City of Seattle v. Professional Basketball Club LLC Featured Case

Plaintiff City of Seattle sued Defendant The Professional Basketball Club, LLC to seek a declaratory judgment that the lease with the Seattle Supersonics may be specifically enforced and that certain disputes related to the lease are exempt from arbitration.

Defendant: Professional Basketball Club LLC
Plaintiff: City of Seattle
 
Case Number: 2:2007cv01620
Filed: October 9, 2007
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
August 20, 2008 147 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND WITHOUT COSTS re 146 Stipulation filed by City of Seattle by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD)
August 19, 2008 146 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL by parties. (Lawrence, Paul)
August 8, 2008 145 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO REOPEN THE CASE FROM AUGUST 6, 2008 TO AUGUST 25, 2008 re 144 Stipulation filed by City of Seattle by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD)
August 6, 2008 144 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Extending the Time to Reopen the Case by parties. (Lawrence, Paul)
July 7, 2008 143 Featured Case ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice and without costs to any party by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD)
July 7, 2008 142 REVISED PLAINTIFF TRIAL Exhibit List (MD)
July 2, 2008 141 Featured Case ORDER re: settlement; signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SC)
July 2, 2008 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification:(Dkt.#137) Removed exhibit numbers that were inadvertently shown as admitted. (ES)
June 27, 2008 140 PLAINTIFF'S TRIAL Exhibit List (MD)
June 27, 2008 139 DEFENDANT'S Trial Exhibit List (MD)
June 27, 2008 138 TRIAL Witness Lists (MD)
June 26, 2008 137 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Marsha J. Pechman- Dep Clerk: Eileen Scollard; Pla Counsel: Paul Lawrence, et al; Def Counsel: Brad Keller, et al; CR: Barry Fanning: 9:00 a.m. and 1:30 p.m. Nichole Rhynard: 10:45 a.m. and 2:45 p.m.; Bench Trial completed on 6/26/2008. Defense testimony resumes. Witness: Nick Lacata (resumes/adverse). Exhibits admitted: 553, 532, 582, 630, 568, 569; 42, 54, 72, 143, 197, 220, 225, 226, 233,235-239, 243, 245, 247, 248, 249, 250, 269, 292, 303, 343. Exhibit excluded: 355. 9:50 a.m. Defense rests. Plaintiff makes proffer of testimony of Tim Ceis and offers him as a rebuttal witness: denied. Both sides rest. 11:10 a.m. Plaintiff presents closing argument. 1:55 p.m. Defense presents closing argument. 3:30 p.m. Court to issue a written opinion on July 2, 2008 at 4:00 p.m.. (ES) Modified on 7/2/2008 (ES).
June 26, 2008 136 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Volm VI) of 6th Day of Court Trial held on 6/26/2008 before Judge Marsha Pechman.Parties have ten (10) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript contact court reporter Barry Fanning/Nichole Rhynard by telephone at 206-370-8504. . Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/24/2008; (MD)
June 26, 2008 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification: Removed exhibit 59 from June 18, 2008 minutes. Added exhibit 614 to June 19, 2008 minutes. (ES)
June 26, 2008 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification Added 3 exhibits to June 20, 2008 minutes. (ES)
June 25, 2008 135 DECLARATION of Paul R. Taylor filed by Defendant Professional Basketball Club LLC re 127 MOTION to Exclude Rebuttal Testimony of Ceis or to Compel Production of Attorney-Client Communications (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Taylor, Paul)
June 25, 2008 134 REPLY, filed by Defendant Professional Basketball Club LLC, TO RESPONSE to 127 MOTION to Exclude Rebuttal Testimony of Ceis or to Compel Production of Attorney-Client Communications (Taylor, Paul)
June 25, 2008 132 DECLARATION of Gregory C. Narver in Support of the City's Opposition filed by Plaintiff City of Seattle re 127 MOTION to Exclude Rebuttal Testimony of Ceis or to Compel Production of Attorney-Client Communications (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(Johnson, Jeffrey)
June 25, 2008 131 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff City of Seattle, to 127 MOTION to Exclude Rebuttal Testimony of Ceis or to Compel Production of Attorney-Client Communications. (Johnson, Jeffrey)
June 24, 2008 130 Proposed Findings of Fact by Plaintiff City of Seattle (Lawrence, Paul)
June 24, 2008 129 Proposed Findings of Fact by Defendant Professional Basketball Club LLC (Taylor, Paul)
June 24, 2008 128 DECLARATION of Steven C. Minson filed by Defendant Professional Basketball Club LLC re 127 MOTION to Exclude Rebuttal Testimony of Ceis or to Compel Production of Attorney-Client Communications (Keller, Bradley)
June 24, 2008 127 MOTION to Exclude Rebuttal Testimony of Ceis or to Compel Production of Attorney-Client Communications by Defendant Professional Basketball Club LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/24/2008; (Keller, Bradley)
June 23, 2008 126 Featured Case ORDER granting 115 Defendant's Motion to Seal Exhibits to Walters Declaration by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
June 23, 2008 125 Featured Case ORDER granting 101 Defendant's Motion to Seal trial brief by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
June 20, 2008 133 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Marsha J. Pechman- Dep Clerk: Eileen Scollard; Pla Counsel: Paul Lawrence, et al; Def Counsel: Brad Keller/Paul Taylor; CR: Barry Fanning: 9:00 a.m. & 1:30 p.m./ Nichole Rhynard: 10:45 a.m. & 2:45 p.m.; Time of Hearing: 9:00 a.m.; Bench Trial held on 6/20/08. Defense witnesses: Wally Walker (adverse);Matthew Griffin (adverse)(live and by deposition); Nick Licata (adverse)(live and by deposition). Exhibits admitted: 518, 520, 522, 525, 567, 570, 573, 574, 575, 576, 579, 601, 616, 618, 619, 620, 622, 623, 624, 625, 626, 627. 4:00 p.m. Court adjourns to June 26, 2008 at 9:00 a.m.. (ES) Modified on 6/26/2008 (ES).
