Gordon v. Virtumundo Inc et al Featured Case

Defendant: Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn, Virtumundo Inc and John Does
Plaintiff: Omni Innovations LLC and James S Gordon, Jr
 
Case Number: 2:2006cv00204
Filed: February 9, 2006
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
March 10, 2010 163 Featured Case ORDER denying 159 Plaintiff's Motion for Relief from judgment, by Judge John C Coughenour.(MD)
February 22, 2010 162 RESPONSE, by Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn, to 159 MOTION for Relief. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Linke, Derek)
February 15, 2010 161 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Derek Linke on behalf of Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn. (Linke, Derek)
February 10, 2010 160 DECLARATION of Plaintiff re 159 MOTION for Relief from Judgment (KL)
February 10, 2010 159 Plaintiff's FRCP 60 MOTION for Relief From Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/26/2010, (KL)
September 1, 2009 158 MANDATE of USCA (07-35487) as to 124 Notice of Appeal filed by James S Gordon, Jr, Omni Innovations LLC, The judgment of this Court, entered 8/6/09, takes effect this date. (SA)
August 6, 2009 157 OPINION of USCA (NOT THE MANDATE 07-35487) as to 124 Notice of Appeal filed by James S Gordon, Jr, Omni Innovations LLC - Argued and Submitted December 9, 2008Seattle, Washington, Opinion filed August 6, 2009 (SA)
November 19, 2008 156 Featured Case ORDER of USCA (07-35487) as to 124 Notice of Appeal filed by James S Gordon, Jr, Omni Innovations LLC, Corrections to Appellees' Deficient Supplemental Brief must be filed no later than Nov. 21, 2008. (SA)
November 17, 2008 155 Featured Case ORDER of USCA (07-35487) as to 124 Notice of Appeal filed by James S Gordon, Jr, Omni Innovations LLC, The deadline for Appellant to file corrections to Appellant's Deficient supplemental Brief is hereby AMENDED. Corrections to Appellant's Deficient Supplemental Brief must be filed no later than Friday, November 21, 2008. (SA)
November 4, 2008 154 Featured Case ORDER of USCA (07-35487) as to 124 Notice of Appeal filed by James S Gordon, Jr, Omni Innovations LLC, The motion of ASIS Internet Services, et al., to file amicus brief and to file brief late is GRANTED. Parties may file supplemental briefing addressing the arguments of the amicus brief no later then 11/14/08. This order does not consolidate this case and any other proceeding or appeal currently pending. (SA)
August 26, 2008 153 Featured Case ORDER of USCA (07-35487) as to 124 Notice of Appeal filed by James S Gordon, Jr, Omni Innovations LLC, The court has received appellant's pro se motion to vacate judgment, appellant is represented by counsel, the court will not consider the pro se filing. Motion to be served on appellant's counsel of record, Timothy Walton, Esq. This case is ready for calendaring. (SA)
January 10, 2008 152 Featured Case ORDER by Judge John C Coughenour. The Court hereby DENIES (Dkt. No. 151 ) Emergency Exemption Claims for Business and Personal Property and Motion to Shorten Time.(TS, ),
January 7, 2008 151 MOTION to Shorten Time Re: Emergency Exemption Claims for Business and Personal Property by Plaintiff James S Gordon, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Emergency Exemption Claims for Business and Personal Property# 2 Hearing on Motion to Shorten Time# 3 Proposed Order)Noting Date 1/25/2008.(TS, ) Modified text on 1/7/2008 (TS, ).
