Omni Innovations LLC v. Ascentive LLC et al Featured Case

Plaintiff alleges that defendants e-mails that misrepresented or obscured information in identifying the point of origin or the transmission path thereof, and contained header information that was materially false or materially misleading.

Plaintiff: Omni Innovations LLC
Defendant: Ascentive LLC, Adam Schran and John 1-10 Does
 
Case Number: 2:2006cv01284
Filed: September 7, 2006
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: P.I.: Other Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
April 30, 2008 98 JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE/DECISION BY COURT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED: The Court granted Defendants' motion to dismiss(TS, )
April 30, 2008 97 Featured Case ORDER by Judge John C Coughenour. The Court hereby GRANTS Defendants' motion to DISMISS. (Dkt. No. 96 .) The Clerk is directed to close the case. (TS, )
February 21, 2008 96 MOTION to Dismiss -- Rule 41(b) Motion to Dismiss -- by Defendants Ascentive LLC, Adam Schran. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Certificate of Service)Noting Date 3/21/2008.(Newman, Derek)
February 4, 2008 95 RESPONSE to Order by James Gordon. (TS, )
January 15, 2008 94 Featured Case ORDER by Judge John C Coughenour. IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff Emily Abbey Motion's (Dkt. No. 91 ) is GRANTED, and she shall be DROPPED as a plaintiff from this action. All claims brought by Ms. Abbey against Defendants in this action are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The caption of this action shall be AMENDED accordingly. The remaining Plaintiff, Omni Innovations, LLC, shall file an amended complaint within ten (10) days of this Order. If Plaintiff fails to do so, the Court will entertain a motion to dismiss this action in its entirety, with prejudice. Emily Abbey terminated. (TS, )
January 10, 2008 93 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Emily Abbey, to Defendant's Response to 91 MOTION & Declaration to Stike Name from Lawsuit. (TS, )
December 31, 2007 92 RESPONSE, by Defendants Ascentive LLC, Adam Schran, to 91 MOTION & Declaration to Stike Name from Lawsuit. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Newman, Derek)
December 14, 2007 91 MOTION/Declaration to Stike Name from Lawsuit by Plaintiff Emily Abbey. (Attachments: # 1 Hearing on Motion to Strike# 2 Proposed Order)Noting Date 1/4/2008.(TS, )
December 11, 2007 90 Featured Case ORDER by Judge John C Coughenour. The Court hereby GRANTS 89 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Robert J. Siegel terminated (TS, )
November 21, 2007 89 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff Emily Abbey. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit po)Noting Date 12/3/2007.(Siegel, Robert)
November 21, 2007 88 ERRATA re 83 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (party(s)) by Plaintiff Emily Abbey. (Siegel, Robert)
November 15, 2007 87 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER by Judge John C Coughenour. The Court does not consider motions that have not been filed. Accordingly, Dfts' Response docket no. 86 is STRICKEN.(CL, ) Modified on 11/16/2007 (CL, ).
November 14, 2007 86 RESPONSE by Defendants Ascentive LLC, Adam Schran , TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A CHANGE OF VENUE AND MODIFICATION OF ORDER TO STAY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Hearing on Plaintiff's Motions & Declaration for a Change of Venue and Modification of Order to Stay# 2 Proposed Order # 3 Certificate of Service)(Newman, Derek)
September 24, 2007 85 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER removing case from active caseload as this matter has been stayed by Judge John C Coughenour. (RS, )
September 17, 2007 84 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER by Judge John C Coughenour. The Court GRANTS 78 Motion for Leave to Withdraw as counsel. Mr. Siegel and Mr. McKinley are hereby permitted to to withdraw as counsel in this matter. Such withdrawal is effective as of Thursday, October 11, 2007.(CL, )
September 12, 2007 83 FILED IN ERROR, as per docket no. 88 . NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Emily Abbey, filed by Plaintiff Emily Abbey. (Siegel, Robert) Modified on 11/23/2007 (CL, ).
