Hopkins v. HQ Sustainable Maritime Industries, Inc. et al

Defendant: Norbert Sporns, Lillian Wang Li, Harry Wang Hua, Fred Bild, Kevin M Fitzsimmons, Daniel Too and Jean-Pierre Dallaire
Plaintiff: Alan Hopkins
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv00910
Filed: May 31, 2011
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
 
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 26, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Robert S. Lasnik; Plaintiffs are hereby ORDERED to show cause within five days of the date of this Order. (TF)
May 17, 2013 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Robert S. Lasnik; Plaintiffs are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE within fourteen days of the date of this Order. Clerk docketed this Order in case number CV11-726 RSL. (TF)
June 20, 2013 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltfs' 74 Motion for Order for preliminary approval of settlement; Settlement Hearing set for 9/19/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Robert S. Lasnik by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(RS)
September 26, 2013 95 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (RS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hopkins v. HQ Sustainable Maritime Industries, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norbert Sporns
Represented By: Tyler Lawrence Farmer
Represented By: Shane P. Cramer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lillian Wang Li
Represented By: Tyler Lawrence Farmer
Represented By: Shane P. Cramer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Wang Hua
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Bild
Represented By: Shane P. Cramer
Represented By: Tyler Lawrence Farmer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin M Fitzsimmons
Represented By: Shane P. Cramer
Represented By: Tyler Lawrence Farmer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Too
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean-Pierre Dallaire
Represented By: Shane P. Cramer
Represented By: Tyler Lawrence Farmer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Hopkins
Represented By: Louis Boyarsky
Represented By: Clifford A Cantor
Represented By: Lionel Z Glancy
Represented By: Robert V. Prongay
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]