June 20, 2008 124 CORRECTED/AMENDED NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of 5th Day of Court Trial held on 6/20/2008 before Judge Marsha Pechmen. (ONLY CHANGE - EXHIBITS REFLECTED ON THE INDEX PAGE)Parties have ten (10) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript contact court reporter Barry Fanning/Nichole Rhynard by telephone at 206-370-8504. . Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/18/2008; (MD)
June 20, 2008 123 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of 5th day of Court Trial held on 6/20/2008 before Judge Marsha Pechmen.Parties have ten (10) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript contact court reporter Barry Fanning/Nichole Rhynard by telephone at 206-370-8504. . Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/18/2008; (MD)
June 20, 2008 121 NOTICE of Corrected Document re Notice of Docket Text Modification. (Service of corrected image is attached). Exhibits added to docket entry on 6/18/08. Exhibits: 69, 81, 145, 198, 265, 279, 322, 507, 595. (ES)
June 20, 2008 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification Added admitted exhibits to minute entry on 6/18/08. (ES)
June 19, 2008 122 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Marsha J. Pechman- Dep Clerk: Eileen Scollard; Pla Counsel: Paul Lawrence, et al; Def Counsel: Brad Keller, et al; CR: Barry Fanning 9:00 a.m. & 1:30 p.m./Nichole Rhynard 10:45 a.m. & 2:45 p.m.; Time of Hearing: 5.5; Bench Trial held on 6/19/08. Plaintiff witnesses: Lon Hatayana, Sherman Alexie, Aubrey McClendon (by dep. and video). 11:30 a.m. Plaintiff rests with the exception for admission of exhibits. Testimony for defendant commences. Defendant witnesses: Brad Humphreys, Mitchell Ziets, Deborah Jay. Exhibits admitted: 336, 337, 218, 219, 610, 78, 333, 614. 4:00 p.m. Court adjourned to 9:00 a.m. on 6/20/08. (ES) Modified on 6/26/2008 (ES).
June 19, 2008 120 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of 4th Day of Court Trial held on 6/19/2008 before Judge Marsha Pechman.Parties have ten (10) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript contact court reporter Barry Fanning/Nichole Rhynard by telephone at 206-370-8504. . Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/17/2008; (CL)
June 19, 2008 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification Added exhibit to minutes. (ES)
June 18, 2008 119 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Marsha J. Pechman- Dep Clerk: Eileen Scollard; Pla Counsel: Paul Lawrence, et al; Def Counsel: Brad Keller, et al; CR: Barry Fanning 9:00 a.m. & 1:30 p.m./Nichole Rhynard 10:45 a.m. & 2:45 p.m.; Time of Hearing: 9:00 a.m.; Bench Trial held on 6/18/08. Plaintiff's witnesses: Clayton Bennett (adverse), Danny Barth (adverse), Lon Hatayana. Plaintiff's exhibits: 1, 69, 81, 89, 90, 105, 107, 111, 138, 139, 145, 198, 201, 203, 204, 253, 263, 265, 272,279, 294, 322, 324, 316, 317, 504, 505, 507, 508, 509, 510, 511 (conditionally), 514, 545 (conditionally), 595,. 4:00 p.m. Court adjourns to resume on 6/19/08 at 9:00 a.m.. (ES). Modified on 6/26/2008 (ES).
June 18, 2008 118 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of 3rd Day of Court Trial held on 6/18/2008 before Judge Marsha Pechman.Parties have ten (10) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript contact court reporter Barry Fanning/Nichole Rhynard by telephone at 206-370-8504. . Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/16/2008; (CL)
June 17, 2008 117 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Marsha J. Pechman- Dep Clerk: Eileen Scollard; Pla Counsel: Paul Lawrence, et al; Def Counsel: Brad Keller, et al; CR: Barry Fanning: 9:00 am. and 1:30 pm/Nichole Rhynard: 10:45 am & 2:45 pm; Time of Hearing: 9:00 a.m.; Bench Trial held on 6/17/08. Plaintiff witnesses: Jyo Singh, Clay Bennett (adverse), Andrew Zimbalist. Exhibits admitted: 5, 23, 60, 62, 65, 66, 75, 79, 93, 94, 97, 98, 115, 116, 120 (subj. to redaction), 182, 264, 268, 276, 310, 335, 501, 535, 544, 548, 554, 555, 558, 600. Depositions published:Clay Bennett, Andrew Zimbalist. 4:00 p.m. Court adjourns to 6/18/08. Court adjourns. (ES) Modified on 6/19/2008 (ES).