September 7, 2007 82 MINUTE ORDER by John C. Coughenour, United States District Judge.The Court RE-NOTES for 9/14/07 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney docket no. 78 .(CL, )
August 30, 2007 81 STRICKEN as per Minuted Order, docket no. 82 . REPLY , filed by Plaintiff Omni Innovations LLC, TO RESPONSE to 78 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Siegel, Robert) Modified on 9/7/2007 (CL, ).
August 22, 2007 80 SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of Douglas E. McKinley, Jr. by Plaintiff Omni Innovations LLC re 78 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Siegel, Robert)
August 22, 2007 79 SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of Robert J. Siegel by Plaintiff Omni Innovations LLC re 78 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Siegel, Robert)
August 22, 2007 78 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff Omni Innovations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)Noting Date 8/31/2007.(Siegel, Robert)
August 2, 2007 77 Minute Order is made by direction of the Court, the Honorable Thomas S. Zilly, United States District Judge. The Honorable Thomas S. Zilly transfers the above captioned case as related to C06-204JCC to the Honorable John C. Coughenour for all further proceedings. All future pleadings shall bear the cause number C06-1284JCC.(CL, )
July 13, 2007 76 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL on behalf of Defendants Ascentive LLC, Adam Schran. Randall Moeller is substituted as counsel for Defendants. Attorney Roger M Townsend terminated. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Moeller, Randall)
April 10, 2007 Case Stayed (CL, )
April 10, 2007 75 MINUTE ORDER is made by direction of the Court, the Honorable Thomas S. Zilly, United States District Judge. The Court GRANTS IN PART and DEFERS IN PART Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and to Stay This Litigation, docket no. 65 . The Court STAYS this case. The Court DIRECTS the parties to file a joint status report within thirty days of the resolution of Gordon to show cause why this Court should not lift the stay. The Court DEFERS Defendants' Motion to Dismiss until the stay is lifted. (CL, )
April 9, 2007 74 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES, AND DESIGNATING CASE FOR MEDIATION; Length of Trial: *5 days*. Mediation shall be completed no later than thirty (30) days prior to the trial date. Bench Trial is set for 9/2/2008 at 09:00 AM before Hon. Thomas S. Zilly.,Joinder of Parties due by 5/30/2007,Amended Pleadings due by 3/6/2008,Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 3/6/2008,Motions due by 4/7/2008,Discovery completed by 5/5/2008,Dispositive motions due by 6/4/2008,Settlement conference to be held by 7/7/2008,39.1 mediation to be completed by 8/4/2008,Motions in Limine due by 8/5/2008,Pretrial Order due by 8/21/2008, Pretrial Conference set for 8/25/2008 at 02:00 PM before Hon. Thomas S. Zilly.,Trial briefs to be submitted by 8/28/2008,Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law to be submitted by 8/28/2008 by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CH)
April 6, 2007 73 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties; estimated Trial Days: 5.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Townsend, Roger)
March 21, 2007 72 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) all defendants, filed by Omni Innovations LLC.(Siegel, Robert)
March 20, 2007 71 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Court GRANTS 68 Pltfs' MOTION to Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. (CL, )
March 16, 2007 70 REPLY, filed by Defendants Ascentive LLC, Adam Schran, TO RESPONSE to 65 MOTION to Dismiss and to Stay (Attachments: # 1)(Townsend, Roger)
March 12, 2007 69 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Omni Innovations LLC, to 65 MOTION to Dismiss and to Stay. (Siegel, Robert)
March 1, 2007 68 MOTION to Amend 2 Amended Complaint,by Plaintiff Omni Innovations LLC. Noting Date 3/16/2007.(Siegel, Robert)
February 22, 2007 67 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Defendants Ascentive LLC, Adam Schran. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Townsend, Roger)
February 22, 2007 66 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re 65 MOTION to Dismiss and to Stay (Townsend, Roger)
