Dennings v. Clearwire Corporation Featured Case

Plaintiff: Angelo Dennings
Defendant: Clearwire Corporation
Case Number: 2:2010cv01859
Filed: November 15, 2010
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:1030 Computer Fraud and Abuse Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 3, 2014 181 DECLARATION of Jennifer M. Keough of the Garden City Group, Inc., re Distribution of Payments by Defendant Clearwire Corporation. (Payson, Kenneth)
July 3, 2014 180 DECLARATION of Anthony P. Gentile Verifying Clearwire's Compliance with Settlement Agreement re 179 Stipulation and Order by Defendant Clearwire Corporation. (Payson, Kenneth)
June 2, 2014 179 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER extending verification deadline by Judge James L. Robart. (RS) Modified on 6/2/2014/cc pro se party (RS).
May 30, 2014 178 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING VERIFICATION DEADLINE by parties. (Payson, Kenneth)
March 10, 2014 177 Featured Case ORDER granting 176 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for partial relief from the Court's Settlement Order and Final Judgment Dated, December 19, 2012, by Judge James L. Robart.(MD) Modified on 3/10/2014 -mailed copy of order to Robert Prior (MD).
March 9, 2014 176 MOTION representative pls.' unopposed mot. for partial relief from settlement order and final judgment dated Dec. 19, 2012 by Plaintiffs Michael Bobowski, Alyson Burn, Steven Cockayne, Brian Crawford, Dan Dazell, Angelo Dennings, Cheyenne Fegan, Sharon Floyd, Gregory Guerrier, Johanna Koskinen, Elena Munoz-Alazazi, Elaine Powell, Alia Tsang, Kyle Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Tirpak declaration, # 2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/28/2014, (Cantor, Clifford)
February 4, 2014 175 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 174 Stipulation regarding settlement distribution filed by Clearwire Corporation by Judge James L. Robart. (MD) Modified on 2/4/2014-mailed copy of order to Robert Prior (MD).
February 3, 2014 174 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER re Settlement Distribution by parties re 173 Stipulation and Order. (Payson, Kenneth)
December 20, 2013 173 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 172 Stipulation regarding settlement distribution filed by Clearwire Corporation by Judge James L. Robart. (MD)
December 17, 2013 172 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Settlement Distribution by parties. (Payson, Kenneth)
October 7, 2013 171 Featured Case ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds re: Appellate Bond. Motions terminated: 169 Unopposed MOTION Return of Appeal Bond re 149 Order Granting Motion for Appeal Bond filed by Gordan B. Morgan, Jeremy De La Garza, by Judge James L. Robart. (MDm cc to Fin'l Dept) Modified on 10/7/2013- mailed copy of order to Robert Prior (MD).
October 2, 2013 170 MANDATE of USCA (13-35491) as to 132 Notice of Appeal, filed by Gordan B. Morgan, Jeremy De La Garza. The judgment of this Court, entered September 09, 2013, takes effect this date. AFFIRMED. (SA)
September 19, 2013 169 Unopposed MOTION Return of Appeal Bond re 149 Order Granting Motion for Appeal Bond by Objectors Jeremy De La Garza, Gordan B. Morgan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Joint Stipulation) Noting Date 10/4/2013, (Bandas, Christopher)
September 11, 2013 168 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Show Cause Hearing held on 8/20/2013 before Judge James L. Robart.Parties have ten (10) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript contact court reporter Barry Fanning by telephone at 206-370-8507. or by e-mail at barry_fanning@wawd.uscourts.gov.. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/10/2013, (BF)
September 9, 2013 167 Featured Case ORDER of USCA (13-35491) as to 132 Notice of Appeal, filed by Gordan B. Morgan, Jeremy De La Garza. Plaintiffs-appellees request for judicial notice is granted. A review of the record, the motion for summary affirmance, the opposition and reply thereto, demonstrates that the questions raised in this appeal are so insubstantial as not to require further argument. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER INSTRUCTION). (SA)
August 20, 2013 166 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge James L. Robart- Dep Clerk: Casey Condon; Pla Counsel: Clifford Cantor, Felix, Luna; Def Counsel: Steve Rummage. Michael Iaria, Susan Wilk, Christopher Bandas, Donald Heyrich; CR: Barry Fanning; SHOW CAUSE HEARING held on 8/20/2013. The court hears from counsel re: sanctions. The court rules that the appropriate sanction is to revoke Mr. Bandas' authorization to practice in the Western District of Washington. The court grants the motion to withdraw, Dkt. #143. (CC)
August 15, 2013 165 MEMORANDUM filed by Objector Jeremy De La Garza re 155 MOTION to Vacate 154 Order to Show Cause and Notice of Posting of Appeal Bond in Full Amount .................CHRISTOPHER BANDAS'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO SANCTIONS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Philip Talmadge, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Kenneth Kagan, # 3 Exhibit Declaration of Jan Petrus, # 4 Exhibit Declaration of Christopher Bandas with Appendices, # 5 Exhibit Case - In re Navistar Diesel Engine Products, # 6 Exhibit 9th Circuit Brief - Appellant's Response to Plaintiffs-Appellees' Motion for Summary Affirmance)(Iaria, Michael)
August 12, 2013 163 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Show Cause Hearing held on 8/1/2013 before Judge James L. Robart.Parties have ten (10) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript contact court reporter Kari Lee Davidson by telephone at 253-627-2062. . Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/12/2013, (LMK)
August 9, 2013 164 SEALED DOCUMENT Earning Statement re: Angelo Dennings et al vs. Clearwire filed by East West Bank for July, 2013 (MD)
August 2, 2013 Set/Reset Hearings: Show Cause Hearing scheduled August 21, 2013 is rescheduled for Tuesday, August 20, 2013 at 2:00 p.m. Additional briefing shall be filed by 4:30 p.m., Friday, August 16, 2013.(CC)
August 1, 2013 162 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge James L. Robart- Dep Clerk: Casey Condon; Pla Counsel: Clifford Cantor, Felix Luna; Def Counsel: Steve Rummage. Michael Iaria, Susan Wilk; CR: Kari Davidson, Vernon & Associates; Show Cause Hearing held on 8/1/2013. The court hears from Mr. Iaria. The court extends the deadline to file additional briefing to 8:00 a.m., Monday, August 19, 2013. The court continues the show cause hearing to Wednesday, August 21, 2013 at 2:00 p.m.(CC)
July 31, 2013 161 CASH BOND RECEIPT in the amount of $41,150.00, posted by Clearwire Corporation, re 149 Order regarding posting of bond. Cash bond deposited with clerk's office on 7/23/13. (MD)
July 31, 2013 160 Featured Case ORDER Denying 159 Motion to Continue by Judge James L. Robart; The sanctions hearing will take place on August 1, 2013, as scheduled. (TF) cc: Robert Prior
July 31, 2013 159 MOTION to Continue Show Cause Hearing by Objector Jeremy De La Garza. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Declaration of Counsel) Noting Date 7/31/2013, (Iaria, Michael)
July 30, 2013 158 Featured Case ORDER - Notice to Objectors and Counsel regarding sanctions by Judge James L. Robart. (MD)
July 29, 2013 Attorney Susan Fannie Wilk for Jeremy De La Garza added. (KN)
July 26, 2013 157 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael Paul Iaria on behalf of Objector Jeremy De La Garza. (Iaria, Michael)
July 26, 2013 156 Featured Case ORDER Denying Objectors' 155 Motion to Vacate by Judge James L. Robart. (CL)
July 25, 2013 155 MOTION to Vacate 154 Order to Show Cause and Notice of Posting of Appeal Bond in Full Amount by Objectors Jeremy De La Garza, Gordan B. Morgan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FedEx proof of bond check, # 2 Exhibit Andersen Declaration) Noting Date 7/26/2013, (Bandas, Christopher)
July 19, 2013 154 Featured Case ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE by Judge James L. Robart. Show Cause Hearing set for 8/1/2013 at 02:00 PM before Judge James L. Robart. (RS) Modified on 7/22/2013/cc Prior (RS).
