Spry Fox, LLC v. LOLApps, Inc et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Spry Fox, LLC alleged that Defendants LOLApps, Inc. and 6Waves, LLC published Yeti Town, a clone of Plaintiff's "Triple Town" electronic game, for the iOS platform.

Plaintiff: Spry Fox LLC
Defendant: LOLApps Inc, LOLApps Merger Sub Inc, 6Waves LLC and 1-10 Does
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00147
Filed: January 26, 2012
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
 
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
February 10, 2012 5 Letter sent to Mark I. Lorbiecki atty for the plaintiff. (CL) (Main Document 5 replaced on 2/13/2012) (CL).
February 6, 2012 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1.. (Lorbiecki, Mark)
January 27, 2012 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION OR APPEAL REGARDING A COPYRIGHT. by Plaintiff Spry Fox LLC. (Copyright Report sent via US Postal Service to Copyright Office.)(RE)
January 27, 2012 2 Summons electronically Issued as to defendant(s) 6Waves LLC, LOLApps Inc, LOLApps Merger Sub Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Summons-LOLapps Merger, # 2 Summons-6Waves)(RE)
January 27, 2012 NOTICE TO FILER: COPYRIGHT REPORT FILED IS INCOMPLETE:Please complete the appropriate form and email it back to the new cases box at newcases.seattle@wawd.uscourts.gov. Please include in the subject line the name and number of the case and the name of the document attached. This form will then be posted to the case docket and a copy sent to the appropriate entity. Thank you.(RE)
January 27, 2012 Judge Richard A Jones added. (RE)
January 26, 2012 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) 6Waves, LLC, 1-10 Does, LOLApps Merger Sub, Inc, LOLApps, Inc (Receipt # 0981-2692545), filed by Spry Fox, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Certificate of Registration, # 2 Exhibit B - Mutual Non-Disclosure Agreement, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Report on Copyrights (AO Form121), # 5 Summons LOLApps, Inc., # 6 Summons LOLApss Sub Merger, Inc., # 7 Summons 6Waves, LLC.)(Lorbiecki, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Spry Fox, LLC v. LOLApps, Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spry Fox LLC
Represented By: Mark Lawrence Lorbiecki
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOLApps Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOLApps Merger Sub Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 6Waves LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1-10 Does
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]