February 21, 2007 65 MOTION to Dismiss and to Stay by Defendant Ascentive LLC. Noting Date 3/16/2007.(Townsend, Roger)
February 2, 2007 64 MINUTE ORDER is made by direction of the Court, the Honorable Thomas S. Zilly, United States District Judge. The Court DENIES Dfts' request to allow the Dfts until February 20, 2007 to examine the available responses to the denial of the Dfts' Petition for a Writ of Mandamus by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. The Court ORDERS that the stay of this case, see docket no. 44 , be lifted. The Court ORDERS Dfts to find a new counsel and file an answer by Tuesday, February 21, 2007. The Court VACATES the deadlines set forth in the Court's Minute Order docket no. 31 and SETS new deadlines as follows:FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/20/2007; Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/3/2007, Joint Status Report due by 4/3/2007. (CL, )
February 1, 2007 63 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Derek Alan Newman on behalf of Defendants Ascentive LLC, Adam Schran (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Newman, Derek)
January 29, 2007 62 REPORT re Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, 44 Order Staying Case,, Report by Defendants' re: Denial of Petition for Writ of Mandamus and request to scheduling of time to February 20, 2007 re: appeal or substitution of counsel by Defendants Ascentive LLC, Adam Schran. (Ivey, Floyd)
January 26, 2007 61 Featured Case ORDER of USCA (06-75732) as to 38 MOTION for Writ Emergency Writ for Mandamus, Prohibition or Stay of Minute Order of December 1, 2006 filed by Ascentive LLC,, Adam Schran; Petitioners have not demonstrated that this case warrants intervention of this court by means of the extraordinary remedy of mandamus. Emergency petition for Writ of Mandamus is DENIED. (LMK, )
January 18, 2007 60 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiffs Emily Abbey, Omni Innovations LLC. (Siegel, Robert) Modified on 1/19/2007 (CL, ). Sms issued and mailed to atty.
January 17, 2007 59 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Robert J. Siegel on behalf of Plaintiffs Emily Abbey, Omni Innovations LLC (Siegel, Robert)
December 22, 2006 58 EXHIBIT 10 MINUTE ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RECONSIDER re 46 MOTION for Writ Second Amendment Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus by Defendants Ascentive LLC, Adam Schran. (Ivey, Floyd)
December 22, 2006 57 EXHIBIT 9 MEMO SUPPORT RECONSIDERATION re 46 MOTION for Writ Second Amendment Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus by Defendants Ascentive LLC, Adam Schran. (Ivey, Floyd)
December 22, 2006 56 EXHIBIT 8 MOTION TO RECONSIDER re 46 MOTION for Writ Second Amendment Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus by Defendants Ascentive LLC, Adam Schran. (Ivey, Floyd)
December 22, 2006 55 EXHIBIT 7 MINUTE ORDER 120106 re 46 MOTION for Writ Second Amendment Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus by Defendants Ascentive LLC, Adam Schran. (Ivey, Floyd)
December 22, 2006 54 EXHIBIT 6 ORDER DISQUAL re 46 MOTION for Writ Second Amendment Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus by Defendants Ascentive LLC, Adam Schran. (Ivey, Floyd)
December 22, 2006 53 EXHIBIT 4 DEC GORDON re 46 MOTION for Writ Second Amendment Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus by Defendants Ascentive LLC, Adam Schran. (Ivey, Floyd)
December 22, 2006 52 EXHIBIT 5 SURREPLY re 46 MOTION for Writ Second Amendment Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus by Defendants Ascentive LLC, Adam Schran. (Ivey, Floyd)
December 22, 2006 51 EXHIBIT 3 Declaration Ivey re 46 MOTION for Writ Second Amendment Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus by Defendants Ascentive LLC, Adam Schran. (Ivey, Floyd)
December 22, 2006 50 EXHIBIT 2, THIRD SEGMENT PAGES 1-71 re 46 MOTION for Writ Second Amendment Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus by Defendants Ascentive LLC, Adam Schran. (Ivey, Floyd)
December 22, 2006 49 EXHIBIT 2, SECOND SEGMENT PAGE 1-98 re 46 MOTION for Writ Second Amendment Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus by Defendants Ascentive LLC, Adam Schran. (Ivey, Floyd)
December 22, 2006 48 EXHIBIT 2 SECOND SEGMENT pages 1-98 re 46 MOTION for Writ Second Amendment Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus by Defendants Ascentive LLC, Adam Schran. (Ivey, Floyd)