July 15, 2013 153 Featured Case ORDER of USCA (13-35491) as to 132 Notice of Appeal, filed by Gordan B. Morgan, Jeremy De La Garza The emergency motion to stay appeal bond is denied. The court will address all other pending motions by separate order. Briefing is stayed pending resolution of the pending motions. (SA)
July 11, 2013 152 Featured Case ORDER denying Objectors' 151 Motion to Stay by Judge James L. Robart.(RS) Modified on 7/11/2013/cc Prior (RS).
July 10, 2013 Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7(d)(3) Objectors Emergency Motion to Stay (Dkt. #145) and Emergency Motion to Stay (Dkt. #151) are re-noted to July 26, 2013.(CC)
July 9, 2013 151 Emergency MOTION to Stay re 149 Order AMENDED by Objectors Jeremy De La Garza, Gordan B. Morgan. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit) Noting Date 7/9/2013, (Bandas, Christopher)
July 9, 2013 150 AMENDED Notice of Appeal as to 147 AMENDED Notice of Appeal, 132 Notice of Appeal, by Objectors Jeremy De La Garza, Gordan B. Morgan. (Bandas, Christopher)
July 9, 2013 149 Featured Case AMENDED ORDER - Granting Motion for Appeal Bond by Judge James L. Robart. (MD, cc to Fin'l Dept)
July 9, 2013 148 Featured Case ORDER VACATING PRIOR ORDER re 142 Order on Motion for an appeal bond by Judge James L. Robart. (MD) Modified text on 7/9/2013 (MD).
July 9, 2013 147 AMENDED Notice of Appeal as to 132 Notice of Appeal, by Objectors Jeremy De La Garza, Gordan B. Morgan. (Bandas, Christopher)
July 9, 2013 146 EXHIBIT 1-3 re 145 Emergency MOTION to Stay re 144 Order, 142 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Objectors Jeremy De La Garza, Gordan B. Morgan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Bandas, Christopher)
July 9, 2013 145 Emergency MOTION to Stay re 144 Order, 142 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Objectors Jeremy De La Garza, Gordan B. Morgan. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/9/2013, (Bandas, Christopher)
July 9, 2013 144 Featured Case ORDER - Permitting deposit of appeal bond in court registry by Judge James L. Robart. (MD, cc to Fin'l Dept)
July 8, 2013 143 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Objectors Jeremy De La Garza, Gordan B. Morgan. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/26/2013, (Heyrich, Donald)
July 8, 2013 142 Featured Case ORDER granting 134 Plaintiffs' second Motion for an appeal bond by Judge James L. Robart.(MD) Modified on 7/8/2013- cc to Fin'l Dept. (MD).
July 3, 2013 141 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Objectors Jeremy De La Garza, Gordan B. Morgan for proceedings held on 12/19/2012 re 111 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript,,,. Requesting Attorney: Christopher A Bandas. (Bandas, Christopher)
June 28, 2013 140 DECLARATION of Cliff Cantor filed by Plaintiffs Michael Bobowski, Alyson Burn, Steven Cockayne, Brian Crawford, Dan Dazell, Angelo Dennings, Cheyenne Fegan, Sharon Floyd, Gregory Guerrier, Johanna Koskinen, Elena Munoz-Alazazi, Elaine Powell, Alia Tsang, Kyle Williams re 134 MOTION class plaintiffs' motion for appeal bond in connection with objectors' second appeal (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A, # 2 Ex. B)(Cantor, Clifford)
June 28, 2013 139 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Michael Bobowski, Alyson Burn, Steven Cockayne, Brian Crawford, Dan Dazell, Angelo Dennings, Cheyenne Fegan, Sharon Floyd, Gregory Guerrier, Johanna Koskinen, Elena Munoz-Alazazi, Elaine Powell, Alia Tsang, Kyle Williams, TO RESPONSE to 134 MOTION class plaintiffs' motion for appeal bond in connection with objectors' second appeal (Cantor, Clifford)
June 24, 2013 138 RESPONSE, by Objectors Jeremy De La Garza, Gordan B. Morgan, to 134 MOTION class plaintiffs' motion for appeal bond in connection with objectors' second appeal . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit letter from C. Bandas, # 2 Exhibit letter from C. Cantor, # 3 Exhibit Order, In re Wal-Mart (9th Cir), # 4 Exhibit Order, Heekin v. Anthem (7th Cir))(Bandas, Christopher)
June 21, 2013 137 Letter re: Stipulated Injunction. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration)(Bandas, Christopher)
June 13, 2013 136 DECLARATION of Cliff Cantor (re-filing of dkt. 108) filed by Plaintiffs Michael Bobowski, Alyson Burn, Steven Cockayne, Brian Crawford, Dan Dazell, Angelo Dennings, Cheyenne Fegan, Sharon Floyd, Gregory Guerrier, Johanna Koskinen, Elena Munoz-Alazazi, Elaine Powell, Alia Tsang, Kyle Williams re 134 MOTION class plaintiffs' motion for appeal bond in connection with objectors' second appeal (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A, # 2 Ex. B, # 3 Ex. C, # 4 Ex. D)(Cantor, Clifford)
June 13, 2013 135 DECLARATION of Cliff Cantor iso motion for appeal bond filed by Plaintiffs Michael Bobowski, Alyson Burn, Steven Cockayne, Brian Crawford, Dan Dazell, Angelo Dennings, Cheyenne Fegan, Sharon Floyd, Gregory Guerrier, Johanna Koskinen, Elena Munoz-Alazazi, Elaine Powell, Alia Tsang, Kyle Williams re 134 MOTION class plaintiffs' motion for appeal bond in connection with objectors' second appeal (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cantor, Clifford)
June 13, 2013 134 MOTION class plaintiffs' motion for appeal bond in connection with objectors' second appeal by Plaintiffs Michael Bobowski, Alyson Burn, Steven Cockayne, Brian Crawford, Dan Dazell, Angelo Dennings, Cheyenne Fegan, Sharon Floyd, Gregory Guerrier, Johanna Koskinen, Elena Munoz-Alazazi, Elaine Powell, Alia Tsang, Kyle Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/28/2013, (Cantor, Clifford)
June 3, 2013 133 TIME SCHEDULE ORDER as to 132 Notice of Appeal filed by Gordan B. Morgan, Jeremy De La Garza : Transcript designation due by 7/3/13; Transcript by court reporter due by 8/2/13; Appellants opening brief due by 9/11/13; Appellees response brief due by 10/11/13; Appellants optional reply brief due within 14 days of service of the response brief. (SA)
June 3, 2013 132 NOTICE OF APPEAL to Ninth Circuit (13-35491) re 127 Order on Motion for Order by Objectors Jeremy De La Garza, Gordan B. Morgan. Filing Fee $455, Receipt number 0981-3229408. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Bandas, Christopher) Modified on 6/4/2013 , ADD CCA #(SA).
