Schulz v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Allison Schulz
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Case Number: 2:2010cv01883
Filed: November 18, 2010
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: Clallam
Nature of Suit: Retirement and Survivors Benefits
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 7, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; Commissioner's decision is reversed and remanded by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (RS)
May 22, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 22 MOTION for Attorney Fees under 42 U.S.C. 406(b) filed by Allison Schulz. Noting Date 4/22/2013, by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order for Attorney's Fees, # 2 Proposed Judgment Order)(GS)
May 23, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; pltf's motion for atty's fees is granted by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (RS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schulz v. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Schulz
Represented By: Amy Gilbrough
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]