June 17, 2008 116 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of 2nd Day of Court Trial held on 6/17/2008 (Volm 2) before Judge Marsha Pechman.Parties have ten (10) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript contact court reporter Barry Fanning/Nichole Rhynard by telephone at 206-370-8504. . Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/15/2008; (MD)
June 17, 2008 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification Exhibit number 141 was corrected to number 147. (ES)
June 17, 2008 115 MOTION to Seal Exs. 1 and 2 to Walters Declaration by Defendant Professional Basketball Club LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Def's Motion to Seal Exhibits to Walters Decl.) Noting Date 6/26/2008; (Minson, Steven)
June 17, 2008 114 SEALED DOCUMENT Exs. 1 and 2 to Declaration of Chris Walters by Defendant Professional Basketball Club LLC re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions. (Minson, Steven)
June 17, 2008 113 DECLARATION of Chris Walters (Exs.1&2 UNDER SEAL) by Defendant Professional Basketball Club LLC. (Minson, Steven)
June 16, 2008 112 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF SUBPOENA upon William Alves served on 6/10/08. (MD)
June 16, 2008 111 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of First day of Court Trial held on 6/16/2008 before Judge Marsha Pechman.Parties have ten (10) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript contact court reporter Nichole Rhynard/Barry Fanning by telephone at 206-370-8504. . Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/15/2008; (MD)
June 16, 2008 110 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Marsha J. Pechman- Dep Clerk: Eileen Scollard; Pla Counsel: Paul Lawrence, et al; Def Counsel: Brad Keller, et al; CR: Barry Fanning: 9:00 am. and 1:30 pm/Nichole Rhynard: 10:45 am and 2:45 pm; Time of Hearing: 9:00 a.m.; Bench Trial held on 6/16/08. Opening statements presented. Pla witnesses: Joel Litvin (by dep), James Couch (by dep), Brent Gooden (by dep), Roy Williams (by dep), Mayor Greg Nickels(live & by dep), Virginia Anderson, Jyo Singh. Exhibits admitted: 231, 147, 31, 500, 45, 529, 516, 527, 32, 40, 41, 33, 215, 175, 599. 4:00 p.m. Court adjourns. Trial to resume 6/17/08 at 9:00 a.m.. (ES) Modified on 6/17/2008 (ES).
June 13, 2008 109 Featured Case PRETRIAL ORDER by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD)
June 13, 2008 108 DECLARATION of Arthur Aaron by Defendant Professional Basketball Club LLC. (Minson, Steven)
June 12, 2008 107 Proposed Pretrial Order by Plaintiff City of Seattle. (Jensen, Michelle)
June 12, 2008 106 DECLARATION of Thomas Wilson by Defendant Professional Basketball Club LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2 (Part 1), # 3 Exhibit 2 (Part 2), # 4 Exhibit 2 (Part 3), # 5 Exhibit 2 (Part 4), # 6 Exhibit 2 (Part 5), # 7 Exhibit 2 (Part 6), # 8 Exhibit 2 (Part 7))(Minson, Steven)
June 12, 2008 105 DECLARATION of Russ Simons (w-Ex. 1) by Defendant Professional Basketball Club LLC. (Minson, Steven)
June 12, 2008 104 Featured Case ORDER re: Media Coverage; signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SC)
June 11, 2008 103 TRIAL BRIEF by Plaintiff City of Seattle. (Lawrence, Paul)
June 11, 2008 102 REDACTION to 100 Sealed Document Defendant's Trial Brief (w-Appendix A) by Defendant Professional Basketball Club LLC. (Taylor, Paul)
June 11, 2008 101 MOTION to Seal Defendant's Trial Brief by Defendant Professional Basketball Club LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Def's Motion to Seal Trial Brief) Noting Date 6/20/2008; (Taylor, Paul)
June 11, 2008 100 SEALED DOCUMENT DEFENDANT'S TRIAL BRIEF (w-Appendix A) by Defendant Professional Basketball Club LLC re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions. (Taylor, Paul)
June 9, 2008 99 Featured Case ORDER on motions in limine by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(LG, )
June 6, 2008 98 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING FILING CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL FOR USE IN MOTIONS IN LIMINE re 59 Stipulation filed by City of Seattle by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD)
June 6, 2008 97 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Marsha J. Pechman- Dep Clerk: Eileen Scollard; Pla Counsel: Paul Lawrence, et al; Def Counsel: Brad Keller, et a; CR: Susan Zielie; Time of Hearing: 1:30 p.m.; Final Pretrial Conference held on 6/6/08. Counsel are to give the clerk a list of witnesses with the correlating exhibit numbers by 6/13/08. Defense counsel to renumber their exhibits with 500 series numbers and file the revised PTO by 6/12/08. Trial briefs are due 6/11/08. F&F & CofLaw to be filed by 6/24/08. Counsel are to submit to the court a list of people they will have on their advocacy team. (ES)
June 5, 2008 96 PRAECIPE to attach document re 94 Declaration,,,,, 95 Sealed Document, by Plaintiff City of Seattle. (Lawrence, Paul)
June 4, 2008 95 SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of Michelle Jensen - Sealed Exhibits by Plaintiff City of Seattle re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C, # 2 Exhibit F, # 3 Exhibit H, # 4 Exhibit I, # 5 Exhibit J, # 6 Exhibit K, # 7 Exhibit L, # 8 Exhibit M)(Lawrence, Paul)