June 3, 2013 131 MANDATE of USCA (13-35038) as to 101 Notice of Appeal, filed by Gordan B. Morgan, Jeremy De La Garza The judgment of this Court, entered April 22, 2013, takes effect this date. AFFIRMED (SA)
June 3, 2013 130 Featured Case ORDER denying 128 Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Contempt, by Judge James L. Robart.(MD) Modified on 6/3/2013-mailed copy of order to Robert Prior (MD).
May 20, 2013 129 RESPONSE, by Objectors Jeremy De La Garza, Gordan B. Morgan, to 128 MOTION for Contempt for ignoring Court's order to post appeal bond. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Appellants' Motion for Voluntary Dismissal, # 2 Exhibit 9th Circuit Order granting stay of appeal bond, # 3 Exhibit 7th Circuit Order granting stay of appeal bond)(Bandas, Christopher)
May 9, 2013 128 MOTION for Contempt for ignoring Court's order to post appeal bond by Plaintiffs Michael Bobowski, Alyson Burn, Steven Cockayne, Brian Crawford, Angelo Dennings, Cheyenne Fegan, Sharon Floyd, Gregory Guerrier, Johanna Koskinen, Elena Munoz-Alazazi, Elaine Powell, Alia Tsang, Kyle Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cliff Cantor, # 2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/24/2013, (Cantor, Clifford)
May 3, 2013 127 Featured Case ORDER Granting 120 Motion for Attorney's Fees and Expenses. by Judge James L. Robart. Total amount awarded is $1,950.000.00. (CL)
April 22, 2013 126 Featured Case ORDER of USCA (13-35038) as to 101 Notice of Appeal, filed by Gordan B. Morgan, Jeremy De La Garza;Plaintiffs-appellees request for judicial notice is granted. A review of the record, the motion for summary affirmance, and the opposition and reply thereto, demonstrates that the questions raised in this appeal are so insubstantial as not to require further argument. See United States v. Hooton, 693 F.2d 857, 858 (9th Cir. 1982) (per curiam) (stating standard). Accordingly, we grant plaintiffs-appellees motion for summary affirmance of the district courts December 20, 2012 settlement order and final judgment. Appellants motion for sanctions is denied. AFFIRMED. (LMK)
March 27, 2013 125 DECLARATION of Howard Anderson, Hans Andersson, and Brian Jacobson regarding Clearwire Claim Data filed by Defendant Clearwire Corporation re 120 MOTION for Order awarding fees & reimbursement of expenses (Payson, Kenneth)
March 27, 2013 124 DECLARATION of / Supplemental Compendium of Counsel's Declarations filed by Plaintiffs Michael Bobowski, Alyson Burn, Steven Cockayne, Brian Crawford, Dan Dazell, Angelo Dennings, Cheyenne Fegan, Sharon Floyd, Gregory Guerrier, Johanna Koskinen, Elena Munoz-Alazazi, Elaine Powell, Alia Tsang, Kyle Williams re 120 MOTION for Order awarding fees & reimbursement of expenses (Cantor, Clifford)
March 27, 2013 123 DECLARATION of Jennifer M. Keough regarding The Garden City Group, Inc.'s Fees & Expenses for Settlement Administration filed by Plaintiffs Michael Bobowski, Alyson Burn, Steven Cockayne, Brian Crawford, Dan Dazell, Angelo Dennings, Cheyenne Fegan, Sharon Floyd, Gregory Guerrier, Johanna Koskinen, Elena Munoz-Alazazi, Elaine Powell, Alia Tsang, Kyle Williams re 120 MOTION for Order awarding fees & reimbursement of expenses (Cantor, Clifford)
March 27, 2013 122 DECLARATION of Jennifer M. Keough of the Garden City Group, Inc. regarding Calculation of Distribution Amount filed by Plaintiffs Michael Bobowski, Alyson Burn, Steven Cockayne, Brian Crawford, Dan Dazell, Angelo Dennings, Cheyenne Fegan, Sharon Floyd, Gregory Guerrier, Johanna Koskinen, Elena Munoz-Alazazi, Elaine Powell, Alia Tsang, Kyle Williams re 120 MOTION for Order awarding fees & reimbursement of expenses (Cantor, Clifford)
March 27, 2013 121 DECLARATION of Cliff Cantor filed by Plaintiffs Michael Bobowski, Alyson Burn, Steven Cockayne, Brian Crawford, Dan Dazell, Angelo Dennings, Cheyenne Fegan, Sharon Floyd, Gregory Guerrier, Johanna Koskinen, Elena Munoz-Alazazi, Elaine Powell, Alia Tsang, Kyle Williams re 120 MOTION for Order awarding fees & reimbursement of expenses (Cantor, Clifford)
March 27, 2013 120 MOTION for Order awarding fees & reimbursement of expenses by Plaintiffs Michael Bobowski, Alyson Burn, Steven Cockayne, Brian Crawford, Dan Dazell, Angelo Dennings, Cheyenne Fegan, Sharon Floyd, Gregory Guerrier, Johanna Koskinen, Elena Munoz-Alazazi, Elaine Powell, Alia Tsang, Kyle Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/12/2013, (Cantor, Clifford)
March 14, 2013 119 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 118 Stipulation for third extension of time to file supplemental material on fee-and-expense motion filed by the parties, by Judge James L. Robart. (MD) Modified on 3/14/2013-mailed copy of order to Robert Prior (MD).
