Gallion v. Medco Health Solutions Inc et al

Defendant: Disability Management Alternatives LLC, Medco Health Solutions Inc and Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Karen Gallion
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00135
Filed: April 4, 2013
 
Court: Washington Eastern District Court
Office: Spokane Office
County: Spokane
Presiding Judge: Thomas O. Rice
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2013 12 Featured Case STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
April 2, 2014 25 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT MEDCO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC.s MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS. Defendant Medco Health Solutions, Inc.s Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings ECF No. 13 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs claims for violations of the Washington Co nsumer Protection Act, as well as any claims arising from a denial of long-term disability benefits, are DISMISSED with leave to amend within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order. All other claims are DISMISSED with prejudice. Defendants Disability Management Alternatives, LLC, and Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
May 15, 2014 30 Featured Case ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Plaintiffs Motion for Reconsideration ECF No. 27 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
August 22, 2014 44 Featured Case ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Pursuant to the parties Stipulation for Dismissal ECF No. 43 , all claims and causes of action in this matter are DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs or fees to either party. All pending motions are DENIED as moot. The file is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
August 26, 2014 45 Featured Case JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL ACTION. All claims and causes of action in this matter are DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs or fees to either party.(LLH, Courtroom Deputy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gallion v. Medco Health Solutions Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Disability Management Alternatives LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medco Health Solutions Inc
Represented By: Deidra Nguyen
Represented By: Ryan P Hammond
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Gallion
Represented By: Bradley Edward Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]