Microsoft Corporation v. Barnes & Noble, Inc. et al Featured Case

Microsoft's patent infringement lawsuit against Barnes & Noble, Foxconn, and Inventec claiming that since Android devices allegedly violate MS patent's, then B&N's Nook e-reader and tablet device do too.

Defendant: Barnesandnoble.Com LLC, Hon Hai Precision Industry Co., Ltd., Foxconn International Holdings Ltd., Foxconn Electronics, Inc., Foxconn Precision Component Co., Ltd., Inventec Corporation and Barnes & Noble, Inc.
Counter_claimant: Barnesandnoble.Com LLC and Barnes & Noble, Inc.
Counter_defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Plaintiff: Microsoft Corporation
Case Number: 2:2011cv00485
Filed: March 21, 2011
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 8, 2011 43 Featured Case ORDER STAYING CASE, by Judge Richard A Jones. (CL)
June 3, 2011 42 REPLY, filed by Defendants Foxconn Electronics, Inc., Foxconn International Holdings Ltd., Foxconn Precision Component Co., Ltd., Hon Hai Precision Industry Co., Ltd., TO RESPONSE to 34 MOTION to Stay (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Stewart, Douglas)
May 31, 2011 41 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation, to 33 MOTION to Stay, 34 MOTION to Stay. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wion, Christopher)
May 20, 2011 40 Featured Case ORDER re 37 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Inchan A Kwon for Foxconn Electronics, Inc., Foxconn International Holdings Ltd., Foxconn Precision Component Co., Ltd.,I and Hon Hai Precision Industry Co., Ltd., by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(CL)
May 20, 2011 39 Featured Case ORDER re 35 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Glenn E Westreich for Foxconn Electronics, Inc., Foxconn International Holdings Ltd., Foxconn Precision Component Co., Ltd., and Hon Hai Precision Industry Co., Ltd., by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(CL)
May 20, 2011 38 Featured Case ORDER re 36 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Steven M Levitan for Foxconn Electronics, Inc., Foxconn International Holdings Ltd., Foxconn Precision Component Co., Ltd., Hon Hai Precision Industry Co., Ltd., by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(CL)
May 19, 2011 37 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Inchan A. Kwon FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Foxconn Electronics, Inc., Foxconn International Holdings Ltd., Foxconn Precision Component Co., Ltd., Hon Hai Precision Industry Co., Ltd. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2434838. (Stewart, Douglas)
May 19, 2011 36 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Steven M. Levitan FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Foxconn Electronics, Inc., Foxconn International Holdings Ltd., Foxconn Precision Component Co., Ltd., Hon Hai Precision Industry Co., Ltd. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2434832. (Stewart, Douglas)
May 19, 2011 35 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Glenn E. Westreich FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Foxconn Electronics, Inc., Foxconn International Holdings Ltd., Foxconn Precision Component Co., Ltd., Hon Hai Precision Industry Co., Ltd. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2434813. (Stewart, Douglas)
May 19, 2011 34 MOTION to Stay by Defendants Foxconn Electronics, Inc., Foxconn International Holdings Ltd., Foxconn Precision Component Co., Ltd., Hon Hai Precision Industry Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Inchan A. Kwon, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/3/2011, (Stewart, Douglas)
May 18, 2011 33 MOTION to Stay by Defendants Barnes & Noble, Inc., Barnesandnoble.Com LLC, Counter Claimants Barnes & Noble, Inc., Barnesandnoble.Com LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/3/2011, (Peterson, Louis)
May 9, 2011 32 Featured Case STANDING ORDER FOR PATENT CASES, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
May 9, 2011 31 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 6/8/2011, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/15/2011, Joint Status Report due by 6/22/2011, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
May 2, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties' stipulation 29 to extend Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation's deadline to answer Defendant Barnes & Noble's counterclaim is acknowledged. No court order is necessary. Deadline is June 15, 2011. (JJ)
May 2, 2011 30 WITHDRAWAL of Motion re 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Counterclaims of Barnes & Noble Inc. and Barnesandnoble.com, LLC ; by Counter Defendant Microsoft Corporation, Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation. (Wion, Christopher)