March 13, 2013 118 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER for extension by parties. (Cantor, Clifford)
March 11, 2013 117 Featured Case ORDER granting 107 110 Plaintiffs' Motion for Appeal Bond and orders Mr. Morgan and Mr. De La Garza to either post a bond in the amount of $41,150.00 or dismiss their notice of appeal, by Judge James L. Robart.(MD, cc to Pro se party)
March 8, 2013 116 Second DECLARATION of Cliff Cantor filed by Plaintiffs Michael Bobowski, Alyson Burn, Steven Cockayne, Brian Crawford, Dan Dazell, Angelo Dennings, Cheyenne Fegan, Sharon Floyd, Gregory Guerrier, Johanna Koskinen, Elena Munoz-Alazazi, Elaine Powell, Alia Tsang, Kyle Williams re 107 MOTION for Order requiring appeal bond (Attachments: # 1 Ex. E, corrected, # 2 Ex. F, corrected)(Cantor, Clifford)
March 8, 2013 115 Second DECLARATION of Cliff Cantor filed by Plaintiffs Michael Bobowski, Alyson Burn, Steven Cockayne, Brian Crawford, Dan Dazell, Angelo Dennings, Cheyenne Fegan, Sharon Floyd, Gregory Guerrier, Johanna Koskinen, Elena Munoz-Alazazi, Elaine Powell, Alia Tsang, Kyle Williams re 107 MOTION for Order requiring appeal bond (Attachments: # 1 Ex. E, # 2 Ex. F)(Cantor, Clifford)
March 8, 2013 114 DECLARATION of Jonathan K. Tycko filed by Plaintiffs Michael Bobowski, Alyson Burn, Steven Cockayne, Brian Crawford, Dan Dazell, Angelo Dennings, Cheyenne Fegan, Sharon Floyd, Gregory Guerrier, Johanna Koskinen, Elena Munoz-Alazazi, Elaine Powell, Alia Tsang, Kyle Williams, Interested Party Chad Minnick re 107 MOTION for Order requiring appeal bond (Cantor, Clifford)
March 8, 2013 113 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Michael Bobowski, Alyson Burn, Steven Cockayne, Brian Crawford, Dan Dazell, Angelo Dennings, Cheyenne Fegan, Sharon Floyd, Gregory Guerrier, Johanna Koskinen, Elena Munoz-Alazazi, Elaine Powell, Alia Tsang, Kyle Williams, TO RESPONSE to 107 MOTION for Order requiring appeal bond (Cantor, Clifford)
March 1, 2013 112 RESPONSE, by Objectors Jeremy De La Garza, Gordan B. Morgan, to 110 MOTION for Order Clearwire's Joinder in Plaintiff's Motion for Appeal Bond, 107 MOTION for Order requiring appeal bond. Oral Argument Requested. (Bandas, Christopher)
February 27, 2013 111 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion For Approval of Class Settlement held on 12/19/2012 before Judge James L. Robart.Parties have ten (10) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript contact court reporter Barry Fanning by telephone at 206-370-8507. or by e-mail at barry_fanning@wawd.uscourts.gov.. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/28/2013, (BF)
February 21, 2013 110 MOTION for Order Clearwire's Joinder in Plaintiff's Motion for Appeal Bond by Defendant Clearwire Corporation. Noting Date 3/8/2013, (Rummage, Stephen)
February 21, 2013 109 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Objectors Jeremy De La Garza, Gordan B. Morgan for proceedings held on 12/19/2012 Requesting Attorney: Christopher A Bandas. (Bandas, Christopher)
February 20, 2013 108 DECLARATION of Cliff Cantor filed by Plaintiffs Michael Bobowski, Alyson Burn, Steven Cockayne, Brian Crawford, Dan Dazell, Angelo Dennings, Cheyenne Fegan, Sharon Floyd, Gregory Guerrier, Johanna Koskinen, Elena Munoz-Alazazi, Elaine Powell, Alia Tsang, Kyle Williams re 107 MOTION for Order requiring appeal bond (Attachments: # 1 Ex A - Keough Decl., # 2 Ex B - Embry v. Acer (slip op.), # 3 Ex C - 2011 Annual Report, # 4 Ex D - De La Garza objection)(Cantor, Clifford)
February 20, 2013 107 MOTION for Order requiring appeal bond by Plaintiffs Michael Bobowski, Alyson Burn, Steven Cockayne, Brian Crawford, Dan Dazell, Angelo Dennings, Cheyenne Fegan, Sharon Floyd, Gregory Guerrier, Johanna Koskinen, Elena Munoz-Alazazi, Elaine Powell, Alia Tsang, Kyle Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/8/2013, (Cantor, Clifford)
February 19, 2013 106 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 105 Stipulation for second extension of time to file supplemental material on fee-and-expense motion filed by Gregory Guerrier, Johanna Koskinen, Steven Cockayne, Cheyenne Fegan, Elena Munoz-Alazazi, Brian Crawford, Alia Tsang, Alyson Burn, Michael Bobowski, Sharon Floyd, Kyle Williams, Dan Dazell, Elaine Powell, Angelo Dennings, by Judge James L. Robart. (MD)
February 19, 2013 105 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER for second extension of time to file supplemental material on fee-and-expense motion by parties. (Cantor, Clifford)
February 4, 2013 104 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 103 Stipulation extending date for renewed fee-and-expense motion filed by Gregory Guerrier, Johanna Koskinen, Steven Cockayne, Cheyenne Fegan, Elena Munoz-Alazazi, Brian Crawford, Alia Tsang, Alyson Burn, Michael Bobowski, Sharon Floyd, Kyle Williams, Dan Dazell, Elaine Powell, Angelo Dennings, by Judge James L. Robart. (MD) Modified on 2/5/2013 -mailed copy of order to pltf Robert Prior(MD).