September 10, 2007 150 PRAECIPE for Abstract of Amended Judgment - Issued and mailed to Attorney Matthew D Green re 149 Judgment by Court. (TS, )
August 1, 2007 149 AMENDMENT JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE/DECISION BY COURT. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED: Pursuant to the Court's May 15, 2007 Order docket no. 121 , summary judgment has been GRANTED to Defendants. Pursuant to the Court's August 1, 2007 Order docket no. 148 , Defendants are entitled to a total award of attorneys' fees and costs in the amount of $111,440.00. This sum is equal to the hourly attorneys' fees award of $96,240.00, plus costs in the amount of $15,200.00. (CL, )
August 1, 2007 148 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 127 Motion for Attorney Fees; The Clerk is DIRECTED enter an amended judgment consistent with this Order. by Judge John C Coughenour.(GO)
July 24, 2007 147 REDACTION to 141 Order on Motion to Seal,, Ex C(4) Dkt No. 101 by Plaintiff James S Gordon, Jr. (Siegel, Robert)
July 24, 2007 146 REDACTION to 141 Order on Motion to Seal,, Ex C(3) Dkt No. 101 by Plaintiff James S Gordon, Jr. (Siegel, Robert)
July 24, 2007 145 REDACTION to 141 Order on Motion to Seal,, Ex C(2) Dkt No. 101 by Plaintiff James S Gordon, Jr. (Siegel, Robert)
July 24, 2007 144 REDACTION to 141 Order on Motion to Seal,, Ex C(1) Dkt No. 101 by Plaintiff James S Gordon, Jr. (Siegel, Robert)
July 24, 2007 143 REDACTION to 141 Order on Motion to Seal,, Ex B Dkt No. 93 by Plaintiff James S Gordon, Jr. (Siegel, Robert)
July 24, 2007 142 REDACTION to 141 Order on Motion to Seal,, Ex A Dkt No. 88 by Plaintiff James S Gordon, Jr. (Siegel, Robert)
July 19, 2007 141 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 123 Motion to Seal: The Clerk is DIRECTED to SEAL 88 , 93 , and 101 . Plaintiffs are ORDERED to separately file on this Court's electronic docket the redacted replacements for those documents, such that the docket entry for the redacted replacement for each sealed document or set of documents contains a link to the original, now sealed, complete version of that document or set of documents. Plaintiffs must file these three replacements within 7 court days of the date of this Minute Order by Judge John C Coughenour.(GO)
July 13, 2007 140 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL on behalf of Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn. Randall Moeller is substituted as counsel for Defendants. Attorney Roger M Townsend terminated. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Moeller, Randall)
July 6, 2007 139 DECLARATION of Scott Moore filed by Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn re 127 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs (Newman, Derek)
July 6, 2007 138 DECLARATION of Michael Fitzgerald filed by Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn re 127 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs (Newman, Derek)
July 6, 2007 137 REPLY, filed by Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn, TO RESPONSE to 127 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Newman, Derek)
July 2, 2007 136 DECLARATION of James S.Gordon, Jr. filed by Plaintiff James S Gordon, Jr re 127 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Siegel, Robert)
July 2, 2007 135 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff James S Gordon, Jr, to 127 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs. (Siegel, Robert)
June 20, 2007 134 TIME SCHEDULE ORDER (07-35487) as to 124 Notice of Appeal filed by James S Gordon, Jr, Omni Innovations LLC : Appellant shall notify Appellee regarding transcripts by 06/25/07; Appellee to notify Appellant regarding any additional transcripts by 07/05/07; Transcript designation due by 07/16/07; Transcript by court reporter due by 08/15/07; Appellants opening brief due by 10/01/07; Appellees response brief due by 10/31/07; Appellants optional reply brief due within 14 days of service of the response brief. (LMK, )
June 19, 2007 133 DECLARATION of Steven M. Hayes filed by Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn re 127 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Newman, Derek)
June 19, 2007 132 DECLARATION of Seth Wilkinson filed by Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn re 127 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Newman, Derek)
June 19, 2007 131 DECLARATION of Jessica Eaves Mathews filed by Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn re 127 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Newman, Derek)
June 19, 2007 130 DECLARATION of Spencer D. Freeman filed by Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn re 127 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Newman, Derek)
June 19, 2007 129 DECLARATION of Eric P. Blank filed by Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn re 127 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Newman, Derek)
June 19, 2007 128 DECLARATION of Derek A. Newman filed by Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn re 127 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Newman, Derek)
June 19, 2007 127 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Certificate of Service)Noting Date 7/6/2007.(Newman, Derek)
June 18, 2007 126 APPEAL NOTIFICATION packet sent to US Court of Appeals re 124 Notice of Appeal (Attachments: # 1 Docket)(SA, )
June 15, 2007 Appeal Fees received: fee in the amount of $ 455.00 (receipt # SEA10097) re 124 Notice of Appeal filed by James S Gordon, Jr, Omni Innovations LLC (SA, )
June 15, 2007 125 Civil Appeals Docketing Statement, by Plaintiffs James S Gordon, Jr, Omni Innovations LLC, to be transmitted by Clerk to Circuit Court of Appeals. (SA, )
June 15, 2007 124 NOTICE OF APPEAL (07-35487)as to 122 Judgment by Court, 121 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Plaintiffs James S Gordon, Jr, Omni Innovations LLC. Filing Fee $455 (SA, ) Modified on 6/21/2007; added CCA case number (LMK, ).