May 2, 2011 29 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline for Plaintiff Microsoft Corp. to Respond to Counterclaims of Defendants Barnes & Noble, Inc. and Barnesandnoble.com LLC by parties. (Wion, Christopher)
April 28, 2011 28 DECLARATION of Christopher Wion filed by Counter Defendant Microsoft Corporation, Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation re 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Counterclaims of Barnes & Noble Inc. and Barnesandnoble.com, LLC (Wion, Christopher)
April 28, 2011 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Counterclaims of Barnes & Noble Inc. and Barnesandnoble.com, LLC by Counter Defendant Microsoft Corporation, Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/6/2011, (Wion, Christopher)
April 28, 2011 26 Featured Case ORDER re 21 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Joseph R. Klinicki for Microsoft Corporation, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
April 28, 2011 25 Featured Case ORDER re 20 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Aleksander J. Goranin for Microsoft Corporation, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
April 28, 2011 24 Featured Case ORDER re 19 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Dale M Heist for Microsoft Corporation, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
April 28, 2011 23 Featured Case ORDER re 18 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Daniel J. Goettle for Microsoft Corporation, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
April 28, 2011 22 Featured Case ORDER re 17 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jeffrey W. Lesovitz for Microsoft Corporation, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
April 27, 2011 21 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Joseph R. Klinicki FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Counter Defendant Microsoft Corporation, Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2411334. (Cramer, Shane)
April 27, 2011 20 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Aleksander J. Goranin FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Counter Defendant Microsoft Corporation, Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2411332. (Cramer, Shane)
April 27, 2011 19 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Dale M. Heist FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Counter Defendant Microsoft Corporation, Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2411326. (Cramer, Shane)
April 27, 2011 18 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Daniel J. Goettle FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Counter Defendant Microsoft Corporation, Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2411321. (Cramer, Shane)
April 27, 2011 17 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jeffrey W. Lesovitz FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Counter Defendant Microsoft Corporation, Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2411299. (Cramer, Shane)
April 26, 2011 16 Featured Case ORDER re 15 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Peter T Barbur for Barnes & Noble, Inc. and Barnesandnoble.Com LLC, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
April 26, 2011 15 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Peter T. Barbur FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Barnes & Noble, Inc., Barnesandnoble.Com LLC, Counter Claimants Barnes & Noble, Inc., Barnesandnoble.Com LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2409353. (Peterson, Louis)
April 25, 2011 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to FRCP 7.1. by Barnesandnoble.Com LLC identifying Corporate Parent Barnes & Noble, Inc. for Barnesandnoble.Com LLC, Barnesandnoble.Com LLC. Filed by Defendants Barnesandnoble.Com LLC, Barnes & Noble, Inc., Counter Claimants Barnesandnoble.Com LLC, Barnes & Noble, Inc..(Peterson, Louis)
April 25, 2011 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to FRCP 7.1. by Barnes & Noble, Inc. Filed by Defendant Barnes & Noble, Inc., Counter Claimant Barnes & Noble, Inc..(Peterson, Louis)
April 25, 2011 12 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Microsoft Corporation by Barnesandnoble.Com LLC, Barnes & Noble, Inc..(Peterson, Louis)
April 15, 2011 ***Motion terminated: 11 Stipulated MOTION and Proposed Order Extending Deadline for Defendants Barnes & Noble, Inc. and barnesandnoble.com, LLC to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Barnesandnoble.Com LLC, Barnes & Noble, Inc.., Set/Reset Deadlines: Barnes & Noble, Inc. answer due 5/13/2011; Barnesandnoble.Com LLC answer due 5/13/2011. Court acknowledges parties' stipulation (Dkt. # 11 ) to extend answer deadline. (JJ)