February 4, 2013 103 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER extending date by parties. (Cantor, Clifford)
January 18, 2013 102 TIME SCHEDULE ORDER (13-35038) as to 101 Notice of Appeal, filed by Gordan B. Morgan, Jeremy De La Garza : The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/25/2013. Transcript ordered by 02/19/2013. Transcript due 03/19/2013. Appellants Jeremy De La Garza and Gordan B Morgan opening brief due 04/29/2013. Appellees Michael Bobowski, Alyson Burn, Clearwire Corporation, Steven Cockayne, Brian Crawford, Dan Dazell, Angelo Dennings, Cheyenne Fegan, Sharon Floyd, Gregory Guerrier, Johanna Koskinen, Elena Munoz-Alazazi, Elaine Powell, Robert Prior, Alia Tsang and Kyle Williams answering brief due 05/28/2013. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. (LMK)
January 18, 2013 101 NOTICE OF APPEAL (13-.5038) to Ninth Circuit re 99 Order, by Objectors Jeremy De La Garza, Gordan B. Morgan. Filing Fee $455, Receipt number 0981-3080235. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Bandas, Christopher) Modified on 1/23/2013; added CCA case number. (LMK).
December 27, 2012 100 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Peter Seidman for Plaintiffs Michael Bobowski, Alyson Burn, Steven Cockayne, Brian Crawford, Dan Dazell, Angelo Dennings, Cheyenne Fegan, Sharon Floyd, Gregory Guerrier, Johanna Koskinen, Elena Munoz-Alazazi, Elaine Powell, Alia Tsang, Kyle Williams. (Seidman, Peter)
December 20, 2012 99 Featured Case SETTLEMENT ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT re 96 Proposed Order (Unsigned) filed by Gregory Guerrier, Johanna Koskinen, Steven Cockayne, Cheyenne Fegan, Elena Munoz-Alazazi, Brian Crawford, Alia Tsang, Alyson Burn, Michael Bobowski, Sharon Floyd, Kyle Williams, Dan Dazell, Elaine Powell, Angelo Dennings by Judge James L. Robart. (MD)
December 19, 2012 98 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge James L. Robart- Dep Clerk: Casey Condon; Pla Counsel: Clifford Cantor; Def Counsel: Stephen Rummage, Kenneth Payson; CR: Barry Fanning; Final Approval of Class Settlement hearing held on 12/19/2012. The court approves the class settlement and signs the Settlement Order And Final Judgment. The court directs counsel to submit a renewed motion for attorneys' fees, no later than March 1,2013. (CC)
December 18, 2012 97 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiffs Michael Bobowski, Alyson Burn, Steven Cockayne, Brian Crawford, Dan Dazell, Angelo Dennings, Cheyenne Fegan, Sharon Floyd, Gregory Guerrier, Johanna Koskinen, Elena Munoz-Alazazi, Elaine Powell, Alia Tsang, Kyle Williams re 71 MOTION for attorneys' fees and expenses and for service awards to representative plaintiffs , 69 MOTION for final approval of settlement : PLS.' DEPOSITION INFO. ABOUT OBJECTORS MORGAN AND DE LA GARZA (Attachments: # 1 Cantor decl. re. depositions of Morgan and De La Garza, # 2 Ex. A - excerpts of Morgan dep., # 3 Ex. B - excerpts of De La Garza dep.)(Cantor, Clifford)
December 18, 2012 96 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re 69 MOTION for final approval of settlement , revised, with Exhibit 1 (Cantor, Clifford)
December 18, 2012 95 Second DECLARATION of Cliff Cantor re objections; filed by Plaintiffs Michael Bobowski, Alyson Burn, Steven Cockayne, Brian Crawford, Dan Dazell, Angelo Dennings, Cheyenne Fegan, Sharon Floyd, Gregory Guerrier, Johanna Koskinen, Elena Munoz-Alazazi, Elaine Powell, Alia Tsang, Kyle Williams re 71 MOTION for attorneys' fees and expenses and for service awards to representative plaintiffs , 69 MOTION for final approval of settlement (Attachments: # 1 untimely objection)(Cantor, Clifford)
December 17, 2012 94 OBJECTIONS re 93 Notice to Take Deposition, 92 Notice to Take Deposition, to Subpoena of Documents by Objectors Jeremy De La Garza, Gordan B. Morgan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Bandas, Christopher)
December 15, 2012 93 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION of Mr. Gordon Morgan on Dec. 17, 2012. Filed by Plaintiffs Michael Bobowski, Alyson Burn, Steven Cockayne, Brian Crawford, Dan Dazell, Angelo Dennings, Cheyenne Fegan, Sharon Floyd, Gregory Guerrier, Johanna Koskinen, Elena Munoz-Alazazi, Elaine Powell, Alia Tsang, Kyle Williams, Interested Party Chad Minnick. (Attachments: # 1 Ex A, # 2 Ex B)(Cantor, Clifford)
December 15, 2012 92 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION of Mr. Jeremy De La Garza on Dec. 17, 2012. Filed by Plaintiffs Michael Bobowski, Alyson Burn, Steven Cockayne, Brian Crawford, Dan Dazell, Angelo Dennings, Cheyenne Fegan, Sharon Floyd, Gregory Guerrier, Johanna Koskinen, Elena Munoz-Alazazi, Elaine Powell, Alia Tsang, Kyle Williams, Interested Party Chad Minnick. (Attachments: # 1 Ex A, # 2 Ex B)(Cantor, Clifford)
December 14, 2012 91 Featured Case ORDER re 90 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jonathan K Tycko for Chad Minnick, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
December 13, 2012 90 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jonathan K. Tycko FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Interested Party Chad Minnick (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3046491. (Luna, Felix)
December 13, 2012 89 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Felix G Luna on behalf of Interested Party Chad Minnick. (Luna, Felix)
December 12, 2012 88 RESPONSE, by Defendant Clearwire Corporation, to 69 MOTION for final approval of settlement . (Rummage, Stephen)
December 12, 2012 87 APPENDIX re 84 Reply to Response to Motion, COMPENDIUM OF COURT FILINGS, by Plaintiffs Michael Bobowski, Alyson Burn, Steven Cockayne, Brian Crawford, Dan Dazell, Angelo Dennings, Cheyenne Fegan, Sharon Floyd, Gregory Guerrier, Johanna Koskinen, Elena Munoz-Alazazi, Elaine Powell, Alia Tsang, Kyle Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1, # 2 Ex. 2, # 3 Ex. 3, # 4 Ex. 4, # 5 Ex. 5, # 6 Ex. 6, # 7 Ex. 7, # 8 Ex. 8, # 9 Ex. 9, # 10 Ex. 10, # 11 Ex. 11, # 12 Ex. 12, # 13 Ex. 13, # 14 Ex. 14, # 15 Ex. 15, # 16 Ex. 16, # 17 Ex. 17, # 18 Ex. 18)(Cantor, Clifford)
December 12, 2012 86 Supplemental DECLARATION of Cliff Cantor filed by Plaintiffs Michael Bobowski, Alyson Burn, Steven Cockayne, Brian Crawford, Dan Dazell, Angelo Dennings, Cheyenne Fegan, Sharon Floyd, Gregory Guerrier, Johanna Koskinen, Elena Munoz-Alazazi, Elaine Powell, Alia Tsang, Kyle Williams re 71 MOTION for attorneys' fees and expenses and for service awards to representative plaintiffs , 69 MOTION for final approval of settlement (Cantor, Clifford)
December 12, 2012 85 Supplemental DECLARATION of Jennifer M. Keough of Garden City Group filed by Plaintiffs Michael Bobowski, Alyson Burn, Steven Cockayne, Brian Crawford, Dan Dazell, Angelo Dennings, Cheyenne Fegan, Sharon Floyd, Gregory Guerrier, Johanna Koskinen, Elena Munoz-Alazazi, Elaine Powell, Alia Tsang, Kyle Williams re 71 MOTION for attorneys' fees and expenses and for service awards to representative plaintiffs , 69 MOTION for final approval of settlement (Cantor, Clifford)
