Mickelson et al v. Chase Home Finance LLC et al

Plaintiff: Travis Mickelson and Danielle H. Mickelson
Defendant: Chase Home Finance LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Northwest Trustee Services Inc, Mortgageit Inc, GMAC Mortgage Corporation, Chicago Title, Routh Crabtree Olsen PS and Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv01445
Filed: August 31, 2011
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: Island
Presiding Judge: Marsha J. Pechman
 
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 3, 2012 122 Featured Case ORDER granting 99 Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 103 Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Stipulation to continue pretrial dates is Moot, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
November 14, 2011 35 Featured Case ORDER granting 18 Deft Chicago Title Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss plaintiff's claim for breach of good faith, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
April 16, 2012 58 Featured Case ORDER granting 43 Defendants Motion to Dismiss. The Court DISMISSES all of the waived claims with prejudice as to all Defendants. The DTA claims against all defendants except Chicago and NTS are also DISMISSED with prejudice. The Court also DISMISSES the CPA claims against MERS, Chase, JPMorgan, and Freddie Mac without prejudice. The Court does not rule on whether the CPA claims against the other defendants who joined in the motion are adequately pleaded by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
August 6, 2012 86 Featured Case ORDER granting 73 Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc (a foreign corporation ), Chase Home Finance LLC (an unknown entity) and JPMorgan Chase Bank NA (a foreign corporation ) terminated, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)
August 7, 2012 88 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 70 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(IM)
August 21, 2012 93 Featured Case ORDER granting 83 Chicago Title's Motion to Dismiss. Chicago Title (an unknown corporation ) terminated, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Mickelson et al v. Chase Home Finance LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Mickelson
Represented By: Scott E Stafne
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle H. Mickelson
Represented By: Scott E Stafne
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Home Finance LLC
Represented By: Rebecca J. Francis
Represented By: Fred B Burnside
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Rebecca J. Francis
Represented By: Fred B Burnside
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc
Represented By: Fred B Burnside
Represented By: Rebecca J. Francis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Trustee Services Inc
Represented By: Heidi E. Buck
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgageit Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Title
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Routh Crabtree Olsen PS
Represented By: Heidi E. Buck
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Fred B Burnside
Represented By: Rebecca J. Francis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]