Modern Dog Design Company v. Target Corporation et al Featured Case

Defendant: Disney Enterprises Inc, Walt Disney Company, Disney Consumer Products, John 1-5 Does, Target Corporation, Target Brands Inc and John Does
Plaintiff: Modern Dog Design Company
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv01816
Filed: October 28, 2011
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
 
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2012 50 MINUTE ORDER by Thomas S. Zilly, United States District Judge. Plaintiff Modern Dog Design Company's motion for entry of a protective order, docket no. 47 , is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Court will enter a Protective Order by separate docket entry. (CL)
November 16, 2012 49 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Modern Dog Design Company, TO RESPONSE to 47 MOTION for Protective Order (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Cline, Thomas)
November 14, 2012 48 RESPONSE, by Defendants Disney Consumer Products, Disney Enterprises Inc, Jaya Apparel Group LLC, Target Brands Inc, Target Corporation, Walt Disney Company, to 47 MOTION for Protective Order . (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Fogg, Steven)
November 2, 2012 47 MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff Modern Dog Design Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service) Noting Date 11/16/2012, (Cline, Thomas)
May 22, 2012 46 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES, AND DESIGNATING CASE FOR MEDIATION; Length of Trial: *5 days*. Mediation shall be completed no later than thirty (30) days prior to the trial date. Jury Trial is set for 9/9/2013 at 09:00 AM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Joinder of Parties due by 6/19/2012, Amended Pleadings due by 2/13/2013, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 2/13/2013, Motions due by 3/15/2013, Discovery completed by 4/15/2013, Dispositive motions due by 5/14/2013, Settlement conference to be held by 7/11/2013, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 8/12/2013, Motions in Limine due by 8/7/2013, Pretrial Order due by 8/27/2013, Trial briefs to be submitted by 8/27/2013, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 8/27/2013, Pretrial Conference set for 8/30/2013 at 03:00 PM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CH)
May 21, 2012 45 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 5.. (Cline, Thomas)
May 16, 2012 44 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's Second 27 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Target Brands Inc, Target Corporation. (Fogg, Steven)
May 11, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines: Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/18/2012, Joint Status Report due by 5/18/2012, (CH)
April 24, 2012 43 ANSWER to 27 Amended Complaint, by Jaya Apparel Group LLC.(Fogg, Steven)
April 24, 2012 42 ANSWER to 27 Amended Complaint, by Target Brands Inc, Target Corporation.(Fogg, Steven)
April 24, 2012 41 ANSWER to 27 Amended Complaint, by Disney Consumer Products, Disney Enterprises Inc, Walt Disney Company.(Fogg, Steven)
April 13, 2012 40 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' 38 MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S UNFAIR COMPETITION COUNT PURSUANT TO FRCP 12(b)(6) FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(TF)
April 10, 2012 39 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Modern Dog Design Company, to 38 MOTION to Dismiss. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Cline, Thomas)
March 29, 2012 38 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Disney Consumer Products, Disney Enterprises Inc, Jaya Apparel Group LLC, Target Brands Inc, Target Corporation, Walt Disney Company. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/20/2012, (Fogg, Steven)
March 8, 2012 37 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 5/11/2012, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 4/27/2012, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/11/2012, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CH)
March 1, 2012 36 DECLARATION of Thomas Cline Disclaiming Purported Signature on Stipulation re 34 Stipulation by Plaintiff Modern Dog Design Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Cline, Thomas)
February 29, 2012 35 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINES by Judge Thomas S. Zilly; Based upon the parties' 34 Stipulation, it is ORDERED that the deadline to file defts' answer or responsive pleading is moved to 3/29/2012. The Court further directs the Clerk to revise the Scheduling Order dated 11/7/2011. (TF)
February 28, 2012 34 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Deadlines by parties. (Fogg, Steven)
February 23, 2012 33 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Disney Enterprises, Inc. on 2/7/2012, filed by Plaintiff Modern Dog Design Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Cline, Thomas)
February 23, 2012 32 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Disney Consumer Products, Inc. on 2/7/2012, filed by Plaintiff Modern Dog Design Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Cline, Thomas)
February 23, 2012 31 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on The Walt Disney Company on 2/7/2012, filed by Plaintiff Modern Dog Design Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Cline, Thomas)
February 23, 2012 30 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Target Corporation on 2/7/2012, filed by Plaintiff Modern Dog Design Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Cline, Thomas)
February 23, 2012 29 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Jaya Apparel Group LLC on 12/22/2011, filed by Plaintiff Modern Dog Design Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Cline, Thomas)
February 3, 2012 28 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Modern Dog Design Company. Clerk issued sms. (CL)
