AR Pillow Inc et al v. Cottrell

Defendant: Annette Cottrell
Plaintiff: AR Pillow Inc and Elizabeth Goutevenier
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv01962
Filed: November 23, 2011
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 13, 2012 37 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Richard A Jones. The court DENIES plaintiffs AR Pillow, Inc.'s and Elizabeth Goutevenier's motion for temporary restraining order, which the court has construed as a motion for preliminary injunction. Dkt. # 13 . (CL)
December 4, 2012 61 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Richard A Jones. The court GRANT's special motion to strike Plaintiffs' state law claims. Dkt. # 43 . The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate plaintiffs' motion for extension of time and motion to strike the anti-SLAPP motion. Dkt. ## 47 , 51 . (CL)
December 27, 2012 73 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 64 MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by Judge Richard A Jones; Jury Trial is set for 8/19/2013. Dispositive motions are due by 5/30/2013. Defts' 68 Motion for Summary Judgment is TERMINATED. Attorney Eric He lmy is withdrawn as counsel for pltfs. The 54 MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 37, 56 MOTION to Compel and 65 MOTION for Attorney Fees and costs Under RCW 4.24.525, are all RENOTED: Noting Date 2/1/2013. See Order for specific details. (TF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: AR Pillow Inc et al v. Cottrell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annette Cottrell
Represented By: Luke Conyac
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AR Pillow Inc
Represented By: Eric Helmy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Goutevenier
Represented By: Eric Helmy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]