June 14, 2007 123 MOTION to Seal And File Redacted Documents by Plaintiff James S Gordon, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C(1)# 4 Exhibit C(2)# 5 Exhibit C(3)# 6 Exhibit # 7 Proposed Order)Noting Date 6/29/2007.(Siegel, Robert)
June 5, 2007 122 JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE/DECISION BY COURT. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED; Pursaunt to the Court's May 15, 2007 Order docket no. 121 , summary judgment has been GRANTED to defendants. (CL, )
May 15, 2007 121 Featured Case ORDER by Judge John C Coughenour. The Court STRIKES AS MOOT 38 Motion for Bond; DENIES 53 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; DENIES 86 Motion for Leave; STRIKES AS MOOT 87 Motion to Compel; DENIES 91 Motion to Seal; GRANTS 97 Motion for Leave to File; GRANTS 98 Motion for Summary Judgment; STRIKES AS MOOT 116 Motion to Exclude; STRIKES AS MOOT 69 Motion to Compel, STRIKES AS MOOT 71 Motion to Compel, DENIES 120 Motion to Seal. The June 18, 2007 trial date and all associated deadlines are STRICKEN.(CL, ) Modified on 5/15/2007 (CL, ). Modified text on 5/16/2007 ( CL, ).
April 13, 2007 120 MOTION to Seal Portions of Declaration of Derek A. Newman by Plaintiff Omni Innovations LLC. Noting Date 5/4/2007.(Siegel, Robert)
March 30, 2007 119 REPLY, filed by Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn, TO RESPONSE to 116 MOTION to Exclude Testimony from Lately Disclosed Witnesses or to Compel Their Depositions (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Townsend, Roger)
March 26, 2007 118 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff James S Gordon, Jr, to 116 MOTION to Exclude Testimony from Lately Disclosed Witnesses or to Compel Their Depositions. (Siegel, Robert)
March 15, 2007 117 DECLARATION of Roger Townsend filed by Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn re 116 MOTION to Exclude Testimony from Lately Disclosed Witnesses or to Compel Their Depositions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Letter Dated December 20, 2006 To Plaintiffs' Counsel From Defendants' Counsel# 2 Exhibit B - Email Communication Dated 12/27/2006# 3 Exhibit C - Email Communication Dated 12/28/2006# 4 Exhibit D - Email Communication Dated 2/21/2007# 5 Exhibit E - Letter Dated March 13, 2007 To Plaintiffs' Counsel From Defendants' Counsel# 6 Exhibit F- Email Communication Dated 3/14/2007)(Newman, Derek)
March 15, 2007 116 MOTION to Exclude Testimony from Lately Disclosed Witnesses or to Compel Their Depositions by Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Excluding Witness Testimony or Compelling Their Depositions)Noting Date 3/30/2007.(Newman, Derek)
March 15, 2007 115 Featured Case CORRECTED ORDER re 114 Order continuing trial date and related deadlines, by Judge John C Coughenour. (CL, )
March 15, 2007 114 Featured Case ORDER re 112 Stipulation filed by James S Gordon, Jr: Continuance Granted with modifications shown in this Order. (Jury Trial is set for 6/18/2007 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 16206 before John C Coughenour.)Pretrial Order due by 6/7/2007, Trial briefs to be submitted by 6/14/2007, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 6/14/2007 by Judge John C Coughenour. (GO)
March 13, 2007 113 REPORT from Mediator Philip E. Cutler regarding failure of mediation on March 5, 2007. (Cutler, Philip)
March 12, 2007 112 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER For Trial Continuance by parties. (Siegel, Robert)
February 27, 2007 111 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying 110 Stipulation filed by James S Gordon, Jr; 39.1 mediation to be completed by 3/6/2007 by Judge John C Coughenour. (GO)
February 21, 2007 110 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Re Mediation Deadline by parties. (Siegel, Robert)
February 16, 2007 109 DECLARATION of Derek Linke filed by Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn re 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Newman, Derek)
February 16, 2007 108 REPLY, filed by Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn, TO RESPONSE to 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Newman, Derek)
February 12, 2007 107 Third DECLARATION of James S. Gordon, Jr. filed by Plaintiff James S Gordon, Jr re 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1)(Siegel, Robert)
February 12, 2007 106 Second DECLARATION of Robert J. Siegel filed by Plaintiff James S Gordon, Jr re 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1)(Siegel, Robert)
February 12, 2007 105 DECLARATION of Peter W. Resinick filed by Plaintiff James S Gordon, Jr re 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Siegel, Robert)
February 12, 2007 104 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff James S Gordon, Jr, to 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Siegel, Robert)
January 26, 2007 103 REPLY, filed by Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn, TO RESPONSE to 87 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER TESTIMONY OF JAMES GORDON RE PRIOR SETTLEMENTS re 86 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal a Motion to Compel Discovery (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Newman, Derek)
January 23, 2007 102 DECLARATION of Derek Linke filed by Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn re 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Linke Log Part I# 2 Exhibit B - Linke Log Part II# 3 Exhibit C - Linke Log Part III# 4 Exhibit D - Linke Log Part IV# 5 Exhibit E - Linke Log Part V# 6 Exhibit F - Plaintiff Gordon's Answers and Responses to Defendant Adknowledge's First Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Gordon, pp. 1, 4# 7 Exhibit G - Plaintiff Omni's Answers and Responses to Defendant Virtumundo's First Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Omni, p. 1# 8 Exhibit H - Defendant Virtumundo, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Plaintiff Omni Innovations, LLC# 9 Exhibit I - Plaintiff Omni's Answers and Responses to Defendant Virtumundo's First Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Omni, pp. 1, 4# 10 Exhibit J- Defendant Virtumundo, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Plaintiff Gordon# 11 Exhibit K- Plaintiff Gordon's Answers and Responses to Defendant Virtumundo's First Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Gordon, pp. 1, 4# 12 Exhibit L - MSN website offering internet access service# 13 Exhibit M - EarthLink website offering internet access service# 14 Exhibit N - AOL website offering internet access service# 15 Exhibit O- Yahoo website offering internet access service)(Newman, Derek)
January 22, 2007 100 DECLARATION of Michael Geroe filed by Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn re 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Newman, Derek)
January 22, 2007 99 DECLARATION of Neal Krawetz, Ph.D. filed by Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn re 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Newman, Derek)
January 22, 2007 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn. Noting Date 2/16/2007.Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Newman, Derek) Modified duplicative text on 1/23/2007 (ECS, ).
