Omni Innovations LLC et al v. Publishers Clearing House Inc et al Featured Case

Defendant: Andrew C Goldberg, Publishers Clearing House Inc, Jane Doe Goldberg and John 1-10 Does
Plaintiff: James S Gordon, Jr and Omni Innovations LLC
 
Case Number: 2:2006cv01348
Filed: September 20, 2006
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Marsha J. Pechman
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 17, 2007 10
NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Robert J. Siegel on behalf of Plaintiffs Omni Innovations LLC, James S Gordon, Jr (Siegel, Robert)
February 6, 2007 11 Featured Case
ORDER to show cause why case should not be dismissed. Show Cause Response due by 3/6/2007. by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (DW, )
February 7, 2007 12
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER of DISMISSAL by parties. (Siegel, Robert)
February 9, 2007 13 Featured Case
STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal with prejudice by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RS, )
September 19, 2006 1
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Jane Doe Goldberg, John 1-10 Does, Publishers Clearing House Inc, Andrew C Goldberg (Summons(es) issued) (Receipt # SEA4105) , filed by Omni Innovations LLC, James S Gordon, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(RS, )
September 20, 2006 2
NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT FORM. If consent, return the executed form by 11/1/2006. Please Note: Consents must not be electronically filed with the Court. (DJ)
September 20, 2006 3 Featured Case
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/18/2006.Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/25/2006. Joint Status Report due by 11/1/2006; by Judge Mary Alice Theiler. (JT, )
November 7, 2006 4
MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Marsha J. Pechman for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Mary Alice Theiler no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judith A Thomas at the direction of Clerk of Court, Bruce Rifkin. (JT, )
November 15, 2006 5 Featured Case
MINUTE ORDER. Parties have failed to file joint status report. Deadline for filing Joint Status Report extended to 11/27/2006. Failure to file may result in sanctions; by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (DW, )
November 16, 2006 6 Featured Case
MINUTE ORDER extending deadlines. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/20/2006. Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/27/2006. Joint Status Report due by 1/3/2006; by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (DW, )
December 6, 2006 7 Featured Case
MINUTE ORDER correcting typographical errors in 6 prior minute order and clarifying that Joint Status Report due by 1/3/2007; by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (DW, )
December 11, 2006 8
ANSWER to Complaint by Publishers Clearing House Inc.(Engrav, Rebecca)
January 3, 2007 9
MINUTE ORDER extending Joint Status Report deadline to 2/2/2007. No further extensions of deadline will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. By Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (DW, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Omni Innovations LLC et al v. Publishers Clearing House Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew C Goldberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Publishers Clearing House Inc
Represented By: Rebecca S Engrav
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Goldberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John 1-10 Does
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James S Gordon, Jr
Represented By: Douglas E McKinley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omni Innovations LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Siegel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]