December 22, 2006 47 EXHIBIT 1, Declaration of Gordon re 46 MOTION for Writ Second Amendment Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus by Defendants Ascentive LLC, Adam Schran. (Ivey, Floyd)
December 22, 2006 46 MOTION for Writ Second Amendment Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus by Defendants Ascentive LLC, Adam Schran. Noting Date 12/22/2006. (Ivey, Floyd)
December 21, 2006 45 MOTION for Writ First Amended Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus by Defendants Ascentive LLC, Adam Schran. Noting Date 12/21/2006. (Ivey, Floyd)
December 20, 2006 ***Motion terminated: 38 MOTION for Writ Emergency Writ for Mandamus, Prohibition or Stay of Minute Order of December 1, 2006 filed by Ascentive LLC,, Adam Schran, (This pleading is a ntc to this court notifyingpleading was filed with the Ninth Circuit.) (CL, )
December 20, 2006 Set Deadlines Status Report due by 1/29/2007 as per Minute Order, docket no. 44 .(CL, )
December 20, 2006 44 MINUTE ORDER is made by direction of the Court, the Honorable Thomas S. Zilly, United States District Judge. The Court DENIES 32 Dfts' Motion for Reconsideration. The Court GRANTS 35 Dfts' Petition for Stay. The Court STAYS these proceedings until January 29, 2007, by which time Dfts will have had an opportunity to file a Writ of Mandamus. The deadlines set in the Court's Minute Order of December 1, 2006 docket no. 31 , are hereby stayed. The Court ORDERS Dfts to file a status report by Monday, January 29, 2007.(CL, ) Modified text on 12/20/2006 (CL, ).
December 20, 2006 43 EXHIBIT 5, Judge Van Sickle's Order Denying Motion to Disqualify re 38 MOTION for Writ Emergency Writ for Mandamus, Prohibition or Stay of Minute Order of December 1, 2006 by Defendants Ascentive LLC, Adam Schran. (Ivey, Floyd)
December 20, 2006 42 EXHIBIT 4, Motion, Declaration and Memorandum for Stay of 12/1/06 Minute Order re 38 MOTION for Writ Emergency Writ for Mandamus, Prohibition or Stay of Minute Order of December 1, 2006 by Defendants Ascentive LLC, Adam Schran. (Ivey, Floyd)
December 20, 2006 41 EXHIBIT 3, Court's Minute Order 12/1/06 re 38 MOTION for Writ Emergency Writ for Mandamus, Prohibition or Stay of Minute Order of December 1, 2006 by Defendants Ascentive LLC, Adam Schran. (Ivey, Floyd)
December 20, 2006 40 EXHIBIT 2 Motion and Memorandum for Reconsideration of Order disqualifying re 38 MOTION for Writ Emergency Writ for Mandamus, Prohibition or Stay of Minute Order of December 1, 2006 by Defendants Ascentive LLC, Adam Schran. (Ivey, Floyd)
December 20, 2006 39 EXHIBIT 1, Court's Order 11/29/06 Disqualification of counsel re 38 MOTION for Writ Emergency Writ for Mandamus, Prohibition or Stay of Minute Order of December 1, 2006 by Defendants Ascentive LLC, Adam Schran. (Ivey, Floyd)
December 20, 2006 38 MOTION for Writ Emergency Writ for Mandamus, Prohibition or Stay of Minute Order of December 1, 2006 by Defendants Ascentive LLC, Adam Schran. Noting Date 12/20/2006. (Ivey, Floyd)
December 12, 2006 37 DECLARATION of Floyd E. Ivey filed by Defendants Ascentive LLC, Adam Schran re 35 MOTION to Stay re 31 Order Lifting Stay,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,, 30 Order on Motion to Disqualify (Ivey, Floyd)
December 12, 2006 36 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants Ascentive LLC, Adam Schran re 35 MOTION to Stay re 31 Order Lifting Stay,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,, 30 Order on Motion to Disqualify (Ivey, Floyd)
December 12, 2006 35 MOTION to Stay re 31 Order Lifting Stay,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,, 30 Order on Motion to Disqualify by Defendants Ascentive LLC, Adam Schran. Noting Date 12/21/2006. (Attachments: # 1)(Ivey, Floyd)
December 11, 2006 34 NOTICE by Defendants Ascentive LLC, Adam Schran re 32 MOTION for Reconsideration re 30 Order on Motion to Disqualify of Counsel Floyd E. Ivey Of Hearing of Motion for Reconsideration (Ivey, Floyd)
December 11, 2006 33 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants Ascentive LLC, Adam Schran re 32 MOTION for Reconsideration re 30 Order on Motion to Disqualify of Counsel Floyd E. Ivey (Ivey, Floyd)
December 11, 2006 32 MOTION for Reconsideration re 30 Order on Motion to Disqualify of Counsel Floyd E. Ivey by Defendants Ascentive LLC, Adam Schran. Noting Date 12/11/2006. (Attachments: # 1)(Ivey, Floyd)