January 22, 2007 97 MOTION for Leave to File Overlength Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn. Noting Date 1/22/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Newman, Derek) Modified duplicative text on 1/23/2007 (ECS, ).
January 22, 2007 96 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff James S Gordon, Jr, to 87 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER TESTIMONY OF JAMES GORDON RE PRIOR SETTLEMENTS re 86 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal a Motion to Compel Discovery. (Siegel, Robert)
January 17, 2007 95 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Robert J. Siegel on behalf of Plaintiffs James S Gordon, Jr, Omni Innovations LLC (Siegel, Robert)
January 16, 2007 94 SURREPLY filed by Plaintiffs James S Gordon, Jr, Omni Innovations LLC re 38 MOTION for Bond for An Undertaking Pursuant to 15 U.S.C. Section 7706 (g)(4) (Siegel, Robert)
January 12, 2007 92 SEALED DOCUMENT - Reply in Support of Motion for Undertaking by Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn re 91 MOTION to Seal Reply in Support of Motion for Undertaking (Dkt. No. 92). (Newman, Derek) Modified on 5/15/2007 (CL, ). (Document unsealed per Order, docket no. 121 .
January 12, 2007 91 MOTION to Seal Reply in Support of Motion for Undertaking (Dkt. No. 92) by Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn. Noting Date 2/2/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Leave to File Under Seal Defendants' Reply re Motion for Undertaking)(Newman, Derek)
January 12, 2007 90 DECLARATION of Robert J. Siegel filed by Plaintiffs James S Gordon, Jr, Omni Innovations LLC re 53 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Siegel, Robert)
January 12, 2007 89 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs James S Gordon, Jr, Omni Innovations LLC, TO RESPONSE to 53 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Siegel, Robert)
January 11, 2007 87 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER TESTIMONY OF JAMES GORDON RE PRIOR SETTLEMENTS re 86 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal a Motion to Compel Discovery by Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc. Noting Date 1/26/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Compel Deposition Testimony from James Gordon re Prior Settlements)(Newman, Derek) Modified text on 5/15/2007 (CL, ). (Unsealed as per Order, docket no. 121 .
