011. (Case settled - Final Order due by August 1, 2011)
June 28, 2011 76 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge B. Waugh Crigler: In Chambers Mediation Conference held on 6/28/2011. (ssm)
June 21, 2011 75 Brief / Memorandum in Support re 74 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. filed by Hokie Real Estate, Inc., John Wilburn. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Certificate of Registration)
June 21, 2011 74 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Hokie Real Estate, Inc., John Wilburn.
June 16, 2011 73 E-NOTICE of Hearing: Mediation Hearing reset for 6/28/2011 10:00 AM in Roanoke before Magistrate Judge B. Waugh Crigler in the Ceremonial Courtroom.
June 9, 2011 72 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive Motions Deadline due by 10/21/2011, Jury Trial set for 1/23/2012 - 1/27/2012 @ 09:30 AM in Roanoke before District Judge Glen E. Conrad. Discovery due by 10/7/2011. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 6/9/2011.
June 8, 2011 71 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Motion Hearing held on 5/24/2011 before Judge Glen E. Conrad. Court Reporter/Transcriber Judy Webb, Telephone number 540-857-5100 X 5333/judyw@vawd.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/29/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/11/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/6/2011.
June 6, 2011 70 Featured Case ORDER granting 42 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 44 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims; granting 46 Motion to Reopen the Time for Expert Disclosures. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 06/06/2011.
June 6, 2011 69 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 06/06/2011.
May 27, 2011 67 Summons Issued as to John Wilburn.
May 26, 2011 66 Featured Case ORDER setting Mediation Hearing for 6/28/2011 09:00 AM in Roanoke before Magistrate Judge B. Waugh Crigler. Signed by Magistrate Judge B. Waugh Crigler on 05/26/2011.
May 26, 2011 65 Proposed Summons by Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University as toJohn Wilburn.
May 26, 2011 64 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hokie Real Estate, Inc., John Wilburn, filed by Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)
May 26, 2011 63 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge B. Waugh Crigler. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 05/26/2011.
May 25, 2011 62 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University for proceedings held on May 24, 2011 reported by Court Reporter Judy Webb before Judge Glen E. Conrad..
May 24, 2011 61 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Glen E. Conrad: Motion Hearing held on 5/24/2011 re 42 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint filed by Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University, 46 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Motion to Reopen Time for Expert Disclosure and Extend the Trial Date filed by Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University, 44 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Lawrence Hincker, Locke White, Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University. (Court Reporter Webb.) (lab)
May 23, 2011 60 NOTICE by Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University re 55 Reply to Response to Motion of Filing Corrected Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Corrected Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss)
May 19, 2011 59 E-NOTICE of Hearing on Motions 46 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Motion to Reopen Time for Expert Disclosure and Extend the Trial Date, 42 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, 44 MOTION to Dismiss : Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2011 10:30 AM in Roanoke before District Judge Glen E. Conrad.
May 17, 2011 58 Featured Case ORDER terminating reference to USMJ. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 05/17/2011.
May 16, 2011 57 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Motion Hearing held on 2/28/2011 before Judge Glen E. Conrad. Court Reporter/Transcriber Judy Webb, Telephone number 540-857-5100 X 5333/judyw@vawd.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/6/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/16/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/15/2011.
May 12, 2011 56 REPLY to Response to Motion re 46 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Motion to Reopen Time for Expert Disclosure and Extend the Trial Date. filed by Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University.
May 12, 2011 55 REPLY to Response to Motion re 44 MOTION to Dismiss. filed by Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University.
May 12, 2011 54 REPLY to Response to Motion re 42 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint. filed by Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University.
May 2, 2011 53 RESPONSE in Opposition re 46 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Motion to Reopen Time for Expert Disclosure and Extend the Trial Date. filed by Hokie Real Estate, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)
May 2, 2011 52 RESPONSE in Opposition re 44 MOTION to Dismiss. filed by Hokie Real Estate, Inc..
May 2, 2011 51 RESPONSE in Opposition re 42 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint. filed by Hokie Real Estate, Inc..
April 28, 2011 50 Featured Case ORDER granting 48 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney John Harrold Thomas terminated. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 4/28/2011.
April 27, 2011 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Blair N. C. Wood on behalf of Hokie Real Estate, Inc.
April 27, 2011 48 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University.Motions referred to Michael F. Urbanski.
April 18, 2011 47 Brief / Memorandum in Support re 46 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Motion to Reopen Time for Expert Disclosure and Extend the Trial Date. filed by Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University.
April 18, 2011 46 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Motion to Reopen Time for Expert Disclosure and Extend the Trial Date by Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University.Motions referred to Michael F. Urbanski.
April 18, 2011 45 Brief / Memorandum in Support re 44 MOTION to Dismiss. filed by Lawrence Hincker, Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University, Locke White.
April 18, 2011 44 MOTION to Dismiss by Lawrence Hincker, Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University, Locke White.
April 18, 2011 43 Brief / Memorandum in Support re 42 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint. filed by Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)
April 18, 2011 42 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint by Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University.Motions referred to Michael F. Urbanski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)
April 13, 2011 41 Featured Case ORDER granting 37 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for R. Charles Henn, Jr. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 4/13/2011.
April 13, 2011 40 Featured Case ORDER granting 36 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Alex Fonoroff. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 4/13/2011.
April 13, 2011 39 Featured Case ORDER granting 35 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Alicia Grahn Jones. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 04/13/2011.
April 13, 2011 38 Featured Case ORDER granting 34 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for E. Harris W. Henderson, Esquire. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 4/13/2011.