December 1, 2006 31 MINUTE ORDER is made by direction of the Court, the Honorable Thomas S. Zilly, United States District Judge. The Court STRIKES 22 Dfts' Motion for Change of Venue. The Court LIFTS the Stay and ORDERS that dfts shall have until 12/21/06 to find a new counsel and to file an answer to the Amended Complaint. The Court VACATES the deadlines set forth in the Court's Order, docket no. 6 and sets new deadlines as follows:FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/19/2007, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/2/2007, Joint Status Report due by 2/2/2007. (CL, )
November 29, 2006 30 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. The Court GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART 3 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. (CL, )
November 13, 2006 Summons Issued as to defendant(s) Adam Schran. Clerk mailed issued summons to plaintiff for service on 11/14/06. (RS, )
November 13, 2006 Summons Issued as to defendant Adam Schran (mailed to plaintiff's atty). (LT, )
November 9, 2006 29 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiffs Emily Abbey, Omni Innovations LLC. (Siegel, Robert)
November 2, 2006 Case Stayed, as per Minute Order, docket no. 28 . (CL, )
November 2, 2006 28 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 24 Motion to Reschedule Plaintiffs' Motion to Disqualify Counsel. The Court ORDERS that the briefing schedule be suspended for Defendants' Motion for Change of Venue, dkt. 22. The Court STAYS the case. by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(AC)
November 2, 2006 27 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Emily Abbey, Omni Innovations LLC, to 24 MOTION To Reschedule consideration of Plaintiffs' Motion to disqualify Counsel Floyd E. Ivey from 11/3/06 to 11/17/06 contemporaneous with Defendant's Motion for Change of Venue. (Siegel, Robert)
November 2, 2006 26 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Floyd E. Ivey on behalf of Defendants Ascentive LLC, Adam Schran (Ivey, Floyd)
November 1, 2006 25 SURREPLY filed by Defendants Ascentive LLC, Adam Schran re 3 MOTION to Disqualify Floyd E. Ivey (Ivey, Floyd)
November 1, 2006 24 MOTION To Reschedule consideration of Plaintiffs' Motion to disqualify Counsel Floyd E. Ivey from 11/3/06 to 11/17/06 contemporaneous with Defendant's Motion for Change of Venue by Defendant Ascentive LLC. Noting Date 11/1/2006. (Attachments: # 1)(Ivey, Floyd)
November 1, 2006 23 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant Ascentive LLC re 22 MOTION to Change Venue (Attachments: # 1)(Ivey, Floyd)
November 1, 2006 22 MOTION to Change Venue by Defendant Ascentive LLC. Noting Date 11/17/2006. (Attachments: # 1)(Ivey, Floyd)
November 1, 2006 21 DECLARATION of James S. Gordon, Jr. filed by Plaintiff Omni Innovations LLC re 3 MOTION to Disqualify Floyd E. Ivey (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Invoices)(Siegel, Robert)
November 1, 2006 20 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Emily Abbey, Omni Innovations LLC, TO RESPONSE to 3 MOTION to Disqualify Floyd E. Ivey (Siegel, Robert)
October 31, 2006 19 DECLARATION OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS and First Amended Complaint upon defendant Ascentive LLC on 10/16/2006 (CL, )
October 31, 2006 18 DECLARATION OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint upon defendant Adam Schran on 10/16/2006 (CL, )
October 30, 2006 17 MINUTE ORDER is made by direction of the Court, the Honorable Thomas S. Zilly, United States District Judge. The Court GRANTS Dfts' unopposed Motion to Reschedule or Strike Plaintiffs' Motion to Disqualify Counsel Flloyd E. Ivey, docket no. 9 . The Court RE-NOTES for 11/3/06. 3 MOTION to Disqualify Floyd E. Ivey;. (CL, )
October 20, 2006 Motion Calendar: Reschedule or Strike Plaintiffs' Motion to Disqualify counsel Floyd E. Ivey by Defendant Ascentive LLC. Noting Date 10/31/2006. (Motion filed as praecipe under docket no. 9 .(CL, )
October 20, 2006 16 EXHIBITS by Defendant Ascentive LLC, to 3 MOTION to Disqualify Floyd E. Ivey. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Defendant's Memroandum in Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Disqualify Counsel Floyd E. Ivey# 2 # 3)(Ivey, Floyd) Modified/Text on 10/23/2006 (CL, ).