January 11, 2007 86 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal a Motion to Compel Discovery by Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc. Noting Date 1/26/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Leave to File Motion and Declaration Under Seal)(Newman, Derek)
January 8, 2007 85 APPLICATION by Defendant Virtumundo Inc AND ORDER admitting Michael R Geroe for Virtumundo Inc pro hac vice. Receipt # SEA6423. (cm-ecf application mailed) (CL, )
January 8, 2007 84 DECLARATION of Derek A. Newman filed by Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn re 53 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Email Exchange Between Counsel# 2 Exhibit B - Requests for admissions that Defendant Virtumundo propounded on Plaintiffs# 3 Exhibit C - Omni's Responses to Virtumundo's First Requests for Admission)(Newman, Derek)
January 8, 2007 83 DECLARATION of Michael Shopmaker filed by Defendant Virtumundo Inc re 53 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Newman, Derek)
January 8, 2007 82 RESPONSE, by Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn, to 53 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Objections to Evidence)(Newman, Derek)
January 5, 2007 81 REPLY, filed by Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn, TO RESPONSE to 71 MOTION to Compel Segregation of Emails (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Newman, Derek)
January 5, 2007 80 REPLY, filed by Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn, TO RESPONSE to 69 MOTION to Compel Discovery (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Newman, Derek)
January 2, 2007 79 DECLARATION of Robert J. Siegel filed by Plaintiffs James S Gordon, Jr, Omni Innovations LLC re 71 MOTION to Compel Segregation of Emails (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Siegel, Robert)
January 2, 2007 78 DECLARATION of James S. Gordon filed by Plaintiffs James S Gordon, Jr, Omni Innovations LLC re 71 MOTION to Compel Segregation of Emails (Siegel, Robert)
January 2, 2007 77 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs James S Gordon, Jr, Omni Innovations LLC, to 71 MOTION to Compel Segregation of Emails. (Siegel, Robert)
January 2, 2007 76 DECLARATION of James S. Gordon, Jr. filed by Plaintiffs James S Gordon, Jr, Omni Innovations LLC re 69 MOTION to Compel Discovery (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C, part 1# 4 Exhibit C, part 2# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F)(Siegel, Robert)
January 2, 2007 75 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs James S Gordon, Jr, Omni Innovations LLC, to 69 MOTION to Compel Discovery. (Siegel, Robert)
December 29, 2006 74 PRAECIPE re 53 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Corrected calculation of damages on pages 23-24 of Motion by Plaintiffs James S Gordon, Jr, Omni Innovations LLC. (Siegel, Robert)
December 21, 2006 73 DECLARATION of Derek Linke filed by Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn re 71 MOTION to Compel Segregation of Emails (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Feb 2, 2006 Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel# 2 Exhibit B - Nov. 14, 2006 Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel# 3 Exhibit C - Gordon's Discovery Explanation# 4 Exhibit D - Nov. 29, 2006 Letter to Plaintiff's Counsel# 5 Exhibit E - Dec. 5, 2006 Email from Plaintiff's Counsel# 6 Exhibit F- Dec. 20, 2006 Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel# 7 Exhibit G - Dec. 21, 2006 Letter to Plaintiffs' Counsel)(Newman, Derek)
December 21, 2006 72 DECLARATION of Derek A. Newman filed by Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn re 71 MOTION to Compel Segregation of Emails (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Transcript of "Meet and Confer")(Newman, Derek)
December 21, 2006 71 MOTION to Compel Segregation of Emails by Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn. Noting Date 1/5/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Segregate Emails)(Newman, Derek)
December 21, 2006 70 DECLARATION of Roger Townsend filed by Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn re 69 MOTION to Compel Discovery (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A1 - Lynns First Interrogatories to Gordon# 2 Exhibit A2 - Lynns First Interrogatories to Omni# 3 Exhibit B - Discovery Responses# 4 Exhibit C - Letter from Plaintiff re First Supp Discovery Respnses# 5 Exhibit D - Virtumundo's First set of Interrogaotires and Requests for Production to Gordon# 6 Exhibit E - Plaintiff's Purported Email Analysis# 7 Exhibit F - Purported Legend re Email Analysis# 8 Exhibit G - Letter to Plaintiff's Counsel re "Meet and Confer"# 9 Exhibit H - Transcript of "Meet and Confer" at Deposition)(Newman, Derek)
December 21, 2006 69 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn. Noting Date 1/5/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Compel)(Newman, Derek)
December 19, 2006 68 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER re Voluminous Documents by Judge John C Coughenour. (GO)
December 19, 2006 67 Featured Case ORDER re 52 Stipulation: Pls.' responses to Defs. due by 12/20/2006; Discovery completed and discovery motions filed by 12/22/2006; by Judge John C Coughenour. (GO) Modified text on 12/19/2006 (CL, ).
December 18, 2006 66 EXHIBIT A31-A47 re 63 Declaration, by Plaintiffs James S Gordon, Jr, Omni Innovations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-32# 2 Exhibit A-33# 3 Exhibit A-34# 4 Exhibit A-35# 5 Exhibit A-36# 6 Exhibit A-37# 7 Exhibit A-38# 8 Exhibit A-39# 9 Exhibit A-40# 10 Exhibit A-41# 11 Exhibit A-42# 12 Exhibit A-43# 13 Exhibit A-44# 14 Exhibit A-45# 15 Exhibit A-46# 16 Exhibit A-47)(Siegel, Robert) Modified links on 12/19/2006 (ECS, ).
December 18, 2006 65 EXHIBIT A16-A30 re 63 Declaration, by Plaintiffs James S Gordon, Jr, Omni Innovations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-17# 2 Exhibit A-18# 3 Exhibit A-19# 4 Exhibit A-20# 5 Exhibit A-21# 6 Exhibit A-22# 7 Exhibit A-23# 8 Exhibit A-24# 9 Exhibit A-25# 10 Exhibit A-26# 11 Exhibit A-27# 12 Exhibit A-28# 13 Exhibit A-29# 14 Exhibit A-30)(Siegel, Robert) Modified links on 12/19/2006 (ECS, ).