February 3, 2012 27 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Disney Consumer Products, Disney Enterprises Inc, Jaya Apparel Group LLC, Target Corporation, Walt Disney Company with JURY DEMAND, filed by Modern Dog Design Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Cline, Thomas)
February 2, 2012 26 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Steven W Fogg on behalf of Defendants Disney Consumer Products, Disney Enterprises Inc, Jaya Apparel Group LLC, Target Brands Inc, Target Corporation, Walt Disney Company. (Fogg, Steven)
January 30, 2012 25 Featured Case ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 24 Motion to Amend the Complaint, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Counsel is directed to e-file their Amended Complaint. (CL)
January 13, 2012 Noting Date Reset re 24 MOTION to Amend Complaint : Noting Date 1/27/2012. (CL)
January 12, 2012 24 MOTION to Amend Complaint by Plaintiff Modern Dog Design Company. (Attachments: # 1 Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/13/2012, (Cline, Thomas)
December 28, 2011 23 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF ATTYS FOR PLTF by Judge Thomas S. Zilly; Attorney Thomas Cline for Modern Dog Design Company added. Attorney Joseph Francis Murphy withdrawn. (TF)
December 22, 2011 22 Summons electronically issued as to defendant Walt Disney Company. (CL)
December 22, 2011 21 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER for withdrawal and substitution of attorneys by parties. (Murphy, Joseph)
December 21, 2011 20 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re 6 Amended Complaint first(repeated ask for Sum) by Plaintiff Modern Dog Design Company. (Murphy, Joseph)
December 20, 2011 19 Summons electronically issued as to defendant Target Corporation. (CL)
December 20, 2011 18 Summons electronically i ssued as to defendants: Agents for Jaya Apparel Group LLC, Target Corporation and Walt Disney Company. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons) (CL)
December 20, 2011 17 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re 6 Amended Complaint (first) by Defendant Target Corporation. (Murphy, Joseph)
December 15, 2011 16 Summons electronically issued as to defendant Jaya Apparel Group LLC. (CL)
December 14, 2011 15 PRAECIPE to attach document (Plastic sheet) see-thru overlays paper re 6 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Modern Dog Design Company. (Murphy, Joseph)
December 14, 2011 14 PRAECIPE to attach document ((Exhibit 3, Book)) re 6 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Modern Dog Design Company. (Murphy, Joseph)
December 14, 2011 13 PRAECIPE to attach document (Notice of Paper Filing) (Exhibit 1, Tee-Shirt) re 6 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Modern Dog Design Company. (Murphy, Joseph)
December 14, 2011 12 ERRATA re 6 Amended Complaint (Add JAYA to ECF dfndnts) by Plaintiff Modern Dog Design Company. (Murphy, Joseph)
December 14, 2011 11 EXHIBIT 6 to end re 6 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Modern Dog Design Company. (Murphy, Joseph)
December 14, 2011 10 EXHIBIT 1 to 5 re 6 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Modern Dog Design Company. (Murphy, Joseph)
December 14, 2011 9 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re 6 Amended Complaint (First) by Plaintiff Modern Dog Design Company. (Murphy, Joseph)
December 14, 2011 8 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re 6 Amended Complaint (First) by Plaintiff Modern Dog Design Company. (Murphy, Joseph)
December 14, 2011 7 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re 6 Amended Complaint (First) by Plaintiff Modern Dog Design Company. (Murphy, Joseph)
December 14, 2011 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) against defendant(s) All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by Modern Dog Design Company.(Murphy, Joseph)
December 13, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines: FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 2/23/2012, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/6/2012, Joint Status Report due by 3/6/2012, (CH)
November 7, 2011 5 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 1/6/2012, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/23/2011, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/6/2012, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (CH)
November 4, 2011 4 NOTICE of Corp Disc per FRCP 7.1 ; filed by Plaintiff Modern Dog Design Company. (Murphy, Joseph)
October 31, 2011 AO 121 - COPYRIGHT REPORT (Doc. #2) - sent via USPS to the U.S. Copyright Office. (PM)
October 31, 2011 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1 Plaintiff Modern Dog Design Company must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 11/7/2011. (PM)
October 31, 2011 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (PM)
October 31, 2011 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Exhibits against defendant(s) with JURY DEMAND,(Receipt # 0981-2606463) filed by MODERN DOG DESIGN COMPANY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Murphy, Joseph) Modified on 10/31/2011: Per phone call from counsel, this Amended Complaint shall stand as the original Complaint for this case. (PM).
October 28, 2011 2 NOTICE to Copyright Office ; filed by Plaintiff MODERN DOG DESIGN COMPANY. (Murphy, Joseph)
October 28, 2011 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Plaintiff MODERN DOG DESIGN COMPANY.. (Murphy, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Modern Dog Design Company v. Target Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Disney Enterprises Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walt Disney Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Disney Consumer Products
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John 1-5 Does
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Brands Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Modern Dog Design Company
Represented By: Joseph Francis Murphy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]