April 13, 2011 11 Stipulated MOTION and Proposed Order Extending Deadline for Defendants Barnes & Noble, Inc. and barnesandnoble.com, LLC to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants Barnes & Noble, Inc., Barnesandnoble.Com LLC. Noting Date 4/13/2011, (Peterson, Louis)
April 13, 2011 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Jessica Moore (for barnesandnoble.com LLC) on 4/1/2011, filed by Plaintiff Microsoft Corporation. (Cramer, Shane)
April 12, 2011 9 Featured Case ORDER re 7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS A Antony Pfeffer for Barnes & Noble, Inc., and for Barnesandnoble.Com LLC, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(CL)
April 12, 2011 8 Featured Case ORDER re 6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Richard L DeLucia for dfts Barnes & Noble, Inc.,Richard L DeLucia for Barnesandnoble.Com LLC, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(CL)
April 12, 2011 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY A. Antony Pfeffer FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Barnes & Noble, Inc., Barnesandnoble.Com LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2394022. (Peterson, Louis)
April 12, 2011 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Richard L. DeLucia FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Barnes & Noble, Inc., Barnesandnoble.Com LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2394014. (Peterson, Louis)
April 12, 2011 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Louis David Peterson on behalf of Defendants Barnes & Noble, Inc., Barnesandnoble.Com LLC. (Peterson, Louis)
March 28, 2011 4 DECLARATION OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Barnes & Noble, Inc. on 3/23/2011. (CL)
March 22, 2011 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING A PATENT ORTRADEMARK provided to the patent office via ad hoc feature in ECF. (MKB) Modified on 3/22/2011 - regenerated NEF to patent office (MKB).
March 22, 2011 2 Summons issued as to defendants Barnes & Noble, Inc. and Barnesandnoble.com LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(MKB)
March 22, 2011 Judge Richard A Jones added. (MKB)
March 21, 2011 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against defendant(s) All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-2369735), filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form120), # 7 Civil Cover Sheet, # 8 Summons Barnes and Noble, # 9 Summons Barnesandnoble.com)(Cramer, Shane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Microsoft Corporation v. Barnes & Noble, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnesandnoble.Com LLC
Represented By: Peter T Barbur
Represented By: Mary E Crego
Represented By: Richard L DeLucia
Represented By: Louis David Peterson
Represented By: A Antony Pfeffer
Represented By: Michael Ramsey Scott
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon Hai Precision Industry Co., Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foxconn International Holdings Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foxconn Electronics, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foxconn Precision Component Co., Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inventec Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnes & Noble, Inc.
Represented By: Peter T Barbur
Represented By: Mary E Crego
Represented By: Richard L DeLucia
Represented By: Louis David Peterson
Represented By: A Antony Pfeffer
Represented By: Michael Ramsey Scott
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Barnesandnoble.Com LLC
Represented By: Mary E Crego
Represented By: Richard L DeLucia
Represented By: Louis David Peterson
Represented By: A Antony Pfeffer
Represented By: Michael Ramsey Scott
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Barnes & Noble, Inc.
Represented By: Mary E Crego
Represented By: Richard L DeLucia
Represented By: Louis David Peterson
Represented By: A Antony Pfeffer
Represented By: Michael Ramsey Scott
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Shane P. Cramer
Represented By: T. Andrew Culbert
Represented By: Arthur W. Harrigan, Jr.
Represented By: David E. Killough
Represented By: Christopher T Wion
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Dale M Heist
Represented By: Arthur W. Harrigan, Jr.
Represented By: Aleksander J. Goranin
Represented By: Daniel J. Goettle
Represented By: T. Andrew Culbert
Represented By: Shane P. Cramer
Represented By: David E. Killough
Represented By: Joseph R. Klinicki
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Lesovitz
Represented By: Christopher T Wion
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]