Tavenner v. Talon Group The

Plaintiff: Karen Tavenner
Defendant: Talon Group The
Case Number: 2:2009cv01370
Filed: September 28, 2009
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2012 116 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE-NOTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND REVISING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge Robert S. Lasnik; Pltf's 113 MOTION for Summary Judgment is RENOTED: Noting Date 9/21/2012. (TF)
September 27, 2012 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING CLASS NOTICE re pltf's 119 Motion for Order Approving Class Notice by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
November 27, 2012 142 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CLASS NOTICE DEADLINES by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TF)
December 4, 2012 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part pltf's 113 Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
December 19, 2012 147 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CLASS NOTICE MAILING LIST re 146 Stipulation by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TF)
May 29, 2013 159 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED MOTION AND ORDER TO MAINTAIN STAY OF PROCEEDINGS by Judge Robert S. Lasnik; Joint Status Report due by 7/19/2013. (TF)
December 16, 2013 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 168 Motion preliminarily approving class action settlement, striking case deadlines, authorizing distribution of class notice and setting Final Approval Hearing Date for 4/10/2014 at 08:30 AM before Judge Robert S. Lasnik by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
March 26, 2012 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying dft's 90 Motion for Summary Judgment re fiduciary duty claims by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
March 26, 2012 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 59 Motion to Certify Class by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tavenner v. Talon Group The
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Tavenner
Represented By: Roblin John Williamson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Talon Group The
Represented By: Darcy W Shearer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]