Armstead v. United States of America

Petitioner: Warren Eric Armstead
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2011cv01352
Filed: August 15, 2011
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Referring Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting respondent's 10 Motion to Continue; and granting petitioner's 12 Motion to Amend. The deadline for respondent's answer is 12/15/11. A COPY OF THIS ORDER HAS BEEN MAILED TO PETITIONER TODAY. Signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler.(GB)
February 6, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting petitioner's 14 Motion to Correct; denying 15 Motion for Copies; striking 16 Motion for IFP status; denying 20 Motion for trial transcripts; and granting 21 Motion to Continue. The new noting date for petitioner's Section 2255 motion is 04/06/12, Petitioner is directed to file and serve his response no later than 04/02/12. A COPY OF THIS ORDER HAS BEEN MAILED TO PETITIONER TODAY. Signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler.(GB)
October 12, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION UNDER 28 USC 2255 AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 29 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Warren Eric Armstead, by Judge James L. Robart. (MD, mailed copy of order to petitioner)
September 8, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying petitioner's 7 Motion to Appoint Counsel. A COPY OF THIS ORDER HAS BEEN MAILED TO PETITIONER TODAY. Signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler.(GB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armstead v. United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Warren Eric Armstead
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Tessa M Gorman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]