December 18, 2006 64 EXHIBIT A1-A15 re 63 Declaration, by Plaintiffs James S Gordon, Jr, Omni Innovations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-2# 2 Exhibit A-3# 3 Exhibit A-4# 4 Exhibit A-5# 5 Exhibit A-6# 6 Exhibit A-7# 7 Exhibit A-8# 8 Exhibit A-9# 9 Exhibit A-10# 10 Exhibit A-11# 11 Exhibit A-12# 12 Exhibit A-13# 13 Exhibit A-14# 14 Exhibit A-15)(Siegel, Robert) Modified links on 12/19/2006 (ECS, ).
December 18, 2006 63 DECLARATION of James S. Gordon, Jr. filed by Plaintiffs James S Gordon, Jr, Omni Innovations LLC re 53 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B# 2 Exhibit C-1# 3 Exhibit C-2# 4 Exhibit C-3# 5 Exhibit C-4# 6 Exhibit C-5# 7 Exhibit C-6# 8 Exhibit D# 9 Exhibit E# 10 Exhibit F# 11 Exhibit G# 12 Exhibit H# 13 Exhibit I# 14 Exhibit J# 15 Exhibit K# 16 Exhibit L# 17 Exhibit M)(Siegel, Robert)
December 18, 2006 62 DECLARATION of Russell Flye filed by Plaintiffs James S Gordon, Jr, Omni Innovations LLC re 53 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Siegel, Robert)
December 18, 2006 61 DECLARATION of Jonathan Gordon filed by Plaintiffs James S Gordon, Jr, Omni Innovations LLC re 53 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Siegel, Robert)
December 18, 2006 60 DECLARATION of Jay Gordon filed by Plaintiffs James S Gordon, Jr, Omni Innovations LLC re 53 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Siegel, Robert)
December 18, 2006 59 DECLARATION of Jamila Gordon filed by Plaintiffs James S Gordon, Jr, Omni Innovations LLC re 53 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Siegel, Robert)
December 18, 2006 58 DECLARATION of Emily Abbey filed by Plaintiffs James S Gordon, Jr, Omni Innovations LLC re 53 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Siegel, Robert)
December 18, 2006 57 DECLARATION of Bonnie Gordon filed by Plaintiffs James S Gordon, Jr, Omni Innovations LLC re 53 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Siegel, Robert)
December 18, 2006 56 DECLARATION of Anthony Potts filed by Plaintiffs James S Gordon, Jr, Omni Innovations LLC re 53 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Siegel, Robert)
December 18, 2006 55 APPENDIX re 53 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs James S Gordon, Jr, Omni Innovations LLC. (Siegel, Robert)
December 18, 2006 54 APPENDIX re 53 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs James S Gordon, Jr, Omni Innovations LLC. (Siegel, Robert)
December 18, 2006 53 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs James S Gordon, Jr, Omni Innovations LLC. Noting Date 1/12/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Siegel, Robert)
December 15, 2006 52 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER MODIFYING CUTOFF FOR DISCOVERY MOTIONS by parties. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Townsend, Roger)
December 8, 2006 51 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 30 Motion to Dismiss; Plaintiffs are GRANTED leave to amend their Complaint as to all invalid dismissed claims. by Judge John C Coughenour.(GO)
November 27, 2006 50 Featured Case ORDER re 49 Stipulation filed by Virtumundo Inc,, Adknowledge Inc,, Scott Lynn, Discovery completed by 1/16/2007; Dispositive motions due by 1/22/2007; by Judge John C Coughenour. (GO)
November 20, 2006 49 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER MODIFYING DISCOVERY CUTOFF AND OTHER DATES by parties. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Townsend, Roger)
November 13, 2006 48 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying 47 Motion for Reconsideration by Judge John C Coughenour.(GO)
November 9, 2006 47 MOTION for Reconsideration re 46 Order on Motion for Relief, of Date by Which Plaintiffs must File Their Summary Judgment Motion by Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn. Noting Date 11/9/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration of Date by Which Plaintiffs must File Their Summary Judgment Motion)(Newman, Derek)
November 9, 2006 46 MINUTE ORDER is made by direction of the Court, the Honorable John C. Coughenour, United States District Judge. The Court GRANTS 42 Pltfs' Motion for Relief from Deadline. Pltfs' ddl to file motion for summary judgment set for 12/18/06, noting date shall be 1/12/07. Dfts' Motion and Undertaking, docket no. 38 is RENOTED for consideration on 1/12/07.(CL, )
November 9, 2006 45 DECLARATION of Roger Townsend in Support of Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' 42 MOTION for Relief (Newman, Derek) Modified duplicative text on 11/13/2006 (ECS, ).