June 4, 2008 94 DECLARATION of Michelle Jensen filed by Plaintiff City of Seattle re 62 SEALED MOTION re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions ; SEALED MOTION re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions ;, 66 SEALED MOTION re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions ;, 60 MOTIONS IN LIMINE to Exclude Statements of Individual Seattle City Council Members, to the Extent Offered as Admissions Purporting to Bind the City, 67 MOTIONS IN LIMINE REDACTED - to Exclude Evidence Related to Local Investors, 64 SEALED MOTION re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions ; SEALED MOTION re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions ;, 61 MOTIONS IN LIMINE to Exclude Evidence Related to Survey Results, 63 MOTIONS IN LIMINE REDACTED - to Exclude Evidence of Defendant's Efforts to Obtain a "Successor Venue" to KeyArena, 65 MOTIONS IN LIMINE REDACTED to Exclude Evidence of Alleged 'Dysfunction' in the Relationship Between the City and PBC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(Lawrence, Paul)
June 4, 2008 93 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff City of Seattle, TO RESPONSE to 67 MOTIONS IN LIMINE REDACTED - to Exclude Evidence Related to Local Investors (Lawrence, Paul)
June 4, 2008 92 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff City of Seattle, TO RESPONSE to 65 MOTIONS IN LIMINE REDACTED to Exclude Evidence of Alleged 'Dysfunction' in the Relationship Between the City and PBC (Lawrence, Paul)
June 4, 2008 91 SEALED DOCUMENT Reply in Support of its Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence Related to Local Investors by Plaintiff City of Seattle re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions. (Lawrence, Paul)
June 4, 2008 90 SEALED DOCUMENT Reply in Support of Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Alleged "Dysfunction" by Plaintiff City of Seattle re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions. (Lawrence, Paul)
June 4, 2008 89 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff City of Seattle, TO RESPONSE to 60 MOTIONS IN LIMINE to Exclude Statements of Individual Seattle City Council Members, to the Extent Offered as Admissions Purporting to Bind the City (Lawrence, Paul)
June 4, 2008 88 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff City of Seattle, TO RESPONSE to 61 MOTIONS IN LIMINE to Exclude Evidence Related to Survey Results (Lawrence, Paul)
June 4, 2008 87 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff City of Seattle, TO RESPONSE to 63 MOTIONS IN LIMINE REDACTED - to Exclude Evidence of Defendant's Efforts to Obtain a "Successor Venue" to KeyArena (Lawrence, Paul)
June 4, 2008 86 SEALED DOCUMENT Reply to Motion In Limine to Exclude Evidence of Defendant's Efforts to Obtain a "Successor Venue" to Key Arena by Plaintiff City of Seattle re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions. (Lawrence, Paul)
June 4, 2008 85 REPLY, filed by Defendant Professional Basketball Club LLC, TO RESPONSE to 57 MOTIONS IN LIMINE Re Mitch Levy and Sherman Alexie (Taylor, Paul)
June 4, 2008 84 SEALED DOCUMENT : REPLY, filed by Plaintiff City of Seattle, TO RESPONSE to 63 MOTIONS IN LIMINE REDACTED - to Exclude Evidence of Defendant's Efforts to Obtain a "Successor Venue" to KeyArena (Lawrence, Paul) Modified on 6/4/2008 (KN).
June 4, 2008 83 PRAECIPE re 72 Response to Motion in Limine to Exclude Sherman Alexie and Mitch Levy by Plaintiff City of Seattle. (Jensen, Michelle)
June 3, 2008 82 REDACTION to 78 Sealed Document, PBC's Opp. to Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence Related to Local Investors by Defendant Professional Basketball Club LLC. (Taylor, Paul)
June 3, 2008 81 Proposed Pretrial Order by Plaintiff City of Seattle. (Harrison, Jonathan)
June 3, 2008 80 SEALED DOCUMENT Second Decl. of Taylor in Opp. to Pltfs' Motions in Limine, and Exs. 1-13 by Defendant Professional Basketball Club LLC re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions. (Taylor, Paul)
June 3, 2008 79 DECLARATION of Paul R. Taylor in Support of Opp. to Pltfs' Motions in Limine, and Exs. 1-15 filed by Defendant Professional Basketball Club LLC re 62 SEALED MOTION re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions ; SEALED MOTION re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions ;, 64 SEALED MOTION re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions ; SEALED MOTION re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions ;, 61 MOTIONS IN LIMINE to Exclude Evidence Related to Survey Results, 66 SEALED MOTION re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions ;, 60 MOTIONS IN LIMINE to Exclude Statements of Individual Seattle City Council Members, to the Extent Offered as Admissions Purporting to Bind the City (Taylor, Paul)
June 3, 2008 78 SEALED DOCUMENT PBC's Opp. to Pltf's Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence Related to Local Investors by Defendant Professional Basketball Club LLC re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions. (Taylor, Paul)
June 3, 2008 77 RESPONSE, by Defendant Professional Basketball Club LLC, to 60 MOTIONS IN LIMINE to Exclude Statements of Individual Seattle City Council Members, to the Extent Offered as Admissions Purporting to Bind the City. (Taylor, Paul)
June 3, 2008 76 RESPONSE, by Defendant Professional Basketball Club LLC, to 64 SEALED MOTION re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions ; SEALED MOTION re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions ;. (Taylor, Paul)
June 3, 2008 75 RESPONSE, by Defendant Professional Basketball Club LLC, to 62 SEALED MOTION re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions ; SEALED MOTION re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions ;. (Taylor, Paul)
June 3, 2008 74 RESPONSE, by Defendant Professional Basketball Club LLC, to 61 MOTIONS IN LIMINE to Exclude Evidence Related to Survey Results. (Taylor, Paul)
June 3, 2008 73 DECLARATION of Jeffrey Johnson in Support of the City of Seattle's Opposition to Defendant's Motion in Limine filed by Plaintiff City of Seattle re 57 MOTIONS IN LIMINE Re Mitch Levy and Sherman Alexie (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Jensen, Michelle)