December 12, 2012 84 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Michael Bobowski, Alyson Burn, Steven Cockayne, Brian Crawford, Dan Dazell, Angelo Dennings, Cheyenne Fegan, Sharon Floyd, Gregory Guerrier, Johanna Koskinen, Elena Munoz-Alazazi, Elaine Powell, Alia Tsang, Kyle Williams, TO RESPONSE to 71 MOTION for attorneys' fees and expenses and for service awards to representative plaintiffs , 69 MOTION for final approval of settlement (Cantor, Clifford)
December 12, 2012 83 DECLARATION of Cliff Cantor re. Objections; filed by Plaintiffs Michael Bobowski, Alyson Burn, Steven Cockayne, Brian Crawford, Dan Dazell, Angelo Dennings, Cheyenne Fegan, Sharon Floyd, Gregory Guerrier, Johanna Koskinen, Elena Munoz-Alazazi, Elaine Powell, Alia Tsang, Kyle Williams re 71 MOTION for attorneys' fees and expenses and for service awards to representative plaintiffs , 69 MOTION for final approval of settlement (Attachments: # 1 Objection A, # 2 Objection B, # 3 Objection C, # 4 Objection D, # 5 Objection E, # 6 Objection F, # 7 Objection G)(Cantor, Clifford)
December 11, 2012 82 Featured Case ORDER granting 78 Plaintiffs' Motion to allow depositions of objectors Gordon B. Morgan and Jeremy De La Garza, by Judge James L. Robart.(MD) Modified on 12/11/2012-mailed copy of order to Robert Prior (MD).
December 10, 2012 81 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 80 Stipulation regarding page limit filed by Gregory Guerrier, Johanna Koskinen, Steven Cockayne, Cheyenne Fegan, Elena Munoz-Alazazi, Brian Crawford, Alia Tsang, Alyson Burn, Michael Bobowski, Sharon Floyd, Kyle Williams, Dan Dazell, Elaine Powell, Angelo Dennings by Judge James L. Robart. (MD)
December 10, 2012 80 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER for additional pages by parties. (Cantor, Clifford)
December 6, 2012 79 DECLARATION of Cliff Cantor filed by Plaintiffs Michael Bobowski, Alyson Burn, Steven Cockayne, Brian Crawford, Dan Dazell, Angelo Dennings, Cheyenne Fegan, Sharon Floyd, Gregory Guerrier, Johanna Koskinen, Elena Munoz-Alazazi, Elaine Powell, Alia Tsang, Kyle Williams re 78 MOTION to allow depositions of objectors Gordon B. Morgan and Jeremy De La Garza (Cantor, Clifford)
December 6, 2012 78 MOTION to allow depositions of objectors Gordon B. Morgan and Jeremy De La Garza by Plaintiffs Michael Bobowski, Alyson Burn, Steven Cockayne, Brian Crawford, Dan Dazell, Angelo Dennings, Cheyenne Fegan, Sharon Floyd, Gregory Guerrier, Johanna Koskinen, Elena Munoz-Alazazi, Elaine Powell, Alia Tsang, Kyle Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Form of subpoenas, # 2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/21/2012, (Cantor, Clifford)
December 3, 2012 77 Featured Case ORDER re 75 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Christopher A Bandas for Jeremy De La Garza, and for Gordan B. Morgan, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
November 30, 2012 76 OBJECTIONS re 71 MOTION for attorneys' fees and expenses and for service awards to representative plaintiffs , 69 MOTION for final approval of settlement by Objectors Gordan B. Morgan, Jeremy De La Garza. (Heyrich, Donald)
November 30, 2012 75 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Christopher A. Bandas FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Michael Bobowski, Alyson Burn, Steven Cockayne, Brian Crawford, Dan Dazell, Angelo Dennings, Cheyenne Fegan, Sharon Floyd, Gregory Guerrier, Johanna Koskinen, Elena Munoz-Alazazi, Elaine Powell, Robert Prior, Alia Tsang, Kyle Williams (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-3032425. (Heyrich, Donald)
November 8, 2012 74 DECLARATION of // compendium of counsel's declarations in support of motion for attorneys' fees and expenses filed by Plaintiffs Michael Bobowski, Alyson Burn, Steven Cockayne, Brian Crawford, Dan Dazell, Angelo Dennings, Cheyenne Fegan, Sharon Floyd, Gregory Guerrier, Johanna Koskinen, Elena Munoz-Alazazi, Elaine Powell, Alia Tsang, Kyle Williams re 71 MOTION for attorneys' fees and expenses and for service awards to representative plaintiffs (Cantor, Clifford)
November 8, 2012 73 DECLARATION of Cliff Cantor and Jonathan Tycko filed by Plaintiffs Michael Bobowski, Alyson Burn, Steven Cockayne, Brian Crawford, Dan Dazell, Angelo Dennings, Cheyenne Fegan, Sharon Floyd, Gregory Guerrier, Johanna Koskinen, Elena Munoz-Alazazi, Elaine Powell, Alia Tsang, Kyle Williams re 71 MOTION for attorneys' fees and expenses and for service awards to representative plaintiffs , 69 MOTION for final approval of settlement (Cantor, Clifford)
November 8, 2012 72 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re 71 MOTION for attorneys' fees and expenses and for service awards to representative plaintiffs , 69 MOTION for final approval of settlement (Cantor, Clifford)
November 8, 2012 71 MOTION for attorneys' fees and expenses and for service awards to representative plaintiffs by Plaintiffs Michael Bobowski, Alyson Burn, Steven Cockayne, Brian Crawford, Dan Dazell, Angelo Dennings, Cheyenne Fegan, Sharon Floyd, Gregory Guerrier, Johanna Koskinen, Elena Munoz-Alazazi, Elaine Powell, Alia Tsang, Kyle Williams. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1, # 2 Ex. 2) Noting Date 12/19/2012, (Cantor, Clifford)
November 8, 2012 70 DECLARATION of Jennifer M. Keough of Garden City Group, Inc. regarding notice dissemination and settlement administration filed by Plaintiffs Michael Bobowski, Alyson Burn, Steven Cockayne, Brian Crawford, Dan Dazell, Angelo Dennings, Cheyenne Fegan, Sharon Floyd, Gregory Guerrier, Johanna Koskinen, Elena Munoz-Alazazi, Elaine Powell, Alia Tsang, Kyle Williams re 69 MOTION for final approval of settlement (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Cantor, Clifford)
November 8, 2012 69 MOTION for final approval of settlement by Plaintiffs Michael Bobowski, Alyson Burn, Steven Cockayne, Brian Crawford, Dan Dazell, Angelo Dennings, Cheyenne Fegan, Sharon Floyd, Gregory Guerrier, Johanna Koskinen, Elena Munoz-Alazazi, Elaine Powell, Alia Tsang, Kyle Williams. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 proposed settlement order and final judgment) Noting Date 12/19/2012, (Cantor, Clifford)
November 8, 2012 68 WAIVER of defendant Clearwire of certain reversionary rights under settlement agreement and release of claims; filed by by Plaintiffs Michael Bobowski, Alyson Burn, Steven Cockayne, Brian Crawford, Dan Dazell, Angelo Dennings, Cheyenne Fegan, Sharon Floyd, Gregory Guerrier, Johanna Koskinen, Elena Munoz-Alazazi, Elaine Powell, Alia Tsang, Kyle Williams. (Cantor, Clifford)