October 20, 2006 15 DECLARATION of Floyd E. Ivey filed by Defendant Ascentive LLC re 3 MOTION to Disqualify Floyd E. Ivey (Ivey, Floyd)
October 20, 2006 14 RESPONSE, by Defendant Ascentive LLC, to 3 MOTION to Disqualify Floyd E. Ivey. (Ivey, Floyd)
October 20, 2006 13 NOTICE by Defendant Ascentive LLC re 11 Declaration, 12 Declaration, 9 Praecipe-Other, 10 Declaration For Hearing of Defendant's Motion to Reschedule or Strike Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Counsel Floyd E. Ivey (Ivey, Floyd)
October 20, 2006 12 DECLARATION of Floyd E. Ivey filed by Defendant Ascentive LLC re 3 MOTION to Disqualify Floyd E. Ivey (Ivey, Floyd)
October 20, 2006 11 DECLARATION of Adam Schran filed by Defendant Ascentive LLC re 3 MOTION to Disqualify Floyd E. Ivey (Ivey, Floyd)
October 20, 2006 10 DECLARATION of Megan Emery-Ace filed by Defendant Ascentive LLC re 3 MOTION to Disqualify Floyd E. Ivey (Ivey, Floyd)
October 20, 2006 9 PRAECIPE Motion to Reschedule or Strike Plaintiffs' Motion to Disqualify counsel Floyd E. Ivey by Defendant Ascentive LLC. (Ivey, Floyd)
October 20, 2006 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Floyd E. Ivey on behalf of Defendant Ascentive LLC (Ivey, Floyd)
October 5, 2006 7 NOTICE by Plaintiff Omni Innovations LLC that the following is RE-NOTED: 3 MOTION to Disqualify Floyd E. Ivey Noting Date 10/20/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Siegel, Robert)
October 4, 2006 6 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/20/2006.Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/4/2006. Joint Status Report due by 12/4/2006; by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CC, )
October 3, 2006 5 DECLARATION of Robert J. Siegel filed by Plaintiff Omni Innovations LLC re 3 MOTION to Disqualify Floyd E. Ivey (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Certificate of Service)(Siegel, Robert)
October 3, 2006 4 DECLARATION of James S. Gordon, Jr. filed by Plaintiff Omni Innovations LLC re 3 MOTION to Disqualify Floyd E. Ivey (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Errata 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Certificate of Service)(Siegel, Robert)
October 3, 2006 3 MOTION to Disqualify Floyd E. Ivey by Plaintiff Omni Innovations LLC. Noting Date 10/13/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service # 2 Proposed Order)(Siegel, Robert)
September 19, 2006 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Ascentive LLC, Adam Schran, John 1-10 Does, filed by Omni Innovations LLC.(Siegel, Robert)
September 7, 2006 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants (Summons(es) issued) (Receipt # SEA3776) , filed by Omni Innovations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MKB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Omni Innovations LLC v. Ascentive LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omni Innovations LLC
Represented By: Douglas E McKinley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascentive LLC
Represented By: Derek Alan Newman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Schran
Represented By: Derek Alan Newman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John 1-10 Does
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]