April 13, 2011 37 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for R. Charles Henn by Lawrence Hincker, Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University, Locke White.Motions referred to Michael F. Urbanski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)
April 13, 2011 36 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Alex Fonoroff by Lawrence Hincker, Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University, Locke White.Motions referred to Michael F. Urbanski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)
April 13, 2011 35 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Alicia Jones by Lawrence Hincker, Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University, Locke White.Motions referred to Michael F. Urbanski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)
April 13, 2011 34 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Edward Henderson by Lawrence Hincker, Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University, Locke White.Motions referred to Michael F. Urbanski. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)
April 13, 2011 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Kay Kurtz Heidbreder on behalf of Lawrence Hincker, Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University, Locke White
April 7, 2011 32 RETURN of service of Summons on 04/06/2011 upon Lawrence Hinker and Locke White
April 6, 2011 31 Summons Issued as to Lawrence Hincker, Locke White.
April 5, 2011 30 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University.
March 28, 2011 29 AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND ANSWER to 1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University, Locke White, Lawrence Hincker by Hokie Real Estate, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G (Part 1), # 8 Exhibit G (Part 2), # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I (Part 1), # 11 Exhibit I (Part 2), # 12 Exhibit I (Part 3), # 13 Exhibit J, # 14 Exhibit K, # 15 Exhibit L, # 16 Exhibit M, # 17 Exhibit N, # 18 Exhibit O, # 19 Exhibit P, # 20 Exhibit Q, # 21 Exhibit R (Part 1), # 22 Exhibit R (Part 2), # 23 Exhibit S (Part 1), # 24 Exhibit S (Part 2), # 25 Exhibit S (Part 3))
March 16, 2011 28 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University for proceedings held on 2/28/2011 transcribed by Court Reporter Webb before Judge Conrad..
March 15, 2011 27 Featured Case ORDER denying 3 Motion to Dismiss; denying 9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 03/15/2011.
March 15, 2011 26 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 03/15/2011.
February 28, 2011 25 Exhibit List for Motions Hearing held 2/28/2011.(lab)
February 28, 2011 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Glen E. Conrad: Motion Hearing held on 2/28/2011 re 3 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Hokie Real Estate, Inc., 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University. (Court Reporter Webb.) (lab)
January 17, 2011 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Memorandum in Support if Motion for Preliminary Injunction, 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. filed by Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University.
January 11, 2011 22 Letter re: Compact disc containing exhibits in electronic format hand delivered to the Court this day by defendant through counsel
January 10, 2011 21 Letter for Filing and Service of Large Exhibits to Def.'s Opp'n to Mot. Prelim. Inj. by Hokie Real Estate, Inc..
January 10, 2011 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. filed by Hokie Real Estate, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John Wilburn, # 2 Declaration of Dr. Johann Norstedt)
January 3, 2011 19 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 01/03/2011.
December 30, 2010 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael F. Urbanski: Scheduling Conference, Telephone Conference held on 12/30/2010.
December 30, 2010 17 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 3 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) set for 2/28/2011 09:30 AM in Roanoke before District Judge Glen E. Conrad., 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction set for 2/28/2011 10:30 AM in Roanoke before District Judge Glen E. Conrad.
December 28, 2010 16 Featured Case AGREED ORDER extending deadline to 1/10/2011. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 12/28/2010.
December 27, 2010 15 Letter re: Scheduling Order by Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University. (No jury trial requested to date)
December 23, 2010 14 NOTICE of Hearing:Telephone Status Conference re: scheduling of Motion for Prelim Injunction/Discovery set for 12/30/2010 11:00 AM in Roanoke before Magistrate Judge Michael F. Urbanski. Parties should contact chambers as to availability and to provide #'s on December 27, 2010 or later.
December 22, 2010 13 NOTICE of Hearing by Attorney for Hokie Real Estate, Inc. re 3 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) Hearing on Def.'s Motion to Dismiss to be held on January 24, 2011, at 2 p.m., at U.S. District Court, Roanoke, Courtroom 202, before Judge Conrad. Confirmed with U.S. Clerk's Office.
December 21, 2010 12 Letter by counsel for Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University.
December 21, 2010 11 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive Motions Deadline due by 6/29/2011 Jury Trial set for 8/8/2011 09:30 AM in Roanoke before District Judge Glen E. Conrad. Discovery due by 6/24/2011.. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 12/21/2010.
December 20, 2010 10 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Affidavit, # 4 Affidavit)(Thomas, John) Modified on 2/16/2011 (ssm).
December 20, 2010 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University.
December 8, 2010 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re 3 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). filed by Hokie Real Estate, Inc..
December 2, 2010 7 Scheduling Letter w/ Proposed Trial Dates.
December 1, 2010 6 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re 3 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6), 4 Brief / Memorandum in Support. filed by Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University.
November 17, 2010 5 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hokie Real Estate, Inc..
November 17, 2010 4 Brief / Memorandum in Support re 3 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). filed by Hokie Real Estate, Inc..
November 17, 2010 3 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by Hokie Real Estate, Inc..
October 18, 2010 2 Summons Issued as to Hokie Real Estate, Inc. - Original mailed this day to counsel for service.
October 18, 2010 1 COMPLAINT against Hokie Real Estate, Inc. (Filing fee $ 350.), filed by Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University. 100 Day Notice due by 1/26/2011 120 Day Service due by 2/15/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University v. Hokie Real Estate, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hokie Real Estate, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University
Represented By: John Harrold Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]