November 9, 2006 44 RESPONSE, by Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn, to 42 MOTION for Relief. (Newman, Derek)
November 7, 2006 43 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER 42 MOTION for Relief filed by James S Gordon, Jr, Omni Innovations LLC: New Noting Date 11/15/2006; Defendants' Response, if any, is due by 12:00 noon on 11/9/2006. by Judge John C Coughenour. (GO)
November 3, 2006 42 MOTION for Relief by Plaintiffs James S Gordon, Jr, Omni Innovations LLC. Noting Date 11/14/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Certificate of Service)(Siegel, Robert)
November 2, 2006 41 DECLARATION of Roger Townsend filed by Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn re 38 MOTION for Bond for An Undertaking Pursuant to 15 U.S.C. Section 7706 (g)(4) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L# 13 Exhibit M# 14 Exhibit N# 15 Exhibit O# 16 Exhibit P# 17 Exhibit Q# 18 Exhibit R# 19 Exhibit S# 20 Exhibit T# 21 Exhibit U# 22 Exhibit V)(Newman, Derek)
November 2, 2006 40 DECLARATION of Michael Shopmaker filed by Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn re 38 MOTION for Bond for An Undertaking Pursuant to 15 U.S.C. Section 7706 (g)(4) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Newman, Derek)
November 2, 2006 39 DECLARATION of Michael R. Geroe filed by Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn re 38 MOTION for Bond for An Undertaking Pursuant to 15 U.S.C. Section 7706 (g)(4) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Newman, Derek)
November 2, 2006 38 MOTION for Bond for An Undertaking Pursuant to 15 U.S.C. Section 7706 (g)(4) by Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn. Noting Date 11/17/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Certificate of Service)(Newman, Derek)
October 26, 2006 37 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER, by Judge John C Coughenour. (CL, )
October 18, 2006 36 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) -- [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Townsend, Roger)
September 21, 2006 35 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER re 29 Proposed Stipulated Protective Order (Unsigned) by Judge John C Coughenour. (GO)
September 15, 2006 34 REPLY, filed by Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn, TO RESPONSE to 30 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Newman, Derek)
September 11, 2006 33 DECLARATION of James S. Gordon, Jr. filed by Plaintiff James S Gordon, Jr re 30 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E)(Siegel, Robert)
September 11, 2006 32 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff James S Gordon, Jr, to 30 MOTION to Dismiss. (Siegel, Robert)
August 29, 2006 31 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Townsend, Roger)
August 24, 2006 30 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn. Noting Date 9/15/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Certificate of Service)(Townsend, Roger)
August 24, 2006 29 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) -- [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Townsend, Roger)
June 13, 2006 28 AMENDMENT to 25 Initial Disclosures Amended Computation of Damages by Plaintiff James S Gordon, Jr. (Siegel, Robert)
June 13, 2006 27 MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE: JCC; Dep Clerk: JM; CR: Roth; Counsel: Newman/Siegel; Called, counsel advises the Court of status. Court directs counsel to be guided by Local Civil Rule 16 in completing discovery and filing dispositive motions. Note that all depositions, discovery and perpetuation, must be completed before the discovery completion date. Jury instructions, if any, are to be filed with the Clerk and shall include an original version and two copies thereof, each numbered sequentially and with citations, and one copy on plain white paper without numbering or citations. Counsel are advised that the Court will rely primarily upon the Manual of Model Jury Instructions for the Ninth Circuit in preparation of final instructions for submission to the jury. Counsel are advised that this case is one of several cases set for the week described below. Counsel must be prepared to commence trial as scheduled, but it must be understood that the trial may have to be continued. The Clerk should be contacted as the trial date approaches for further information regarding the calendar. Pretrial and trial schedule are set as follows: Jury Trial is set for 4/16/2007 at 09:30 AM before John C Coughenour. Pretrial Order due by 4/6/2007; Pleading amendment/3rd pty action due by 9/22/2006; 39.1 mediation to be completed by 2/24/2007; Trial briefs to be submitted by 4/12/2007; Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 4/12/2007; Dispositive motions filing deadline 12/22/2006.(JM, )
June 6, 2006 26 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Robert J. Siegel for Plaintiff James S Gordon, Jr from July 3, 2006 to July 14, 2006 (Siegel, Robert)
June 5, 2006 25 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Plaintiff James S Gordon, Jr.(Siegel, Robert)
May 24, 2006 24 Featured Case ORDER denying 8 Motion to Dismiss by Judge John C Coughenour.(GO)
May 3, 2006 22 DECLARATION OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint upon defendant Adknowledge Inc on 4/20/2006; Scott Lynn on 4/20/2006 (CL, )
May 2, 2006 23 DECLARATION OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint upon defendant Virtumundo Inc on 4/20/2006 (CL, )
May 1, 2006 21 DECLARATION OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint upon defendant Virtumundo Inc on 4/19/2006; Adknowledge Inc on 4/19/2006; Scott Lynn on 4/19/2006 (CL, )
