Ibrahim v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Fowsia H Ibrahim
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
Case Number: 2:2012cv00739
Filed: April 26, 2012
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Referring Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Retirement and Survivors Benefits
Cause of Action: 42:0405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 29 Motion to Amend. ; Motions terminated: 29 MOTION to Amend 25 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, Terminate Motions,UNOPPOSED filed by Michael J Astrue. Signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler.(GB)
April 18, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re stipulated 37 MOTION to Remand. Noting Date 4/18/2013. Signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (Attachments: # 1 R&R Proposed Order, # 2 R&R Judgment)(GB)
April 19, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REMAND AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 38 Report and Recommendations by Judge James L. Robart. (MD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ibrahim v. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fowsia H Ibrahim
Represented By: M Tha Win
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]