June 3, 2008 72 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff City of Seattle, to 57 MOTIONS IN LIMINE Re Mitch Levy and Sherman Alexie. (Jensen, Michelle)
May 28, 2008 71 EXHIBIT T - PRAECIPE TO FILE UNDER SEAL re 68 Declaration,,,,,,,,,, by Plaintiff City of Seattle. (Lawrence, Paul)
May 27, 2008 70 SEALED DOCUMENT Ex. U to Declaration of Jonathan Harrison 68 by Plaintiff City of Seattle re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions. (Lawrence, Paul)
May 27, 2008 69 SEALED DOCUMENT Ex. F to Declaration of Jonathan Harrison 68 by Plaintiff City of Seattle re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions. (Lawrence, Paul)
May 27, 2008 68 DECLARATION of Jonathan Harrison filed by Plaintiff City of Seattle re 62 SEALED MOTION re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions ; SEALED MOTION re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions ;, 61 MOTIONS IN LIMINE to Exclude Evidence Related to Survey Results, 65 MOTIONS IN LIMINE REDACTED to Exclude Evidence of Alleged 'Dysfunction' in the Relationship Between the City and PBC, 66 SEALED MOTION re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions ;, 60 MOTIONS IN LIMINE to Exclude Statements of Individual Seattle City Council Members, to the Extent Offered as Admissions Purporting to Bind the City, 67 MOTIONS IN LIMINE REDACTED - to Exclude Evidence Related to Local Investors, 64 SEALED MOTION re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions ; SEALED MOTION re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions ;, 63 MOTIONS IN LIMINE REDACTED - to Exclude Evidence of Defendant's Efforts to Obtain a "Successor Venue" to KeyArena (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Part 1, # 2 Exhibit Ex. A Part 2, # 3 Exhibit A Part 3, # 4 Exhibit A Part 4, # 5 Exhibit A Part 5, # 6 Exhibit A Part 6, # 7 Exhibit A Part 7, # 8 Exhibit A Part 8, # 9 Exhibit A Part 9, # 10 Exhibit A Part 10, # 11 Exhibit A Part 11, # 12 Exhibit A FR 2 Part 1, # 13 Exhibit A FR 2 Part 2, # 14 Exhibit A FR 2 Part 3, # 15 Exhibit A FR 2 Part 4, # 16 Exhibit A FR 2 Part 5, # 17 Exhibit A FR2 Part 6, # 18 Exhibit A FR2 Part 7, # 19 Exhibit A FR 2 Part 8, # 20 Exhibit A FR 2 Part 9, # 21 Exhibit A FR 2 Part 10, # 22 Exhibit A FR 2 Part 11, # 23 Exhibit A FR 2 Part 12, # 24 Exhibit A FR 2 Part 13, # 25 Exhibit A FR 2 Part 14, # 26 Exhibit A FR 2 Part 15, # 27 Exhibit A FR 2 Part 16, # 28 Exhibit A FR 2 Part 17, # 29 Exhibit A FR 2 Part 18, # 30 Exhibit A FR 2 Part 19, # 31 Exhibit A FR 2 Part 20, # 32 Exhibit B Part 1, # 33 Exhibit B Part 2, # 34 Exhibit B Part 3, # 35 Exhibit B Part 4, # 36 Exhibit C, # 37 Exhibit D Part 1, # 38 Exhibit D Part 2, # 39 Exhibit D Part 3, # 40 Exhibit D Part 4, # 41 Exhibit D Part 5, # 42 Exhibit F, # 43 Exhibit F - Redacted, # 44 Exhibit G, # 45 Exhibit H, # 46 Exhibit I, # 47 Exhibit J, # 48 Exhibit K, # 49 Exhibit L, # 50 Exhibit M, # 51 Exhibit N, # 52 Exhibit O, # 53 Exhibit P, # 54 Exhibit Q, # 55 Exhibit R, # 56 Exhibit S, # 57 Exhibit T SEALED, # 58 Exhibit U-Redacted, # 59 Exhibit V, # 60 Exhibit W, # 61 Exhibit X)(Lawrence, Paul) Modified on 5/28/2008 (JJT, ).
May 27, 2008 67 MOTIONS IN LIMINE REDACTED - to Exclude Evidence Related to Local Investors by Plaintiff City of Seattle. Noting Date 6/6/2008; (Lawrence, Paul)
May 27, 2008 66 SEALED MOTION re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions ;Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence Related to Local Investors by Plaintiff City of Seattle. Noting Date 6/6/2008; (Lawrence, Paul)
May 27, 2008 65 MOTIONS IN LIMINE REDACTED to Exclude Evidence of Alleged 'Dysfunction' in the Relationship Between the City and PBC by Plaintiff City of Seattle. Noting Date 6/6/2008; (Lawrence, Paul)
May 27, 2008 64 SEALED MOTION re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions ;Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidnece of Alleged "Dysfunction" in the Relationship Between the City and PBC by Plaintiff City of Seattle. Noting Date 6/6/2008; (Lawrence, Paul)
May 27, 2008 63 MOTIONS IN LIMINE REDACTED - to Exclude Evidence of Defendant's Efforts to Obtain a "Successor Venue" to KeyArena by Plaintiff City of Seattle. Noting Date 6/6/2008; (Lawrence, Paul)
May 27, 2008 62 SEALED MOTION re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions ;Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Defendant's Efforts to Obtain a "Successor Venue" to KeyArena by Plaintiff City of Seattle. Noting Date 6/6/2008; (Lawrence, Paul)
May 27, 2008 61 MOTIONS IN LIMINE to Exclude Evidence Related to Survey Results by Plaintiff City of Seattle. Noting Date 6/6/2008; (Lawrence, Paul)
May 27, 2008 60 MOTIONS IN LIMINE to Exclude Statements of Individual Seattle City Council Members, to the Extent Offered as Admissions Purporting to Bind the City by Plaintiff City of Seattle. Noting Date 6/6/2008; (Lawrence, Paul)
May 27, 2008 59 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Filing Confidential Documents Under Seal for Use in Motions in Limine by parties. (Lawrence, Paul)
May 27, 2008 58 DECLARATION of Paul R. Taylor in Support of Def's Motion in Limine Re Levy and Alexie (w-Exs. 1-5) filed by Defendant Professional Basketball Club LLC re 57 MOTIONS IN LIMINE Re Mitch Levy and Sherman Alexie (Taylor, Paul)
May 27, 2008 57 MOTIONS IN LIMINE Re Mitch Levy and Sherman Alexie by Defendant Professional Basketball Club LLC. Noting Date 6/6/2008; (Taylor, Paul)
May 21, 2008 56 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER - ALL Motions in Limine must be filed by 5/27/2008 and noted on the motion calendar no later than the second friday thereafter, i.e. June 6, 2008 by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD, )
