Pacific International Grout Co v. Zinkova

Counter_defendant: Bliss Stephens, Pacific International Grout Co and Patrick J Stephens
Plaintiff: Pacific International Grout Co
Defendant: Anna Vladimirovna Zinkova
Counter_claimant: Anna Vladimirovna Zinkova
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00778
Filed: May 4, 2012
 
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Marsha J. Pechman
 
Nature of Suit: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 21, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 1 Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw Reference of the adversary action and to remove the action to the District Court, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD) Modified on 5/22/2012 -mailed copy of order to Attorney Philip Rosellini(MD).
July 25, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 7 Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(IM)
May 29, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON CONSOLIDATED 56 Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement and for Dismissal. IT IS ORDERED that this action and all claims asserted herein are DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs to any party. In the event that the settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen the case, provided that such motion is filed within thirty (30) days of the date of this order, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(MD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Pacific International Grout Co v. Zinkova
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Bliss Stephens
Represented By: Heidi C Anderson
Represented By: Laura T Morse
Represented By: D Michael Reilly
Represented By: Philip E. Rosellini
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Pacific International Grout Co
Represented By: Philip E. Rosellini
Represented By: D Michael Reilly
Represented By: Laura T Morse
Represented By: Heidi C Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Patrick J Stephens
Represented By: Philip E. Rosellini
Represented By: D Michael Reilly
Represented By: Laura T Morse
Represented By: Heidi C Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific International Grout Co
Represented By: Philip E. Rosellini
Represented By: D Michael Reilly
Represented By: Laura T Morse
Represented By: Heidi C Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Vladimirovna Zinkova
Represented By: Michael T Mumford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Anna Vladimirovna Zinkova
Represented By: Michael T Mumford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]