October 29, 2012 67 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 66 Stipulation to extend deadlines for the final approval motion and fee-and-expenses motion filed by Gregory Guerrier, Johanna Koskinen, Steven Cockayne, Cheyenne Fegan, Elena Munoz-Alazazi, Brian Crawford, Alia Tsang, Alyson Burn, Michael Bobowski, Sharon Floyd, Kyle Williams, Dan Dazell, Elaine Powell, Angelo Dennings, by Judge James L. Robart. (MD)
October 29, 2012 66 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER extending deadline by parties re 64 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Set/Reset Hearings,,. (Cantor, Clifford)
October 9, 2012 65 OBJECTIONS by Sean Kevin Holmes re 64 Order on Class Action (MD)
August 24, 2012 64 Featured Case ORDER granting 61 Plaintiffs Motion re: Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement, Conditionally Certifying Settlement Class and Approving form and Manner of Notice. Settlement In-court Hearing set for 12/19/2012 at 03:00 PM before Judge James L. Robart, by Judge James L. Robart.(MD)
August 9, 2012 63 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 60 Stipulation request that the Court allow up to 24 pages for the preliminary approval motion filed by Angelo Dennings by Judge James L. Robart. (MD)
August 6, 2012 62 DECLARATION of Cliff Cantor filed by Plaintiff Angelo Dennings re 61 MOTION for preliminary approval of class action settlement and approval of settlement notice (Cantor, Clifford)
August 6, 2012 61 MOTION for preliminary approval of class action settlement and approval of settlement notice by Plaintiff Angelo Dennings. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1 - Settlement Agreement, # 2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/24/2012, (Cantor, Clifford)
August 6, 2012 60 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER allowing up to 24 pages for preliminary approval motion by parties. (Cantor, Clifford)
July 31, 2012 59 Featured Case ORDER CONTINUING STAY by Judge James L. Robart; The Court STAYS this matter until 8/6/2012. Joint Status Report due by 8/6/2012. (TF)
July 30, 2012 58 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Stay (Joint Status Report) by parties. (Payson, Kenneth)
July 25, 2012 57 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING STAY by Judge James L. Robart; The Court STAYS this matter until 7/30/2012. (TF)
July 24, 2012 56 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. (Payson, Kenneth)
June 25, 2012 55 Featured Case JOINT STATUS REPORT, STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING STAY by Judge James L. Robart; The Court approves the parties' 54 Stipulation and STAYS this matter until 7/23/2012. (TF)
June 21, 2012 54 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. (Payson, Kenneth)
May 23, 2012 53 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 48 Joint Status Report, Stipulation and Order continuing Stay, by Judge James L. Robart. (MD, mailed copy of order to R. Prior)
May 23, 2012 52 Featured Case ORDER granting 50 Plaintiff's Motion lifting stay for single purpose and approving withdrawal of representation of Plaintiff Robert Prior, by Judge James L. Robart.(MD, mailed copy of order to Robert Prior )
May 21, 2012 51 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties Filed by Plaintiffs Michael Bobowski, Alyson Burn, Steven Cockayne, Brian Crawford, Dan Dazell, Angelo Dennings, Cheyenne Fegan, Sharon Floyd, Gregory Guerrier, Johanna Koskinen, Elena Munoz-Alazazi, Elaine Powell, Robert Prior, Alia Tsang, Kyle Williams, Defendant Clearwire Corporation.(Payson, Kenneth)
May 10, 2012 50 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Robert Prior and lift stay for this purpose by Plaintiffs Michael Bobowski, Alyson Burn, Steven Cockayne, Brian Crawford, Dan Dazell, Angelo Dennings, Cheyenne Fegan, Sharon Floyd, Gregory Guerrier, Johanna Koskinen, Elena Munoz-Alazazi, Elaine Powell, Robert Prior, Alia Tsang, Kyle Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Keller Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/25/2012, (Cantor, Clifford)
April 11, 2012 49 Featured Case ORDER CONTINUING STAY by Judge James L. Robart. (MD)
April 10, 2012 48 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re 47 Joint Status Report (Continuing Stay). (Payson, Kenneth)
April 5, 2012 47 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: n/a.. (Payson, Kenneth)
March 16, 2012 45 Featured Case ORDER CONTINUING STAY by Judge James L. Robart; The Court approves the parties' 44 stipulation and STAYS this matter until 3/28/2012. At the expiration of that time the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report describing how they propose that this matter will proceed. (TF)
March 14, 2012 44 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. (Payson, Kenneth)
February 29, 2012 43 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 42 Stipulation and order continuing Stay filed by Clearwire Corporation. Case stayed, by Judge James L. Robart. (MD)
February 28, 2012 42 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING STAY by parties. (Payson, Kenneth)
February 2, 2012 41 Featured Case STIPULATED ORDER continuing stay re 40 Joint Status Report by Judge James L. Robart. (MD)
January 31, 2012 40 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. (Payson, Kenneth)
November 2, 2011 39 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 38 Stipulation that this matter is stayed for 90 days. At the expiration of that time, the parties will submit a Joint Status Report, by Judge James L. Robart. (MD)
November 1, 2011 38 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER and joint status report by parties. (Cantor, Clifford)
September 1, 2011 37 Featured Case ORDER STAYING CASE for 60 days. At the expirtion of that time, the parties will submit a Joint Status Report concerning how they propose that this matter will proceed by Judge James L. Robart. (MD)
August 25, 2011 36 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. (Cantor, Clifford)
June 26, 2011 35 Featured Case ORDER re 34 Stipulation and order this matter is stayed for 60 days, by Judge James L. Robart. (MD)
June 13, 2011 34 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER and joint status report by parties. (Cantor, Clifford)
May 12, 2011 33 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: n/a.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Goldmark, John)
April 11, 2011 32 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER granting 25 Motion to Stay Pending Supreme Court Ruling in AT&T Mobility vs. Concepcion. The court STRIKES all pending motions without prejudice to the parties refiling the motions at the expiration of the stay. Striking 26 Motion to Compel; striking 27 Motion to Dismiss; Case stayed, by Judge James L. Robart.(MD)
April 8, 2011 31 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to stay pending ruling in Concepcion by parties. (Cantor, Clifford)