May 8, 2008 55 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER UNSEALING SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF BRADLEY S. KELLER FILED IN SUPPORT OF REPLY RE: MOTION TO AMEND ANSWER re 50 Sealed Document, filed by Professional Basketball Club LLC by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (Dkt. No. 50 Unsealed)(MD, )
May 8, 2008 54 Featured Case ORDER denying 22 Sealed Motion by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(LG, )
May 7, 2008 53 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE /ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE by Llewelyn G. Pritchard of Helsell Fetterman for Steve Ballmer. (Minson, Steven)
May 7, 2008 52 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Unsealing Supplemental Decl. of Keller Filed in Support of Reply re Motion to Amend Answer by parties re 50 Sealed Document,. (Keller, Bradley)
May 6, 2008 51 Featured Case ORDER denying 32 Motion to Amend. ; granting 49 Motion to Seal by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(LG, )
May 5, 2008 50 SEALED DOCUMENT Supp. Decl. of Brad Keller in Support of PBC's Reply Re Motion to Amend Answer (w/Ex. 1) by Defendant Professional Basketball Club LLC re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions. (Keller, Bradley) Modified on 5/9/2008 - DOCUMENT UNSEALED PER STIPULATION AND ORDER - DATED 5/8/08- DKT NO. 55. (MD, ).
May 5, 2008 49 MOTION to Seal Supplemental Decl. of Keller in Support of Reply re Motion to Amend Answer by Defendant Professional Basketball Club LLC. Noting Date 5/14/2008; (Keller, Bradley)
May 5, 2008 48 DECLARATION of Bradley S. Keller in Support of PBC's Reply re Motion to Amend Answer (w/Exs. 1-5) filed by Defendant Professional Basketball Club LLC re 32 MOTION to Amend 7 Answer to Complaint, (Ex. 1 Proposed Amended Answer) (Keller, Bradley)
May 5, 2008 47 REPLY, filed by Defendant Professional Basketball Club LLC, TO RESPONSE to 32 MOTION to Amend 7 Answer to Complaint, (Ex. 1 Proposed Amended Answer) (Keller, Bradley)
May 2, 2008 46 REDACTION to 43 Sealed Document, Decl. of Minson in Support of Reply re Motion to Eliminate AEO Designations by Defendant Professional Basketball Club LLC. (Taylor, Paul)
May 2, 2008 45 REDACTION to 42 Sealed Document, Reply in Support of Motion to Eliminate AEO Designations by Defendant Professional Basketball Club LLC. (Taylor, Paul)
May 2, 2008 44 NOTICE of Filing CD of video excerpts, Ex. 3 to Minson Decl. re Reply to Motion to Eliminate AEO Designations in Paper or Physical Form with the Clerk's Office by Defendant Professional Basketball Club LLC. (Taylor, Paul)
May 2, 2008 43 SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of Minson in Reply re Motion to Eliminate AEO Designations, etc. and (Exs. 1-15) by Defendant Professional Basketball Club LLC re 22 SEALED MOTION re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions ; SEALED MOTION re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions ;. (Taylor, Paul)
May 2, 2008 42 SEALED DOCUMENT Reply in Support of Motion to Eliminate AEO Designations, etc. by Defendant Professional Basketball Club LLC re 22 SEALED MOTION re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions ; SEALED MOTION re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions ;. (Taylor, Paul)
May 1, 2008 41 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Pretrial Conference held on 1/29/2008 before Judge Marsha J. Pechman.Parties have ten (10) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript contact court reporter B. Fanning by telephone at 206-370-8507. . Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/30/2008; (SA, )
April 30, 2008 40 DECLARATION of Jonathan H. Harrison in Support of the City's Opposition to the PBC's Motion for Leave to Amend Its Answer filed by Plaintiff City of Seattle re 32 MOTION to Amend 7 Answer to Complaint, (Ex. 1 Proposed Amended Answer) (Harrison, Jonathan)
April 30, 2008 39 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff City of Seattle, to 32 MOTION to Amend 7 Answer to Complaint, (Ex. 1 Proposed Amended Answer). (Harrison, Jonathan)
April 29, 2008 38 RESPONSE AND OBJECTIONS to the City of Seattle's subpoena in a civil case by Interested Party McKinsey & Company, Inc. (MD, )
April 28, 2008 37 REDACTION to 34 Sealed Document, Response to Defendant's Motion to Eliminate Attorneys Only (AOM) Designations and Eliminate Improper Privilege Designations re 22 re 17 by ThirdParty Defendant Matthew Griffin. (Fandel, Kent)
April 28, 2008 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ThirdParty Defendant Matthew Griffin re 35 Sealed Document, 34 Sealed Document,. (Fandel, Kent)
April 28, 2008 35 SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of K. Michael Fandel in Support of Opposition to Motion to Eliminate Designations (with Ex. 1) by ThirdParty Defendant Matthew Griffin re 22 SEALED MOTION re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions ; SEALED MOTION re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions ;. (Fandel, Kent)
April 28, 2008 34 SEALED DOCUMENT Response to Defendant's Motion to Eliminate Attorneys Only (AOM) Designations and Eliminate Improper Privilege Designations by ThirdParty Defendant Matthew Griffin re 22 SEALED MOTION re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions ; SEALED MOTION re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions ;. (Fandel, Kent)
April 28, 2008 33 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff City of Seattle, to 22 SEALED MOTION re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions ; SEALED MOTION re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions ;. (Jensen, Michelle)
