Smith et al v. Laboratory Corporation of America, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Brad L. Smith and Tammie Smith
Defendant: Laboratory Corporation of America, Inc. and Jane J. Yin
 
Case Number: 2:2009cv01662
Filed: November 18, 2009
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
 
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 30, 2010 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying dft PNPA's 89 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying dft Jane Yin's 93 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Judge John C Coughenour.(RS)
February 3, 2011 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 110 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 130 Defendant LabCorp's cross Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 137 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 138 Defendants' Motion for certification to appeal by Judge John C Coughenour.(MD, cc to Lynn-CCA Clerk)
November 17, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying as moot 8 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting 10 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; denying 11 Motion to strike the motion for leave to file excess pages; granting 22 Motion to strike affidavit; g ranting 24 Motion to modify scheduling order; Pla's request for transfer of venue is granted. This action is transferred to the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington, Seattle Division. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by dks) [Transferred from idd on 11/20/2009.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Smith et al v. Laboratory Corporation of America, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad L. Smith
Represented By: Richard A Hearn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammie Smith
Represented By: Richard A Hearn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laboratory Corporation of America, Inc.
Represented By: J Michael Wheiler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane J. Yin
Represented By: Steven Kay Tolman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]