April 6, 2011 30 Featured Case ORDER granting 24 Clearwire's Motion for Leave to File over-length motion to compel arbitration and stay claims by Judge James L. Robart.(MD)
April 1, 2011 29 PRAECIPE re 28 Declaration of Kim Camacho by Defendant Clearwire Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F to Camacho Decl [Dkt 28], # 2 Exhibit G-N to Camacho Decl [dkt28])(Payson, Kenneth)
March 31, 2011 28 DECLARATION of Kim Camacho filed by Defendant Clearwire Corporation re 27 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F, # 2 Exhibit G-N)(Payson, Kenneth)
March 31, 2011 27 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Clearwire Corporation. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/6/2011, (Payson, Kenneth)
March 31, 2011 26 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Claims by Defendant Clearwire Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/6/2011, (Payson, Kenneth)
March 31, 2011 25 MOTION to Stay Pending Supreme Court Ruling in AT&T Mobility LLC v. Concepcion by Defendant Clearwire Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/15/2011, (Payson, Kenneth)
March 28, 2011 24 MOTION for Leave to File Over-length Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Claims by Defendant Clearwire Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/28/2011, (Payson, Kenneth)
March 3, 2011 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT & SUPPLEMENTED against defendant(s) Clearwire Corporation with JURY DEMAND, filed by Angelo Dennings, Kyle Williams, Brian Crawford, Johanna Koskinen, Dan Dazell, Robert Prior, Steven Cockayne, Cheyenne Fegan, Elaine Powell, Elena Munoz-Alazazi, Michael Bobowski, Alia Tsang, Gregory Guerrier, Alyson Burn, Sharon Floyd.(Cantor, Clifford)
February 10, 2011 22 Featured Case ORDER striking 16 Motion to Compel; striking 17 Motion to Dismiss. Clearwire Corporation answer due 3/31/2011. Amended Pleadings due by 3/3/2011, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 4/7/2011, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/14/2001, Joint Status Report due by 4/21/2011, by Judge James L. Robart.(MD)
February 4, 2011 21 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER (1) Withdrawing Motion to Compel Arbitration and Motion to Dismiss; (2) Granting Plaintiff Leave to File Amended Complaint; (3) Extending Deadline for Clearwire to Answer or Otherwise Respond and Setting Briefing Schedule; (4) Resetting Initial Scheduling Dates; and (5) Continuing Deadline For Class Certification Motion by parties. (Payson, Kenneth)
January 13, 2011 20 PRAECIPE to attach document (Praecipe) [Correction to replace Docket No. 17] re 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Clearwire Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Payson, Kenneth)
January 13, 2011 19 STATEMENT [Corporate Disclosure] by Defendant Clearwire Corporation. (Payson, Kenneth)
January 13, 2011 18 DECLARATION of Kim Camacho filed by Defendant Clearwire Corporation re 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Payson, Kenneth)
January 13, 2011 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Clearwire Corporation. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/4/2011, (Payson, Kenneth)
January 13, 2011 16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Defendant Clearwire Corporation. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/4/2011, (Payson, Kenneth)
January 4, 2011 15 Featured Case ORDER re 14 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Michael R. Reese for Angelo Dennings, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
January 3, 2011 14 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Michael Reese FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Angelo Dennings (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2288950. (Cantor, Clifford)
December 13, 2010 13 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 12 Stipulation extending deadline for Clearwire to answer or otherwise respond and setting briefing schedule filed by Clearwire Corporation. Clearwire Corporation answer due 1/13/2011, by Judge James L. Robart. (MD)
December 10, 2010 12 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER for Clearwire to Answer or Otherwise Respond and Setting Briefing Schedule by parties. (Payson, Kenneth)
December 7, 2010 11 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 2/7/2011, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/24/2011, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/7/2011, by Judge James L. Robart. (CC)
December 7, 2010 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kenneth E Payson on behalf of Defendant Clearwire Corporation. (Payson, Kenneth)
December 1, 2010 8 Featured Case ORDER re 5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Joshua Keller for Angelo Dennings, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
December 1, 2010 7 Featured Case ORDER re 4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Peter Seidman for Angelo Dennings, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
December 1, 2010 6 Featured Case ORDER re 3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Andrei Rado for Angelo Dennings, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
November 30, 2010 9 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Clearwire Corporation on 11/23/2010 (MD)
November 30, 2010 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Joshua Keller FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Angelo Dennings (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2258987. (Feldman, Lori)
November 30, 2010 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Peter Seidman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Angelo Dennings (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2258982. (Feldman, Lori)
November 30, 2010 3 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Andrei Rado FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Angelo Dennings (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2258970. (Feldman, Lori)
November 16, 2010 2 NOTICE to out of state counsel advising of pro hac vice and ECF registration requirements. Electronically sent to attorneys of Milberg LLP and hard copy mailed to attorneys of Reese Richman LLP as listed on the Complaint.(MKB)
November 16, 2010 Summons issued as to defendants Clearwire Corporation via USPS. (MKB)
November 16, 2010 Judge James L. Robart added. (MKB)
November 15, 2010 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Clearwire Corporation (Receipt # 0981-2247098), filed by Angelo Dennings. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cantor, Clifford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dennings v. Clearwire Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelo Dennings
Represented By: Clifford A Cantor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clearwire Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]