April 24, 2008 32 MOTION to Amend 7 Answer to Complaint, (Ex. 1 Proposed Amended Answer) by Defendant Professional Basketball Club LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Amend Answer)Noting Date 5/5/2008.(Taylor, Paul)
April 18, 2008 31 Featured Case ORDER RE-NOTING 22 SEALED MOTION re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions ; 25 MOTION to Eliminate AEO Designations, etc. [REDACTED VERSION OF MOTION FILED UNDER SEAL]; Noting Date 5/2/2008. Pursuant to Local Rule CR 7(d)(3), all motions that are not listed under 7(d)(1) or 7(d)(2) shall be noted for consideration no earlier than the third Friday after filing and service of the motion. Here, PBC's motion does not fall under any of the motions listed under 7(d)(1) or 7(d)(2). Accordingly, PBC's motion shall be RENOTED for consideration on May 2, 2008. The City's response shall be due on Monday, April 28, 2008, and PBC's reply shall be due on Friday, May 2, 2008.(DKo)
April 18, 2008 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ThirdParty Defendant Matthew Griffin re 29 Declaration,, 28 MOTION Motion to Comply with LR 7(d)(3) re 22 SEALED MOTION re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions ; SEALED MOTION re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions ; RE-NOTE MOTION Motion to Comply with LR 7(d)(3) re 22 SEALED MOTION re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions ; SEALED MOTION re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions ; RE-NOTE. (Fandel, Kent)
April 18, 2008 29 DECLARATION of K. Michael Fandel filed by ThirdParty Defendant Matthew Griffin re 28 MOTION Motion to Comply with LR 7(d)(3) re 22 SEALED MOTION re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions ; SEALED MOTION re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions ; RE-NOTE MOTION Motion to Comply with LR 7(d)(3) re 22 SEALED MOTION re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions ; SEALED MOTION re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions ; RE-NOTE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Fandel, Kent)
April 18, 2008 28 MOTION Motion to Comply with LR 7(d)(3) re 22 SEALED MOTION re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions ; SEALED MOTION re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions ; RE-NOTE (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)Noting Date 4/18/2008.(Fandel, Kent)
April 16, 2008 27 PRAECIPE re 25 MOTION to Eliminate AEO Designations, etc. [REDACTED VERSION OF MOTION FILED UNDER SEAL] MOTION to Eliminate AEO Designations, etc. [REDACTED VERSION OF MOTION FILED UNDER SEAL] by Defendant Professional Basketball Club LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Redacted Version of Motion Filed Under Seal Re AEO Designations, etc.)(Keller, Bradley)
April 16, 2008 26 DECLARATION of Steve Minson in Support of Motion to (i) Eliminate AEO Designations, etc. (w/Exs. 1-6) filed by Defendant Professional Basketball Club LLC re 25 MOTION to Eliminate AEO Designations, etc. [REDACTED VERSION OF MOTION FILED UNDER SEAL] MOTION to Eliminate AEO Designations, etc. [REDACTED VERSION OF MOTION FILED UNDER SEAL] (Keller, Bradley)
April 16, 2008 24 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit 2 to Decl. of Steve Minson (Dkt. No. 23) in Support of Motion to Eliminate AEO Designations, etc. by Defendant Professional Basketball Club LLC re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2, Part B)(Keller, Bradley)
April 16, 2008 23 DECLARATION of Steven Minson in Support of Motion to (i) Eliminate AEO Designations, etc. filed by Defendant Professional Basketball Club LLC re 22 SEALED MOTION re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions ; SEALED MOTION re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions ; (Keller, Bradley)
April 16, 2008 22 SEALED MOTION re 17 Protective Order, Terminate Motions ; Motion to (i) Eliminate AEO Designations and Eliminate Improper Privilege Redactions, etc. filed by Defendant Professional Basketball Club LLC. Noting Date 4/25/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Keller, Bradley)
April 15, 2008 21 Featured Case ORDER re 20 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS James R Webb as pro hac vice atty for Defendant Professional Basketball Club LLC, by Bruce Rifkin. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(MD, )
April 15, 2008 20 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY James R. Webb FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Professional Basketball Club LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 1413481. (Attachments: # 1)(Taylor, Paul)
March 26, 2008 19 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER - The Court Revised the Trial Dates and hours as follows: Monday, June 16,2008 through Friday, June 20, 2008 at 9:00 am to 4:00pm. Thursday, June 26, 2008 at 9:00am to 4:00pm. There will be no trial held on June 23, 2008-June 25, 2008. 12 Stipulation and Order- Set/Reset Trial Date and Related Deadlines, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD, )
March 18, 2008 18 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jonathan H Harrison on behalf of Plaintiff City of Seattle. (Harrison, Jonathan)
March 13, 2008 17 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER 16 MOTION for Protective Order Agreed Motion for Entry of Protective Order Regarding Handling of Confidential Material filed by City of Seattle. Motion terminated by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD, )
March 7, 2008 16 MOTION for Protective Order Agreed Motion for Entry of Protective Order Regarding Handling of Confidential Material by Plaintiff City of Seattle. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)Noting Date 3/7/2008.(Jensen, Michelle)