April 12, 2006 Summons Issued as per request docket nos. 18 , 19 and 20 , mailed toatty R. Siegel.(CL, )
April 11, 2006 20 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff James S Gordon, Jr. (Siegel, Robert)
April 11, 2006 19 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff James S Gordon, Jr. (Siegel, Robert)
April 11, 2006 18 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff James S Gordon, Jr. (Siegel, Robert)
April 7, 2006 17 REPLY, filed by Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn, TO RESPONSE to 8 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Newman, Derek)
April 4, 2006 16 DECLARATION of James S. Gordon, Jr filed by Plaintiff James S Gordon, Jr re 8 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Email Source Code# 2 Exhibit "You Have Already Won" email# 3 Exhibit email confirmation from Virtumundo# 4 Exhibit Letter / Contract# 5 Exhibit Feb 2006 email# 6 Exhibit Omni email)(Siegel, Robert)
April 4, 2006 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re 12 Declaration of James S. Gordon, Jr: Per filer, incorrect document filed. To be refiled. (DM, )
April 4, 2006 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) all defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by James S Gordon, Jr.(Siegel, Robert)
April 4, 2006 14 PRAECIPE re 13 Declaration,, Correction to caption on pg 120 of document 13 by Plaintiff James S Gordon, Jr. (Siegel, Robert)
April 3, 2006 13 DECLARATION of Robert J. Siegel filed by Plaintiff James S Gordon, Jr re 8 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Order denying Motion to Dismiss# 2 Exhibit Eastern District Decisions pt 1# 3 Exhibit Eastern District Decisions pt 2# 4 Exhibit Hodgell v. Virtumundo order# 5 Exhibit Marycle v First Choice pt 1# 6 Exhibit Marycle v First Choice pt 2# 7 Exhibit Marycle v First Choice pt 3# 8 Exhibit Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)(Siegel, Robert)
April 3, 2006 12 Per filer, incorrect document posted; to be refiled DECLARATION of James S. Gordon, Jr filed by Plaintiff James S Gordon, Jr re 8 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Email Source Code# 2 Exhibit "You Have Already Won" email# 3 Exhibit email confirmation# 4 Exhibit Letter / Contract# 5 Exhibit Feb 2006 email)(Siegel, Robert) Modified on 4/4/2006 (DM, ).
April 3, 2006 11 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff James S Gordon, Jr, to 8 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2). (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Plaintiff's Response Pt. 2 of 2)(Siegel, Robert)
March 16, 2006 10 DECLARATION of Allen Brandt filed by Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn re 8 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) (Newman, Derek)
March 16, 2006 9 DECLARATION of Michael Geroe filed by Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn re 8 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) (Newman, Derek)
March 16, 2006 8 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) by Defendants Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn. Noting Date 4/7/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Newman, Derek)
March 16, 2006 7 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge John C Coughenour. (JM, )
March 16, 2006 6 MINUTE ENTRY setting status conference: The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. The nature of the case, 2. The status of matters which are presently set before the Court, e.g., hearings, motions, etc., 3. The status of discovery and a time schedule for its completion, 4. A statement of any legal issues about which motions are contemplated and a possible briefing schedule, 5. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial, 6. Whether the case is jury or non-jury, 7. The date by which the case will be ready for trial, and 8. Settlement probabilities. Counsel for all parties are required to appear at the conference. If counsel office is outside of Seattle, arrangements can be made for telephonic participation in the conference. If counsel wish to make such arrangements, they should contact Julie Mahnke, Deputy Clerk at 206-370-8805. COUNSEL FOR THE PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 6/13/2006 at 09:00 AM before John C Coughenour. (JM, )
March 10, 2006 5 DECLARTION OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint upon defendant Scott Lynn on 2/28/2006 (CL, )
March 10, 2006 4 DECLARATION OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint upon defendant Virtumundo Inc on 2/28/2006 (CL, )
March 8, 2006 3 DECLARATION OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint upon defendant Adknowledge Inc on 2/24/2006 (CL, )
February 13, 2006 2 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS. Sms issued in blank. (CL, )
February 9, 2006 1 COMPLAINT and JURY DEMAND against defendant(s) John Does, Virtumundo Inc, Adknowledge Inc, Scott Lynn (Summons(es) issued) (Receipt # 413781) , filed by James S Gordon, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(PM, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gordon v. Virtumundo Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adknowledge Inc
Represented By: Derek Alan Newman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Lynn
Represented By: Derek Alan Newman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virtumundo Inc
Represented By: Michael R Geroe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omni Innovations LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Siegel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James S Gordon, Jr
Represented By: Robert J. Siegel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]