National Products, Inc v. Aqua Box Products, LLC

Plaintiff: National Products, Inc
Defendant: Aqua Box Products, LLC
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00605
Filed: April 10, 2012
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 21, 2013 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTIONS TO SEAL; regarding motions at 115 116 130 ; clerk directed to unseal documents at 117 , 118 and 133 by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
June 12, 2013 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying dfts' 123 Motion for Reconsideration by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
January 11, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on pltf's 29 Motion to Compel production of documents and for relief from mediation deadline by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
March 25, 2013 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 59 Motion to seal documents in opposition to dfts' motion for summary judgment by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
April 5, 2013 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying dfts' 54 Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: National Products, Inc v. Aqua Box Products, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Products, Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Ware
Represented By: David K Tellekson
Represented By: Ewa M. Davison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aqua Box Products, LLC
Represented By: Suzanna Shaub
Represented By: David Tewell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]