Thomas et al v. Carmeuse Lime & Stone, Inc.

Plaintiff: Irene S. Thomas and Justin D. Thomas
Defendant: Carmeuse Lime & Stone, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2012cv00413
Filed: August 30, 2012
Court: Virginia Western District Court
Office: Roanoke Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Turk
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge James C. Turk on 9/6/12. (med)
January 16, 2015 217 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Glen E. Conrad on 1/16/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(ssm)
December 17, 2012 38 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge James C. Turk on 12/17/12. (sas)
December 17, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing without prejudice as moot 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying as moot 19 Motion to Dismiss; denying 33 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James C. Turk on 12/17/12. (sas)
July 24, 2013 76 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge James C. Turk on 7/24/13. (med)
October 2, 2013 99 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge James C. Turk on 10/2/13. (med)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas et al v. Carmeuse Lime & Stone, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene S. Thomas
Represented By: Justin Michael Lugar
Represented By: J. Scott Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin D. Thomas
Represented By: Justin Michael Lugar
Represented By: J. Scott Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmeuse Lime & Stone, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Moore Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.