Microsoft Corporation v. TIVO Inc Featured Case

Microsoft sues TiVo alleging infringement of four (4) patents that it has held since the 1990s.

Defendant: TIVO Inc.
Plaintiff: Microsoft Corporation
Case Number: 2:2011cv00134
Filed: January 24, 2011
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 16, 2011 NOTE FROM N DIST OF CA: Case transferred from Washington Western has been opened in California Northern District as case 5:11-cv-02896, filed 06/16/2011. (RS)
June 3, 2011 Case electronically transferred to N Dist of CA on 6/3/11 (RS)
May 19, 2011 34 Featured Case ORDER granting dft's 21 Motion to stay and to transfer venue to Northern District of CA by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
May 18, 2011 33 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re 21 MOTION to Stay Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1659 and Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) MOTION to Stay Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1659 and Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) ; filed by Defendant TIVO Inc.. (McWilliam, Jofrey)
May 13, 2011 32 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation, to 21 MOTION to Stay Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1659 and Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) MOTION to Stay Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1659 and Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a). (Wion, Christopher)
March 22, 2011 31 Featured Case ORDER re 30 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Matthew D Powers for Microsoft Corporation, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
March 22, 2011 30 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Matthew D. Powers FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2371806. (Wion, Christopher)
March 22, 2011 29 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to FRCP 7.1. by TIVO Inc. Filed by Defendant TIVO Inc..(McWilliam, Jofrey)
March 18, 2011 28 DECLARATION of Eric Carsten filed by Defendant TIVO Inc. re 21 MOTION to Stay Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1659 and Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) MOTION to Stay Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1659 and Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) (McWilliam, Jofrey)
March 18, 2011 27 REPLY, filed by Defendant TIVO Inc., TO RESPONSE to 21 MOTION to Stay Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1659 and Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) MOTION to Stay Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1659 and Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) (McWilliam, Jofrey)
March 15, 2011 26 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re 24 Response to Motion, to Stay Pursuant to USC Sec. 1659 and to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 USC Sec. 1404(A). (Cramer, Shane)
March 14, 2011 25 DECLARATION of Shane Cramer filed by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation re 21 MOTION to Stay Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1659 and Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) MOTION to Stay Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1659 and Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Cramer, Shane)
March 14, 2011 24 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation, to 21 MOTION to Stay Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1659 and Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) MOTION to Stay Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1659 and Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a). (Cramer, Shane)
March 3, 2011 23 DECLARATION of Pavel Kovar filed by Defendant TIVO Inc. re 21 MOTION to Stay Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1659 and Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) MOTION to Stay Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1659 and Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) (McWilliam, Jofrey)
March 3, 2011 22 DECLARATION of Joseph Lipner filed by Defendant TIVO Inc. re 21 MOTION to Stay Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1659 and Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) MOTION to Stay Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1659 and Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P)(McWilliam, Jofrey)
March 3, 2011 21 MOTION to Stay Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1659 and Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) by Defendant TIVO Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Staying Further Proceedings and Transferring Venue to the U.S. District Court for the N.D. of California) Noting Date 3/18/2011, (McWilliam, Jofrey)
February 28, 2011 20 Featured Case ORDER re 16 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Samuel K Lu for dft TIVO Inc., by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(CL)
February 28, 2011 19 Featured Case ORDER re 15 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Joseph M Lipner for dft TIVO Inc., by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(CL)
February 28, 2011 18 Featured Case ORDER re 14 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Andrei Iancu for dft TIVO Inc., by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(CL)
February 28, 2011 17 Featured Case ORDER re 13 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Morgan Chu for dft TIVO Inc., by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(CL)
February 28, 2011 16 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Samuel K. Lu FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant TIVO Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2346191. (Keller, Bradley)
February 28, 2011 15 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Joseph M. Lipner FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant TIVO Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2346178. (Keller, Bradley)
February 28, 2011 14 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Andrei Iancu FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant TIVO Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2346168. (Keller, Bradley)
February 28, 2011 13 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Morgan Chu FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant TIVO Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2346152. (Keller, Bradley)
February 18, 2011 12 Featured Case ORDER granting 10 Stipulated Motion re answer to complaint by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
February 16, 2011 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Bradley S Keller on behalf of Defendant TIVO Inc.. (Keller, Bradley)
February 16, 2011 10 Stipulated MOTION re Answer to Complaint by Defendant TIVO Inc.. Noting Date 2/16/2011, (McWilliam, Jofrey)
February 9, 2011 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Paul Matthews (Reg. Agent for Tivo) on 1/28/2011, filed by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation. (Wion, Christopher)
January 26, 2011 8 Featured Case ORDER re 6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Timothy DeMasi for Microsoft Corporation, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
January 26, 2011 7 Featured Case ORDER re 5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Mark G. Davis for Microsoft Corporation, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
January 25, 2011 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Timothy DeMasi FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2312313. (Wion, Christopher)
January 25, 2011 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Mark G. Davis FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2312302. (Wion, Christopher)
January 25, 2011 NOTICE to Filer of case opening errors and information for future filings:Please enter all attorneys on the docket that are entered on the Complaint as representing your party except those that are appearing pro hac vice; enter all parties as they are entered on the Complaint i.e. Microsoft Corporation not Microsoft Corp.; use the "fillable" Patent/Trademark form found on the Court"s website under Reference Materials/Forms; and also use the fillable summons form again on the Court's website, so that they can be electronically issued back to you the next day. Thank you. (MKB)
January 25, 2011 Summons issued as to defendants TIVO Inc. via USPS. (MKB)
January 25, 2011 4 Letter sent to counsel Tim DeMasi and Mark Davis advising of pro hac vice and ECF registration requirements via ad hoc feature in ECF.(MKB)
January 25, 2011 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION REGARDING A PATENT/TRADEMARK sent to the Patent Office via ad hoc feature in ECF.(MKB)
January 25, 2011 Judge Ricardo S Martinez added. (MKB)
January 24, 2011 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to FRCP 7.1. by Microsoft Corp. Filed by Plaintiff Microsoft Corp..(Harrigan, Arthur)
January 24, 2011 1 COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement against defendant(s) TIVO Inc. (Receipt # 0981-2310118), filed by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form120), # 7 Summons)(Harrigan, Arthur)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Microsoft Corporation v. TIVO Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIVO Inc.
Represented By: Andrei Iancu
Represented By: Morgan Chu
Represented By: Bradley S Keller
Represented By: Joseph M Lipner
Represented By: Samuel K Lu
Represented By: Jofrey M McWilliam
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Shane P. Cramer
Represented By: T. Andrew Culbert
Represented By: Mark G. Davis
Represented By: Timothy DeMasi
Represented By: Arthur W. Harrigan, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew D Powers
Represented By: Stacy Quan
Represented By: Christopher T Wion
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]