February 25, 2008 15 Featured Case ORDER re 13 Joint Expedited CR 37 Submission Re: Search Term Review of PBC Members' Email. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's motion to compel and ORDERS PBC to produce the emails of the remaining PBC members no later than 14 days from the date of this order by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (ADO)
February 13, 2008 14 DECLARATION of Michelle Jensen in Support of the City of Seattle's CR 37 Submission re 13 Brief Joint Expedited CR 37 Submission by Plaintiff City of Seattle. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G-J to to PBC's Response re CR 37 Submission)(Jensen, Michelle)
February 13, 2008 13 JOINT EXPEDITED CR37 SUBMISSION REGARDING SEARCH TERM REVIEW OF PBC MEMBERS' EMAIL BRIEF by Plaintiff City of Seattle. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jensen, Michelle)
February 8, 2008 12 Featured Case STIPULATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER re 11 Proposed Order (Unsigned)trial and related dates. Bench Trial is set for 6/16/2008 at 09:00 AM before Hon. Marsha J. Pechman; Trial consist of bench trial of 6 days; Joinder of Parties due by 4/24/2008,Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 5/9/2008,Discovery completed by 4/30/2008,Pretrial Order due by 6/3/2008, Pretrial Conference set for 6/6/2008 at 01:30 PM before Hon. Marsha J. Pechman.,Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 5/23/2008, expert discovery closes on June 6, 2008;Trial briefs to be submitted by 6/11/2008,Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law to be submitted by 6/11/2008,Plaintiffs Pretrial Statement due by 5/23/2008.,Defendants Pretrial Statement due by 5/29/2008, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (MD, )
February 7, 2008 11 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) STIPULATED SCHEDULING. (Jensen, Michelle)
January 29, 2008 10 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Marsha J. Pechman - Dep Clerk: Eileen Scollard; Pla Counsel: Paul Lawrence, Jeff Johnson & Greg Narver; Def Counsel: Brad Keller/Paul Taylor; CR: Barry Fanning; Time of Hearing: 10:00 a.m.; Scheduling Conference held on 1/29/08. Trial date scheduled for June 16, 2008. ELT: 6 day bench trial (on clock). Counsel to submit stipulated scheduling order. Eleven depositions allowed per side. No dispositive motions to be filed. Discovery disputes to be filed in a unified format. Trial briefs and proposed Findings & Conclusions to be filed by June 11, 2008. Pretrial to be scheduled for June 6, 2008 at 1:30 p.m.. (ES)
January 28, 2008 Set Hearing: A Scheduling Conference is scheduled for January 29, 2008 at 10:00 a.m. in the courtroom before Hon. Marsha J. Pechman. (ES)
January 16, 2008 9 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties; estimated Trial Days: 8.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Jensen, Michelle)
December 18, 2007 Case Reassigned to Judge Marsha J. Pechman. All future pleadings shall bear cause number C07-1620MJP. Judge Ricardo S. Martinez no longer assigned to the case. (LC)
December 5, 2007 8 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.Joint Status Report due by 1/16/2008,FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/2/2008,Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/9/2008. (LC)
November 16, 2007 7 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Professional Basketball Club LLC.(Taylor, Paul)
October 29, 2007 6 Featured Case ORDER denying defendant's motion to stay and granting plaintiff's cross motion for stay of arbitration by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS, )
October 18, 2007 5 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez - Dep Clerk: Lowell Williams; Pla Counsel: Paul Lawrence, Jeffrey Johnson, Thomas Carr; Def Counsel: Paul Taylor; CR: Joe Roth; Time of Hearing: 1:30 PM; Courtroom: 13206;Motion Hearing held on 10/18/2007 re 2 MOTION to Stay filed by Professional Basketball Club LLC 3 MOTION for Hearing on Cross-Motion for Stay of Arbitration filed by City of Seattle. Court hears argument from counsel and takes matter under advisement. Court will issue a ruling as soon as possible. (LW)
October 15, 2007 Set Oral Argument on 2 MOTION to Stay, and 3 Cross-Motion for Stay of Arbitration : Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2007 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 13206 before Hon. Ricardo S Martinez. (LC)
October 11, 2007 4 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff City of Seattle. (Jensen, Michelle)
October 11, 2007 3 MOTION for Hearing on Cross-Motion for Stay of Arbitration by Plaintiff City of Seattle. Oral Argument Requested.Noting Date 10/19/2007.(Jensen, Michelle)
October 10, 2007 2 MOTION TO STAY ACTION PENDING ARBITRATION; PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STAY ARBITRATION by Defendant Professional Basketball Club LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D # 5 Exhibit E # 6 Exhibit F # 7 Exhibit G # 8 Exhibit H # 9 Exhibit I)Noting Date 10/26/2007.(MKB)
October 9, 2007 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 07-2-30997-7SEA; (Receipt # SEA12598), filed by Professional Basketball Club LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A 1-8 # 2 Exhibit A 9-10 # 3 Exhibit A 11-17 # 4 Exhibit A 18-19 # 5 Exhibit A 20 # 6 Exhibit A 21-22 # 7 Civil Cover Sheet)(MKB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: City of Seattle v. Professional Basketball Club LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Professional Basketball Club LLC
Represented By: Bradley S. Keller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Seattle
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]