Happy Halloween, Inc. et al v. Screams, LLC Featured Case

Plaintiff: Happy Halloween, Inc. and Todd James
Defendant: Screams, LLC
Case Number: 2:2011cv01513
Filed: September 12, 2011
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 19, 2011 11 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by parties. (Dozier, John)
October 17, 2011 10 REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING A PATENT OR TRADEMARK filed by Plaintiff Happy Halloween, Inc. (Notice provided to the US Patent Office via ad hoc)(MKB)
October 17, 2011 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Coy Sevier, Authorized Agent, General Manager on 10/11/2011, filed by Plaintiffs Happy Halloween, Inc., Todd James. (Dozier, John)
October 4, 2011 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiffs Happy Halloween, Inc., Todd James. (Newman, Derek)
October 3, 2011 7 Featured Case ORDER re 6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney John W Dozier, Jr for Happy Halloween, Inc., and for Todd James, by William M. McCool. (No document associated with this docket entry, text only.)(DS)
October 3, 2011 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY John W. Dozier, Jr. FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Happy Halloween, Inc., Todd James (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-2575777. (Newman, Derek)
October 3, 2011 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1.. (Newman, Derek)
September 30, 2011 4 Show cause deadline re 3 Order to Show Cause NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 10/7/2011, (RS)
September 30, 2011 3 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due within 5 days by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (RS)
September 13, 2011 NOTICE to Filer: PATENT/TRADEMARK/COPYRIGHT:Pursuant to our local rules, Civil Rule 3(a), all civil action complaints in which jurisdiction is invoked in whole or in part under 28 U.S.C. § 1338 (regarding patents, trademarks and copyrights) shall be accompanied by the required notice to the Patent and Trademark Office (Form AO120) or the required notice to the Register of Copyrights (Form AO121). If this is such a case, please complete the appropriate form and email it back to the new cases box at newcases.seattle@wawd.uscourts.gov. Please include in the subject line the name and number of the case and the name of the document attached. This form will then be posted to the case docket and a copy sent to the appropriate entity.(MKB)
September 13, 2011 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1 Plaintiff must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 9/20/2011. (MKB)
September 13, 2011 2 Summons issued as to defendant Screams, LLC. (MKB)
September 13, 2011 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (MKB)
September 12, 2011 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Screams, LLC (Receipt # 0981-2553345), filed by Happy Halloween, Inc., TODD JAMES. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Newman, Derek)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Happy Halloween, Inc. et al v. Screams, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Happy Halloween, Inc.
Represented By: Randall Moeller
Represented By: John W Dozier, Jr
Represented By: Derek Alan Newman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd James
Represented By: John W Dozier, Jr
Represented By: Randall Moeller
Represented By: Derek Alan Newman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Screams, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]