Enpac, LLC v. Lucas et al

Plaintiff: Enpac LLC
Defendant: Chassidy F Lucas and CB Stormwater LLC
Case Number: 2:2011cv00037
Filed: January 7, 2011
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 20, 2012 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle denying 88 Defendants' Motion and amending preliminary injunction.(TG; cc mailed to defendants)
July 20, 2012 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 125 Motion for Sanctions by Judge Benjamin H Settle. Defendant to show cause by 7/27/2012. (TG; cc mailed to defendant)
March 31, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle granting 17 Motion for More Definite Statement and striking Dkt. 15.(TG; cc mailed to Chassidy Lucas)
June 1, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle granting 30 Motion to Set Aside Default as to Lucas; 33 denying MOTION for Judgment by Default as to Lucas and RENOTING as to Stormwater to 6/10/2011. (TG; cc mailed to defendants)
June 30, 2011 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle granting 40 Motion to Set Aside Default; and denying 33 Motion for Judgment as to CB Stormwater. (TG; cc mailed to defendants)
September 1, 2011 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle granting 48 Motion to Dismiss; Chassidy F Lucas, CB Stormwater LLC and Enpac LLC terminated as counter-claimant and counter-defendant. (TG; cc mailed to defendants)
September 8, 2011 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle denying 55 Motion for Reconsideration.(TG; cc mailed to defendants)
March 21, 2012 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 69 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Judge Benjamin H Settle.(TG; cc mailed to defendant)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Enpac, LLC v. Lucas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enpac LLC
Represented By: Randolph E Digges, III
Represented By: Lawrence D Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chassidy F Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CB Stormwater LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.